EP2353329 - LOAD-ADAPTIVE TERMINATION TARGET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 26.07.2019 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2019 | Refusal of application | published on 28.08.2019 [2019/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM Incorporated Attn: International IP Administration 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2011/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LOTT, Christopher Gerard 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego California 92121-1714 / US | 02 /
ATTAR, Rashid Ahmed Akbar 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego California 92121-1714 / US | 03 /
GHOSH, Donna 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego California 92121-1714 / US | [2011/32] | Representative(s) | Tomkins & Co 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/46] | Skrba, Sinéad, et al Tomkins & Co. 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | ||
Former [2011/32] | Gates, Marie Christina Esther, et al Tomkins & Co. 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | Application number, filing date | 09775032.7 | 01.12.2009 | [2011/32] | WO2009US66222 | Priority number, date | US20080118934P | 01.12.2008 Original published format: US 118934 P | US20090627746 | 30.11.2009 Original published format: US 627746 | [2011/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010065519 | Date: | 10.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2353329 | Date: | 10.08.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.06.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04W52/00, H04W52/04 | [2011/32] | CPC: |
H04W52/343 (EP,US);
H04W52/18 (KR);
H04L1/1825 (EP,US);
H04W52/286 (EP,US);
H04W72/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/32] | Title | German: | LASTADAPTIVES ABSCHLUSSZIEL | [2011/32] | English: | LOAD-ADAPTIVE TERMINATION TARGET | [2011/32] | French: | CIBLE DE TERMINAISON ADAPTATIVE À LA CHARGE | [2011/32] | Entry into regional phase | 26.05.2011 | National basic fee paid | 26.05.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.05.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.05.2011 | Examination requested [2011/32] | 10.01.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.05.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.11.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 27.02.2019 | 27.02.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 11.04.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/35] | 21.04.2019 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/35] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.05.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 07.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [IA]WO2004082228 (QUALCOMM INC [US], et al) [I] 1-26 * abstract * * paragraphs [0005] - [0007] - [0013] - [0015] - [0031] - [0032] - [0038] - [0041] - [0051] , [0073] - [0085] * * figures 1-3,5,6 * [A] 27-33; | [IA]US2007070908 (GHOSH DONNA [US], et al) [I] 1-26 * paragraphs [0054] - [0067] - [0095] - [0115] - [0124] - [0141] - [0151] , [0158] , [0164] , [0171] - [0173] - [0229] - [0241] * * figures 1-17,26,35,36 * [A] 27-33; | [IA] - TOKGOZ Y ET AL, "On the reverse link performance of the CDMA2000 1xEV-DO revision a system with antenna array receivers", GLOBAL TELECOMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE, 2005. GLOBECOM '05. IEEE ST. LOIUS, MO, USA 28 NOV.-2 DEC. 2005, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20051128), vol. 6, ISBN 978-0-7803-9414-8, pages 3373 - 3377, XP010882692 [I] 27-33 * chapter II * [A] 1-26 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/GLOCOM.2005.1578399 | Examination | US2007192090 | US2005265236 | - RASHID ATTAR ET AL, "Reverse Link Load-Adaptive Termination Target", vol. TSGC, (20081204), pages 1 - 5, 3GPP2 DRAFT; C20-20081201-026_QCOM_REVC_LOADADAPTIVETERMINATIONTARGET, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT 2, 3GPP2, 2500 WILSON BOULEVARD, SUITE 300, ARLINGTON, VIRGINIA 22201 ; USA, URL: http://ftp.3gpp2.org/TSGC/Working/2008/2008-12-Maui/TSG-C-2008-12-Maui/WG2/, (20081204), XP062170506 | - BHUSHAN N ET AL, "CDMA2000 1XEV-DO REVISION A: A PHYSICAL LAYER AND MAC LAYER OVERVIEW", IEEE COMMUNICATIONS MAGAZINE, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, US, (20060201), vol. 44, no. 2, doi:10.1109/MCOM.2006.1593549, ISSN 0163-6804, pages 75 - 87, XP001240362 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MCOM.2006.1593549 |