EP2303355 - DEVICE FOR PERITONEAL DIALYSIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.04.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fresenius Medical Care Deutschland GmbH Else-Kröner-Strasse 1 61352 Bad Homburg / DE | [2011/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEDMANN, Frank In den Böden 52 97332 Volkach / DE | 02 /
KLATTE, Stephan Mittelanger 7 31582 Nienburg (Weser) / DE | [2011/14] | Representative(s) | Laufhütte, Dieter, et al Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstraße 23 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/23] | Laufhütte, Dieter, et al Lorenz-Seidler-Gossel Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/14] | Laufhütte, Dieter, et al Lorenz-Seidler-Gossel Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09772146.8 | 30.06.2009 | [2011/14] | WO2009EP04721 | Priority number, date | DE20081031662 | 04.07.2008 Original published format: DE102008031662 | [2011/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010000446 | Date: | 07.01.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2303355 | Date: | 06.04.2011 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.01.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2303355 | Date: | 04.06.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.01.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61M1/28 | [2011/14] | CPC: |
A61M1/28 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3344 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/14] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR PERITONEALDIALYSE | [2011/14] | English: | DEVICE FOR PERITONEAL DIALYSIS | [2011/14] | French: | SYSTÈME POUR DIALYSES PÉRITONÉALES | [2011/14] | Entry into regional phase | 17.01.2011 | National basic fee paid | 17.01.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.01.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.01.2011 | Examination requested [2011/14] | 15.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.01.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.05.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.04.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 11.04.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.04.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.01.2013 | Opposition(s) | 05.03.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.06.2009 | BG | 04.06.2014 | CY | 04.06.2014 | CZ | 04.06.2014 | DK | 04.06.2014 | EE | 04.06.2014 | ES | 04.06.2014 | FI | 04.06.2014 | HR | 04.06.2014 | IT | 04.06.2014 | LT | 04.06.2014 | LV | 04.06.2014 | MC | 04.06.2014 | MK | 04.06.2014 | MT | 04.06.2014 | NL | 04.06.2014 | PL | 04.06.2014 | RO | 04.06.2014 | SE | 04.06.2014 | SI | 04.06.2014 | SK | 04.06.2014 | TR | 04.06.2014 | AT | 30.06.2014 | BE | 30.06.2014 | CH | 30.06.2014 | IE | 30.06.2014 | LI | 30.06.2014 | LU | 30.06.2014 | FR | 04.08.2014 | GB | 04.09.2014 | NO | 04.09.2014 | GR | 05.09.2014 | IS | 04.10.2014 | PT | 06.10.2014 | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/33] | HU | 30.06.2009 | |
BG | 04.06.2014 | ||
CY | 04.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 04.06.2014 | ||
DK | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
ES | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
HR | 04.06.2014 | ||
IT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
MC | 04.06.2014 | ||
MT | 04.06.2014 | ||
NL | 04.06.2014 | ||
PL | 04.06.2014 | ||
RO | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
SI | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
TR | 04.06.2014 | ||
AT | 30.06.2014 | ||
BE | 30.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
IE | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
LU | 30.06.2014 | ||
FR | 04.08.2014 | ||
GB | 04.09.2014 | ||
NO | 04.09.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
IS | 04.10.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 30.06.2009 | |
BG | 04.06.2014 | ||
CY | 04.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 04.06.2014 | ||
DK | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
ES | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
HR | 04.06.2014 | ||
IT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
MC | 04.06.2014 | ||
MT | 04.06.2014 | ||
NL | 04.06.2014 | ||
PL | 04.06.2014 | ||
RO | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
SI | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
AT | 30.06.2014 | ||
BE | 30.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
IE | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
FR | 04.08.2014 | ||
GB | 04.09.2014 | ||
NO | 04.09.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
IS | 04.10.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | BG | 04.06.2014 | |
CY | 04.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 04.06.2014 | ||
DK | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
ES | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
HR | 04.06.2014 | ||
IT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
MC | 04.06.2014 | ||
MT | 04.06.2014 | ||
NL | 04.06.2014 | ||
PL | 04.06.2014 | ||
RO | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
SI | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
AT | 30.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
IE | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
FR | 04.08.2014 | ||
GB | 04.09.2014 | ||
NO | 04.09.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
IS | 04.10.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
Former [2016/16] | CY | 04.06.2014 | |
CZ | 04.06.2014 | ||
DK | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
ES | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
HR | 04.06.2014 | ||
IT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
MC | 04.06.2014 | ||
MT | 04.06.2014 | ||
NL | 04.06.2014 | ||
PL | 04.06.2014 | ||
RO | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
SI | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
AT | 30.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
IE | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
FR | 04.08.2014 | ||
GB | 04.09.2014 | ||
NO | 04.09.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
IS | 04.10.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/51] | CY | 04.06.2014 | |
