Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP2368118 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2368118



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






All documents(53)
Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 420
20.08.2014 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
18.10.2013 Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC Search / examination 1
19.09.2013 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
03.09.2013 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
03.09.2013 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
03.09.2013 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
03.09.2013 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
02.09.2013 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
02.09.2013 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
02.09.2013 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
02.09.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
02.09.2013 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
02.09.2013 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
26.04.2013 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
26.04.2013 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
26.04.2013 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
26.04.2013 Text intended for grant Search / examination 56
15.03.2013 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
15.03.2013 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
15.03.2013 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
28.02.2013 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 18
28.02.2013 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
26.02.2013 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 18
26.02.2013 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
26.02.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
22.02.2013 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
22.02.2013 Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) Search / examination 1
22.02.2013 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
08.02.2012 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
23.01.2012 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
23.01.2012 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
23.01.2012 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
18.01.2012 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
18.01.2012 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
18.01.2012 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
18.01.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
18.01.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
31.08.2011 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
01.08.2011 Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
12.07.2011 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 8
11.07.2011 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 8
12.03.2011 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 8
22.07.2010 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 59
01.07.2010 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
01.07.2010 Published international application - A1 Search / examination 59
05.03.2010 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII International Searching Authority 2
05.03.2010 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet International Searching Authority 1
05.03.2010 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box International Searching Authority 4
14.12.2009 Abstract PCT receiving Office 1
14.12.2009 Claims PCT receiving Office 4
14.12.2009 Description PCT receiving Office 39
14.12.2009 Drawings PCT receiving Office 15
14.12.2009 Priority document (RO-procedure) PCT receiving Office 58