EP2297719 - AN EFFICIENT LOCATION REFERENCING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.11.2016 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TomTom International B.V. De Ruijterkade 154 1011 AC Amsterdam / NL | [2016/02] |
Former [2014/19] | For all designated states TomTom International B.V. De Ruijterkade 154 1011 AC Amsterdam / NL | ||
Former [2012/03] | For all designated states TomTom International B.V. IP Creation Rembrandtplein 35 1017 CT Amsterdam / NL | ||
Former [2011/12] | For all designated states TomTom International B.V. Rembrandtplein 35 1017 CT Amsterdam / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PETZOLD, Lars Proskauer Str. 27 10247 Berlin / DE | 02 /
SCHAEFER, Ralf-Peter Minkwitzweg 25 12557 Berlin / DE | 03 /
BASELAU, Sven Johannisthaler Chaussee 310 12351 Berlin / DE | [2011/15] |
Former [2011/12] | 01 /
PETZOLD, Lars Rudower Chaussee 29 12489 Berlin / DE | ||
02 /
SCHAEFER, Ralf-Peter Minkwitzweg 25 12557 Berlin / DE | |||
03 /
BASELAU, Sven Johannisthaler Chaussee 310 12351 Berlin / DE | Representative(s) | Dobson, Adrian, et al TomTom International BV Oosterdoksstraat 114 1011 DK Amsterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2012/17] | Dobson, Adrian, et al TomTom International BV Oosterdoksstraat 114 1011 DK Amsterdam / NL | ||
Former [2011/12] | Moore, Nicholas TomTom International BV Oosterdoksstraat 114 1011 Amsterdam / NL | Application number, filing date | 09772407.4 | 29.06.2009 | [2011/12] | WO2009EP58131 | Priority number, date | US20080129491P | 30.06.2008 Original published format: US 129491 P | US20080193027P | 22.10.2008 Original published format: US 193027 P | [2011/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010000707 | Date: | 07.01.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2297719 | Date: | 23.03.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.01.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2297719 | Date: | 13.01.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.01.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G01C21/34, G09B29/10 | [2015/32] | CPC: |
G01C21/34 (EP,CN,US);
G08G1/09 (KR);
G01C21/26 (KR);
G09B29/10 (KR);
G09B29/106 (EP,CN,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/12] | G08G1/09, G01C21/00, G09B29/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/02] |
Former [2011/12] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | EFFIZIENTES STANDORTREFERENZIERUNGSVERFAHREN | [2011/12] | English: | AN EFFICIENT LOCATION REFERENCING METHOD | [2011/12] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE RÉFÉRENCEMENT DE LOCALISATION EFFICACE | [2011/12] | Entry into regional phase | 07.12.2010 | National basic fee paid | 07.12.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.12.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.12.2010 | Examination requested [2011/12] | 17.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.11.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.05.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 18.07.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.07.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.11.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 20.11.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.11.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.11.2013 | Opposition(s) | 14.10.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/51] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 18.07.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 18.07.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 30.07.2014 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.06.2009 | AT | 13.01.2016 | BE | 13.01.2016 | CY | 13.01.2016 | CZ | 13.01.2016 | DK | 13.01.2016 | EE | 13.01.2016 | ES | 13.01.2016 | FI | 13.01.2016 | HR | 13.01.2016 | IT | 13.01.2016 | LT | 13.01.2016 | LV | 13.01.2016 | MC | 13.01.2016 | MK | 13.01.2016 | PL | 13.01.2016 | RO | 13.01.2016 | SE | 13.01.2016 | SI | 13.01.2016 | SK | 13.01.2016 | TR | 13.01.2016 | BG | 13.04.2016 | NO | 13.04.2016 | GR | 14.04.2016 | IS | 13.05.2016 | PT | 13.05.2016 | IE | 29.06.2016 | LU | 29.06.2016 | CH | 30.06.2016 | LI | 30.06.2016 | MT | 30.06.2016 | [2018/32] |
Former [2018/29] | HU | 29.06.2009 | |
AT | 13.01.2016 | ||
BE | 13.01.2016 | ||
CY | 13.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2016 | ||
DK | 13.01.2016 | ||
EE | 13.01.2016 | ||
ES | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
IT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
MC | 13.01.2016 | ||
MK | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
RO | 13.01.2016 | ||
SE | 13.01.2016 | ||
SI | 13.01.2016 | ||
SK | 13.01.2016 | ||
TR | 13.01.2016 | ||
BG | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
IE | 29.06.2016 | ||
LU | 29.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 29.06.2009 | |