CZ | 04.06.2014 | ||
DK | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
ES | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
HR | 04.06.2014 | ||
IT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
MC | 04.06.2014 | ||
NL | 04.06.2014 | ||
PL | 04.06.2014 | ||
RO | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
SI | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
AT | 30.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
IE | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
FR | 04.08.2014 | ||
GB | 04.09.2014 | ||
NO | 04.09.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
IS | 04.10.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | CY | 04.06.2014 | |
CZ | 04.06.2014 | ||
DK | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
ES | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
HR | 04.06.2014 | ||
IT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
MC | 04.06.2014 | ||
NL | 04.06.2014 | ||
PL | 04.06.2014 | ||
RO | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
SI | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
IE | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
FR | 04.08.2014 | ||
GB | 04.09.2014 | ||
NO | 04.09.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
IS | 04.10.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/25] | CY | 04.06.2014 | |
CZ | 04.06.2014 | ||
DK | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
ES | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
HR | 04.06.2014 | ||
IT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
MC | 04.06.2014 | ||
NL | 04.06.2014 | ||
PL | 04.06.2014 | ||
RO | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
IE | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
FR | 04.08.2014 | ||
NO | 04.09.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
IS | 04.10.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | CY | 04.06.2014 | |
CZ | 04.06.2014 | ||
DK | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
ES | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
HR | 04.06.2014 | ||
IT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
MC | 04.06.2014 | ||
NL | 04.06.2014 | ||
PL | 04.06.2014 | ||
RO | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
IE | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
NO | 04.09.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
IS | 04.10.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/21] | CY | 04.06.2014 | |
CZ | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
ES | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
HR | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
MC | 04.06.2014 | ||
NL | 04.06.2014 | ||
PL | 04.06.2014 | ||
RO | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
IE | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
NO | 04.09.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
IS | 04.10.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | CY | 04.06.2014 | |
CZ | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
ES | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
HR | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
MC | 04.06.2014 | ||
NL | 04.06.2014 | ||
PL | 04.06.2014 | ||
RO | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
NO | 04.09.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
IS | 04.10.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | CY | 04.06.2014 | |
CZ | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
ES | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
HR | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
MC | 04.06.2014 | ||
NL | 04.06.2014 | ||
PL | 04.06.2014 | ||
RO | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
NO | 04.09.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
IS | 04.10.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | CY | 04.06.2014 | |
CZ | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
ES | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
HR | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
NL | 04.06.2014 | ||
PL | 04.06.2014 | ||
RO | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
NO | 04.09.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
IS | 04.10.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 04.06.2014 | |
CZ | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
ES | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
HR | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
PL | 04.06.2014 | ||
RO | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
NO | 04.09.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | CY | 04.06.2014 | |
CZ | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
ES | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
HR | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
NO | 04.09.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 04.06.2014 | |
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
HR | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
NO | 04.09.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 04.06.2014 | |
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
NO | 04.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 04.06.2014 | |
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 04.06.2014 | Cited in | International search | [XI]US5004459 (PEABODY ALAN M [US], et al) [X] 9,11-12 * figure -; claim - * * column 4, line 26 - column 5, line 68 * [I] 10; | [XI]WO9906082 (DADSON JOSEPH E [CA]) [X] 1-2,6 * figure -; claim - * * page 4, paragraph 2 - page 5, paragraph 1 * * page 11, paragraph 4 - page 12, paragraph 1 * [I] 3; | [XI]WO0158509 (BAXTER INT [US]) [X] 1-3,5-6 * figures 4-11; claim - * * page 5, line 5 - page 6, line 30 * * page 8, line 10 - page 10, line 17 * * page 12, line 25 - page 13, line 16 * [I] 4,7-8; | [A]US2004019312 (CHILDERS ROBERT W [US], et al) [A] 1-12* figure -; claim - *; | [X]WO2005035023 (GAMBRO LUNDIA AB [SE], et al) [X] 1-3,6 * figure -; claim - * * page 6, line 3 - page 10, line 21 * * page 17, line 24 - page 18, line 9 *; | [X]US2007106247 (BURNETT DANIEL R [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6 * figures 1-3; claim 45 * * paragraphs [0046] - [0049] * | by applicant | US5004459 | WO9906082 | WO0158509 | WO2005035023 | US2007106247 |