Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9086821 | Global Dossier | 21.07.2015 | B2 | US2013219120 | 22.08.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US13353408 | 30.06.2008 | US201313750417 | 25.01.2013 | US91455910 | 28.10.2010 | US49081009 | 24.06.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8417888 | Global Dossier | 09.04.2013 | B2 | US2011040936 | 17.02.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US13353408 | 30.06.2008 | US91455910 | 28.10.2010 | US49081009 | 24.06.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8219750 | Global Dossier | 10.07.2012 | B2 | US2009327606 | 31.12.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US13353408 | 30.06.2008 | US49081009 | 24.06.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20110048515 | Global Dossier | 11.05.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US13353408 | 30.06.2008 | WO2009US48570 | 25.06.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2011527047 | Global Dossier | 20.10.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US13353408 | 30.06.2008 | WO2009US48570 | 25.06.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2313828 | Global Dossier | 27.07.2016 | A4 | EP2313828 | 27.04.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US13353408 | 30.06.2008 | WO2009US48570 | 25.06.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102077175 | 25.05.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US13353408 | 30.06.2008 | WO2009US48570 | 25.06.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2010002678 | Global Dossier | 07.01.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US13353408 | 30.06.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20110044746 | Global Dossier | 29.04.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US13353408 | 30.06.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2011154697 | Global Dossier | 11.08.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US13353408 | 30.06.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102176198 | 07.09.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US13353408 | 30.06.2008 |