EP2304361 - METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A COOLING ELEMENT AND A COOLING ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.01.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Outotec Oyj Rauhalanpuisto 9 02230 Espoo / FI | For all designated states Saarinen, Risto Niittykuja 2 A 25 02200 Espoo / FI | [2016/39] |
Former [2013/42] | For all designated states Outotec Oyj Puolikkotie 10 02230 Espoo / FI | ||
For all designated states Saarinen, Risto Niittykuja 2 A 25 02200 Espoo / FI | |||
Former [2011/14] | For all designated states Outotec OYJ Riihitontuntie 7 E 02200 Espoo / FI | ||
For all designated states Saarinen, Risto Niittykuja 2 A 25 02200 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUGG, Eero Kuukausikuja 4 as 19 FI-02200 Espoo / FI | 02 /
JÅFS, Mikael Okatie 2b FI-02400 Kirkkonummi / FI | 03 /
SAARINEN, Risto Nittykuya 2 A 25 FI-02200 Espoo / FI | [2016/11] |
Former [2011/14] | 01 /
HUGG, Eero Kuukausikuja 4 as 19 FI-02200 Espoo / FI | ||
02 /
JÅFS, Mikael Nikunpellorikuja 1 F 11 FI- 02920 Espoo / FI | |||
03 /
Saarinen, Risto Nittykuya 2 A 25 FI-02200 Espoo / FI | Representative(s) | Boco IP Oy Ab Kansakoulukatu 3 00100 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2014/08] | Boco IP Oy Ab Itämerenkatu 5 00180 Helsinki / FI | ||
Former [2011/14] | Westerholm, Carl Christian, et al BORENIUS & Co Oy AB Tallberginkatu 2 A 00180 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 09772626.9 | 30.06.2009 | [2011/14] | WO2009FI50592 | Priority number, date | FI20080005669 | 30.06.2008 Original published format: FI 20085669 | [2011/14] | Filing language | FI | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010000939 | Date: | 07.01.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2304361 | Date: | 06.04.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.01.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2304361 | Date: | 16.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | FI | 07.01.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | F27B1/24, F27D1/12, C21B7/10, F27D1/14, C21C5/46 | [2014/47] | CPC: |
C21C5/4646 (EP,US);
F27B1/24 (FI);
C21B7/10 (FI);
C21B7/106 (EP,US);
F27D1/12 (EP,FI,US);
Y10T29/4935 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/14] | F27B1/24, F27D1/12, C21B7/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/11] |
Former [2011/14] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES KÜHLELEMENTS UND KÜHLELEMENT | [2011/14] | English: | METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A COOLING ELEMENT AND A COOLING ELEMENT | [2011/14] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D UN ÉLÉMENT DE REFROIDISSEMENT ET ÉLÉMENT DE REFROIDISSEMENT | [2011/14] | Entry into regional phase | 28.01.2011 | National basic fee paid | 28.01.2011 | Search fee paid | 28.01.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.01.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.01.2011 | Examination requested [2011/14] | 29.04.2011 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 12.02.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.08.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.11.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 20.11.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.12.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.01.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.08.2015 | Opposition(s) | 19.12.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/08] | Request for further processing for: | Loss of rights: Claims | 14.05.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 14.05.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.06.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.06.2009 | AT | 16.03.2016 | BE | 16.03.2016 | CY | 16.03.2016 | CZ | 16.03.2016 | DK | 16.03.2016 | EE | 16.03.2016 | FI | 16.03.2016 | HR | 16.03.2016 | IT | 16.03.2016 | LT | 16.03.2016 | LV | 16.03.2016 | MC | 16.03.2016 | MK | 16.03.2016 | NL | 16.03.2016 | RO | 16.03.2016 | SI | 16.03.2016 | SK | 16.03.2016 | TR | 16.03.2016 | NO | 16.06.2016 | GR | 17.06.2016 | CH | 30.06.2016 | FR | 30.06.2016 | GB | 30.06.2016 | IE | 30.06.2016 | LI | 30.06.2016 | LU | 30.06.2016 | MT | 30.06.2016 | IS | 16.07.2016 | PT | 18.07.2016 | [2018/32] |
Former [2018/29] | HU | 30.06.2009 | |
AT | 16.03.2016 | ||
BE | 16.03.2016 | ||
CY | 16.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2016 | ||
DK | 16.03.2016 | ||
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
IT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
MC | 16.03.2016 | ||
MK | 16.03.2016 | ||
NL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
SI | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
TR | 16.03.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
FR | 30.06.2016 | ||
GB | 30.06.2016 | ||
IE | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
LU | 30.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
PT | 18.07.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 30.06.2009 | |
AT | 16.03.2016 | ||
BE | 16.03.2016 | ||
CY | 16.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2016 | ||
DK | 16.03.2016 | ||
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
IT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
MC | 16.03.2016 | ||
MK | 16.03.2016 | ||
NL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
SI | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
FR | 30.06.2016 | ||
GB | 30.06.2016 | ||
IE | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
PT | 18.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/24] | AT | 16.03.2016 | |
BE | 16.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2016 | ||
DK | 16.03.2016 | ||
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
IT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
MC | 16.03.2016 | ||
NL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
SI | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
FR | 30.06.2016 | ||
GB | 30.06.2016 | ||
IE | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
PT | 18.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 16.03.2016 | |
BE | 16.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2016 | ||
DK | 16.03.2016 | ||
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
IT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
MC | 16.03.2016 | ||
NL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
PT | 18.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 16.03.2016 | |
BE | 16.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2016 | ||
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
IT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
NL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
PT | 18.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | AT | 16.03.2016 | |
CZ | 16.03.2016 | ||
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
NL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
PT | 18.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 16.03.2016 | |
CZ | 16.03.2016 | ||
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
NL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | EE | 16.03.2016 | |
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
NL | 16.03.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/48] | FI | 16.03.2016 | |
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
NL | 16.03.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/40] | FI | 16.03.2016 | |
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
NL | 16.03.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | FI | 16.03.2016 | |
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | FI | 16.03.2016 | |
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | FI | 16.03.2016 | |
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JP2000256715 (NIPPON KOKAN KK) [X] 1,3-6,8-10,13-16,18-20 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0043] * * figures 1, 3, 4, 6 * [I] 2,7,12,17; | [XI]WO2004011866 (OUTOKUMPU OY [FI], et al) [X] 1,11 * figures 1a, 1b, 1c, 2 * * page 1, line 1 - line 2 * * page 3, line 29 - page 5, line 19 *[I] 2-10,12-20 | International search | [A]GB1439137 (DIDIER WERKE AG); | [A]WO0171267 (OUTOKUMPU OY [FI], et al); | [A]WO0237044 (OUTOKUMPU OY [FI], et al); | [A]WO2004011866 (OUTOKUMPU OY [FI], et al) | by applicant | FI109937B |