EP2298625 - ELECTRIC POWER STEERING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.06.2014 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JTEKT Corporation 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 542-8502 / JP | [2011/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OYA, Toshiaki c/o JTEKT Corporation 5-8 Minamisemba 3-Chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 542-8502 / JP | [2013/33] |
Former [2011/12] | 01 /
OYA, Toshiaki c/o JTEKT Corporation 5-8 Minamisemba 3-Chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 542-8502 / JP | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2013/33] |
Former [2011/12] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09773473.5 | 30.06.2009 | [2011/12] | WO2009JP61965 | Priority number, date | JP20080174191 | 03.07.2008 Original published format: JP 2008174191 | [2011/12] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010001895 | Date: | 07.01.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2298625 | Date: | 23.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2298625 | Date: | 14.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.01.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B62D6/00, B62D5/04, H02P6/08, B62D101/00, B62D119/00, B62D127/00 | [2011/12] | CPC: |
B62D5/046 (EP,US);
B62D5/0457 (EP,US);
B62D5/0475 (EP,US);
H02P6/085 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/12] | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCHE SERVOLENKVORRICHTUNG | [2011/12] | English: | ELECTRIC POWER STEERING DEVICE | [2011/12] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DIRECTION À ASSISTANCE ÉLECTRIQUE | [2011/12] | Entry into regional phase | 28.12.2010 | Translation filed | 28.12.2010 | National basic fee paid | 28.12.2010 | Search fee paid | 28.12.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.12.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.12.2010 | Examination requested [2011/12] | 24.04.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.02.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.06.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 13.06.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.02.2013 | Opposition(s) | 15.05.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.06.2009 | AT | 14.08.2013 | BE | 14.08.2013 | BG | 14.08.2013 | CY | 14.08.2013 | CZ | 14.08.2013 | DK | 14.08.2013 | EE | 14.08.2013 | ES | 14.08.2013 | FI | 14.08.2013 | HR | 14.08.2013 | IT | 14.08.2013 | LT | 14.08.2013 | LV | 14.08.2013 | MC | 14.08.2013 | MK | 14.08.2013 | MT | 14.08.2013 | NL | 14.08.2013 | PL | 14.08.2013 | RO | 14.08.2013 | SE | 14.08.2013 | SI | 14.08.2013 | SK | 14.08.2013 | TR | 14.08.2013 | NO | 14.11.2013 | GR | 15.11.2013 | IS | 14.12.2013 | PT | 16.12.2013 | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/33] | HU | 30.06.2009 | |
AT | 14.08.2013 | ||
BE | 14.08.2013 | ||
BG | 14.08.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2013 | ||
DK | 14.08.2013 | ||
EE | 14.08.2013 | ||
ES | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
HR | 14.08.2013 | ||
IT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
MC | 14.08.2013 | ||
MT | 14.08.2013 | ||
NL | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
RO | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
SK | 14.08.2013 | ||
TR | 14.08.2013 | ||
NO | 14.11.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 30.06.2009 | |
AT | 14.08.2013 | ||
BE | 14.08.2013 | ||
BG | 14.08.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2013 | ||
DK | 14.08.2013 | ||
EE | 14.08.2013 | ||
ES | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
HR | 14.08.2013 | ||
IT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
MC | 14.08.2013 | ||
MT | 14.08.2013 | ||
NL | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
RO | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
SK | 14.08.2013 | ||
NO | 14.11.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
BE | 14.08.2013 | ||
BG | 14.08.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2013 | ||
DK | 14.08.2013 | ||
EE | 14.08.2013 | ||
ES | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
HR | 14.08.2013 | ||
IT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
MC | 14.08.2013 | ||
MT | 14.08.2013 | ||
NL | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
RO | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
SK | 14.08.2013 | ||
NO | 14.11.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2016/16] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
BE | 14.08.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2013 | ||
DK | 14.08.2013 | ||
EE | 14.08.2013 | ||
ES | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
HR | 14.08.2013 | ||
IT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
MC | 14.08.2013 | ||
MT | 14.08.2013 | ||
NL | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
RO | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
SK | 14.08.2013 | ||
NO | 14.11.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2015/09] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
BE | 14.08.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2013 | ||
DK | 14.08.2013 | ||
EE | 14.08.2013 | ||
ES | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
HR | 14.08.2013 | ||
IT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
MC | 14.08.2013 | ||
NL | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
RO | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
SK | 14.08.2013 | ||
NO | 14.11.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
BE | 14.08.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2013 | ||
DK | 14.08.2013 | ||
EE | 14.08.2013 | ||
ES | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
HR | 14.08.2013 | ||
IT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
NL | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
RO | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
SK | 14.08.2013 | ||
NO | 14.11.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
BE | 14.08.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2013 | ||
DK | 14.08.2013 | ||
EE | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
HR | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
NL | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
RO | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
SK | 14.08.2013 | ||
NO | 14.11.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
BE | 14.08.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
DK | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
HR | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
NL | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
RO | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
NO | 14.11.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
BE | 14.08.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
DK | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
HR | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
NO | 14.11.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
BE | 14.08.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
HR | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
NO | 14.11.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | CY | 10.07.2013 | |
AT | 14.08.2013 | ||
BE | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
HR | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
NO | 14.11.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | CY | 10.07.2013 | |
AT | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
HR | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
NO | 14.11.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CY | 10.07.2013 | |
AT | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
HR | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
NO | 14.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CY | 10.07.2013 | |
AT | 14.08.2013 | ||
HR | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
NO | 14.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
HR | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
NO | 14.11.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 14.08.2013 | |
NO | 14.11.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | NO | 14.11.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]JPH07231510 (NISSAN MOTOR); | [A]JPH1189270 (KANSAI ELECTRIC POWER CO, et al); | [A]JP2003312522 (TOYODA MACHINE WORKS LTD) | by applicant | JP2008062712 |