EP2367980 - SHOE PRESS BELT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.03.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 24.10.2018 [2018/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Valmet Technologies Oy Keilasatama 5 02150 Espoo / FI | [2016/13] |
Former [2011/39] | For all designated states Metso Fabrics Inc. Yrittäjänkatu 21 33710 Tampere / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAGFORS, Satu Kaurasmäentie 16 D 21 FI-33480 Ylöjärvi / FI | 02 /
RIIHIOJA, Vesa-Matti Vastarannankatu 12 E 21 FI-33610 Tampere / FI | 03 /
OJANEN, Marja Erämiehentie 39 FI-33960 Pirkkala / FI | [2011/39] | Representative(s) | Kolster Oy Ab (Salmisaarenaukio 1) P.O. Box 204 00181 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2013/43] | Kolster Oy Ab Iso Roobertinkatu 23 PO Box 148 00121 Helsinki / FI | ||
Former [2011/39] | Pitkänen, Kirsi-Marja Kolster Oy Ab, Iso Roobertinkatu 23, P.O. Box 148 00121 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 09774685.3 | 10.12.2009 | [2016/18] | WO2009FI50995 | Priority number, date | FI20080006190 | 12.12.2008 Original published format: FI 20086190 | [2011/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010066950 | Date: | 17.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/24] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2367980 | Date: | 28.09.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.06.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2367980 | Date: | 04.05.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | D21H25/00, D21F3/02, C08G18/76, C08G18/48 | [2011/39] | CPC: |
C08G18/7614 (EP,US);
D21F3/0227 (EP,FI,US);
D21F3/02 (KR);
C08G18/10 (EP,FI,US);
C08G18/48 (KR);
C08G18/4854 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08G18/10, C08G18/329 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/18] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHUHPRESSBAND | [2015/43] | English: | SHOE PRESS BELT | [2011/39] | French: | COURROIE DE PRESSE À SABOT | [2011/39] |
Former [2011/39] | SCHUHPRESSENBAND | Entry into regional phase | 20.06.2011 | National basic fee paid | 20.06.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.06.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.01.2011 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/39] | 20.10.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.06.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.09.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.02.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 12.02.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.02.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.06.2015 | Opposition(s) | 07.02.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.12.2009 | BE | 04.05.2016 | BG | 04.05.2016 | CY | 04.05.2016 | CZ | 04.05.2016 | DK | 04.05.2016 | EE | 04.05.2016 | HR | 04.05.2016 | IS | 04.05.2016 | LT | 04.05.2016 | LV | 04.05.2016 | MC | 04.05.2016 | MK | 04.05.2016 | NL | 04.05.2016 | PL | 04.05.2016 | RO | 04.05.2016 | SI | 04.05.2016 | SK | 04.05.2016 | SM | 04.05.2016 | TR | 04.05.2016 | NO | 04.08.2016 | GR | 05.08.2016 | PT | 05.09.2016 | IE | 10.12.2016 | LU | 10.12.2016 | MT | 10.12.2016 | [2018/43] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 10.12.2009 | |
BE | 04.05.2016 | ||
BG | 04.05.2016 | ||
CY | 04.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IS | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
MC | 04.05.2016 | ||
MK | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
PL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
SI | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
SM | 04.05.2016 | ||
TR | 04.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
IE | 10.12.2016 | ||
LU | 10.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 10.12.2009 | |
BE | 04.05.2016 | ||
CY | 04.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IS | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
MC | 04.05.2016 | ||
MK | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
PL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
SI | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
SM | 04.05.2016 | ||
TR | 04.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
IE | 10.12.2016 | ||
LU | 10.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 10.12.2009 | |
BE | 04.05.2016 | ||
CY | 04.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
MC | 04.05.2016 | ||
MK | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
PL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
SI | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
SM | 04.05.2016 | ||
TR | 04.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
IE | 10.12.2016 | ||
LU | 10.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 10.12.2009 | |
BE | 04.05.2016 | ||
CY | 04.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
MC | 04.05.2016 | ||
MK | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
PL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
SI | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
SM | 04.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
IE | 10.12.2016 | ||
LU | 10.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/49] | BE | 04.05.2016 | |
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
MC | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
PL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
SI | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
SM | 04.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
IE | 10.12.2016 | ||
LU | 10.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | BE | 04.05.2016 | |
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
MC | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
PL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
SI | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
SM | 04.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | BE | 04.05.2016 | |
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
PL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
SM | 04.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | BE | 04.05.2016 | |
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
PL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | CZ | 04.05.2016 | |
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | DK | 04.05.2016 | |
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | HR | 04.05.2016 | |
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | LT | 04.05.2016 | |
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 04.05.2016 | |
NO | 04.08.2016 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9413722 (UNIROYAL CHEM CO INC [US]) [X] 1 * page 7, line 6 - page 8, line 9 * * page 13, line 16 - line 17 * * page 18 - page 19 *; | [X]WO9856841 (STOWE WOODWARD COMPANY [US], et al) [X] 1 * page 2, line 21 - line 30 * * page 5, line 8 - page 7, line 3 *; | [X]US2003232954 (GAJEWSKI VINCENT J [US]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0029] *; | [XP]WO2009004122 (TAMFELT PMC OY [FI], et al) [XP] 1 * paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0018] ** claims 1,3,6 * | by applicant | US5134010 | US5609811 | DE19651557 | DE19702138 | US5833898 | EP0877118 | EP0939162 | EP1136618 | US6465074 | EP1338696 | WO2005090429 | FI20055556 | - YANG ET AL., POLYMER, (2003), vol. 44, pages 3251 - 3258 |