EP2318788 - START-UP CONTROL FOR REFRIGERATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.03.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.04.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.12.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carrier Corporation One Carrier Place P.O.Box 4015 Farmington, CT 06034-4015 / US | [2020/19] |
Former [2011/19] | For all designated states Carrier Corporation One Carrier Place P.O.Box 4015 Farmington, CT 06034-4015 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STEELE, John, T. 4202 New Seneca Turnpike Marcellus NY 13108 / US | 02 /
FULMER, Scott, D. 101 Sheridan Road Liverpool NY 13090 / US | 03 /
GUZMAN, Peter, P. 13 Orchard Street Marcellus NY 13108 / US | 04 /
HOTALING, Donald, B. 4304 Gates Road Jamesville NY 13078 / US | 05 /
REASON, John, R. 4356 Loveland Drive Liverpool NY 13090 / US | [2011/19] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2020/19] |
Former [2011/19] | Leckey, David Herbert Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 09774428.8 | 01.07.2009 | [2011/19] | WO2009US49385 | Priority number, date | US20080077417P | 01.07.2008 Original published format: US 77417 P | [2011/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010002978 | Date: | 07.01.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/01] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2318788 | Date: | 11.05.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.01.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2318788 | Date: | 06.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 01.04.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.11.2014 | Classification | IPC: | F25B49/02, B60P3/20, F25D29/00, B60H1/32, B60H1/00, F25B27/00 | [2014/52] | CPC: |
F25D29/003 (EP,US);
B60H1/00014 (EP,US);
B60H1/3208 (EP,US);
B60H1/3216 (EP,US);
B60P3/20 (EP,US);
F25B27/00 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2011/19] | F25B49/02, B60P3/20, F25D29/00, B60H1/32 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/19] |
Former [2011/19] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | STARTSTEUERUNG FÜR KÜHLSYSTEM | [2011/19] | English: | START-UP CONTROL FOR REFRIGERATION SYSTEM | [2011/19] | French: | COMMANDE DE DÉMARRAGE POUR SYSTÈME DE RÉFRIGÉRATION | [2011/19] | Entry into regional phase | 01.02.2011 | National basic fee paid | 01.02.2011 | Search fee paid | 01.02.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.02.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.02.2011 | Examination requested [2011/19] | 06.10.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.06.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 19.08.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.12.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.03.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 30.03.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.03.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.11.2018 | Opposition(s) | 09.02.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/15] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 19.08.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 19.08.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.08.2019 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 06.10.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 06.10.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.10.2015 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 22.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.07.2009 | AT | 06.05.2020 | CY | 06.05.2020 | CZ | 06.05.2020 | DK | 06.05.2020 | EE | 06.05.2020 | ES | 06.05.2020 | FI | 06.05.2020 | HR | 06.05.2020 | IT | 06.05.2020 | LT | 06.05.2020 | LV | 06.05.2020 | MC | 06.05.2020 | MK | 06.05.2020 | MT | 06.05.2020 | NL | 06.05.2020 | PL | 06.05.2020 | RO | 06.05.2020 | SE | 06.05.2020 | SI | 06.05.2020 | SK | 06.05.2020 | SM | 06.05.2020 | TR | 06.05.2020 | IE | 01.07.2020 | LU | 01.07.2020 | BE | 31.07.2020 | CH | 31.07.2020 | LI | 31.07.2020 | BG | 06.08.2020 | NO | 06.08.2020 | GR | 07.08.2020 | IS | 06.09.2020 | PT | 07.09.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 01.07.2009 | |
AT | 06.05.2020 | ||
CY | 06.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
MT | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SI | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
TR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IE | 01.07.2020 | ||
LU | 01.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AT | 06.05.2020 | |
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SI | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
TR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IE | 01.07.2020 | ||
LU | 01.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AT | 06.05.2020 | |
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SI | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
IE | 01.07.2020 | ||
LU | 01.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AT | 06.05.2020 | |
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
IE | 01.07.2020 | ||
LU | 01.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/13] | AT | 06.05.2020 | |
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 06.05.2020 | |
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AT | 06.05.2020 | |
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | DK | 06.05.2020 | |
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | FI | 06.05.2020 | |
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 06.05.2020 | |
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 06.05.2020 | |
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 06.05.2020 | |
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 06.05.2020 | |
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 06.09.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]EP1046873 (CARRIER CORP [US]) [Y] 1-5,8,9,13 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0022]; figures 1,2,4-7; claims 1,7,8 * [A] 6,7,14,15; | [Y]US6330909 (TAKAHASHI KOJI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-5,8,9,13 * & corresponding description;; figure 1 *; | [YA]JP2004316934 (AISIN SEIKI) [Y] 1-5,8,9,13 * paragraphs [0010] , [0011] , [0019] - [0022] - [0052] - [0070]; figures 1,4,6 * [A] 6,7,14,15; | [Y]EP1628105 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [Y] 1-5,8,9,13 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO2007046330 (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP], et al) [Y] 1-5,8,9,13 * the whole document *; | [Y]DE102006048821 (BITZER KUEHLMASCHINENBAU GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-5,8,9,13 * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0091]; figure 1 *; | [P]EP1950509 (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP]) | International search | [A]JPH05238306 (THERMO KING CORP); | [A]WO03093737 (BERGSTROM INC [US]); | [A]JP2005349891 (YAMADA YOSHIO) | by applicant | EP1046873 | US6301911 |