EP2313828 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR EXECUTION OF APPLICATIONS IN CONJUNCTION WITH DISTRIBUTED RAID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 12.04.2019 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 15.05.2019 [2019/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pivot3, Inc. 6605 Cypresswood Drive Spring, TX 77379 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2011/17] | For all designated states Pivot3 6605 Cypresswood Drive Spring, TX 77379 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GALLOWAY, William, C. 7 Riata Drive Magnolia TX 77354 / US | 02 /
CALLISON, Ryan, A. 32010 Pattys Landing Magnolia TX 77354 / US | [2011/17] | Representative(s) | Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 02 51 80076 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/17] | Ewert, Jörg Wilhelm Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09774129.2 | 25.06.2009 | [2011/17] | WO2009US48570 | Priority number, date | US20080133534 | 30.06.2008 Original published format: US 133534 | [2011/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010002678 | Date: | 07.01.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2313828 | Date: | 27.04.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.01.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 07.01.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/06, // G06F11/00 | [2016/30] | CPC: |
G06F3/0689 (EP,KR,US);
G06F3/0604 (EP,KR,US);
G06F11/1084 (EP,US);
G06F11/1484 (EP,US);
G06F11/203 (EP,US);
G06F11/2035 (EP,US);
G06F13/14 (KR);
G06F15/16 (KR);
G06F15/161 (KR);
G06F3/0664 (EP,KR,US);
G06F9/06 (KR);
G06F9/44 (KR);
G06F2211/1028 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2011/17] | G06F11/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/17] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR AUSFÜHRUNG VON ANWENDUNGEN IN VERBINDUNG MIT VERTEILTEM RAID | [2011/17] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR EXECUTION OF APPLICATIONS IN CONJUNCTION WITH DISTRIBUTED RAID | [2011/17] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME POUR L'EXÉCUTION D'APPLICATIONS CONJOINTEMENT AVEC UN SYSTÈME RAID DISTRIBUÉ | [2011/17] | Entry into regional phase | 28.01.2011 | National basic fee paid | 28.01.2011 | Search fee paid | 28.01.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.01.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.01.2011 | Examination requested [2011/17] | 23.01.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.04.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/20] | 08.04.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 08.05.2019 | 08.05.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 02.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2006045845 (HEWLETT PACKARD DEVELOPMENT CO [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * page 16, line 29 - page 18, line 14 * * page 27, line 6 - page 28, line 7 ** figure 1 * | International search | [X]US7096316 (KARR RONALD S [US], et al) |