AT | 13.01.2016 | ||
BE | 13.01.2016 | ||
CY | 13.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2016 | ||
DK | 13.01.2016 | ||
EE | 13.01.2016 | ||
ES | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
IT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
MC | 13.01.2016 | ||
MK | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
RO | 13.01.2016 | ||
SE | 13.01.2016 | ||
SI | 13.01.2016 | ||
SK | 13.01.2016 | ||
BG | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
IE | 29.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/24] | AT | 13.01.2016 | |
BE | 13.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2016 | ||
DK | 13.01.2016 | ||
EE | 13.01.2016 | ||
ES | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
IT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
MC | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
RO | 13.01.2016 | ||
SE | 13.01.2016 | ||
SI | 13.01.2016 | ||
SK | 13.01.2016 | ||
BG | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
IE | 29.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/20] | AT | 13.01.2016 | |
BE | 13.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2016 | ||
DK | 13.01.2016 | ||
EE | 13.01.2016 | ||
ES | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
IT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
MC | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
RO | 13.01.2016 | ||
SE | 13.01.2016 | ||
SI | 13.01.2016 | ||
SK | 13.01.2016 | ||
BG | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/15] | AT | 13.01.2016 | |
BE | 13.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2016 | ||
DK | 13.01.2016 | ||
EE | 13.01.2016 | ||
ES | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
IT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
MC | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
RO | 13.01.2016 | ||
SE | 13.01.2016 | ||
SI | 13.01.2016 | ||
SK | 13.01.2016 | ||
BG | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 13.01.2016 | |
BE | 13.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2016 | ||
DK | 13.01.2016 | ||
EE | 13.01.2016 | ||
ES | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
IT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
MC | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
RO | 13.01.2016 | ||
SE | 13.01.2016 | ||
SK | 13.01.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 13.01.2016 | |
BE | 13.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2016 | ||
DK | 13.01.2016 | ||
EE | 13.01.2016 | ||
ES | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
IT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
RO | 13.01.2016 | ||
SE | 13.01.2016 | ||
SK | 13.01.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 13.01.2016 | |
CZ | 13.01.2016 | ||
DK | 13.01.2016 | ||
EE | 13.01.2016 | ||
ES | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
IT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
RO | 13.01.2016 | ||
SE | 13.01.2016 | ||
SK | 13.01.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 13.01.2016 | |
DK | 13.01.2016 | ||
EE | 13.01.2016 | ||
ES | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
IT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
SE | 13.01.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 13.01.2016 | |
DK | 13.01.2016 | ||
ES | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
IT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
SE | 13.01.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 13.01.2016 | |
ES | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
IT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
SE | 13.01.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 13.01.2016 | |
ES | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
IT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 13.01.2016 | |
ES | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
IT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | ES | 13.01.2016 | |
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | Cited in | International search | [X]US2003223373 (NAKAMURA YOSHIHIKO [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,11-13 * the whole document *; | [XA]GB2443472 (COTARES LTD [GB]) [X] 1-3,5-11 * page 1, line 1 - page 5, line 16; figures 1-7; claims 1-31 * * page 9, line 19 - page 46, line 11; claims 1-34 * [A] 4; | [XA]US2004039520 (KHAVAKH ASTA [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-11 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0210]; figures 1-21; claims 1-30 * [A] 4; | [XA]EP1637841 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1-3,5-13 * the whole document * [A] ; | [A]US2003229441 (PECHATNIKOV MICHAEL [IL], et al) [A] 1-13 * paragraphs [0001] - [0064]; figures 1-21 * * paragraph [0117] - paragraph [0230]; claims 1-52 *; | [A]US2006122846 (BURR JONATHAN [GB], et al) [A] 1-3,5-13 * the whole document * |