EP2382255 - LIGHT GUIDES MADE OF THERMOPLASTIC POLYURETHANES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.05.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.06.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.02.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, MK | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [2018/29] |
Former [2011/44] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PRISSOK, Frank Vossweg 4 49448 Lemförde / DE | 02 /
DUWENHORST, Jörn Untere Bergstr. 26 49448 Lemförde / DE | 03 /
HENZE, Oliver Steffen Neue Geest 4 49401 Damme / DE | 04 /
MÜHREN, Oliver Heinrichstr. 27a 49080 Osnabrück / DE | [2011/44] | Representative(s) | BASF IP Association BASF SE G-FLP-C006 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2018/29] |
Former [2011/44] | (deleted) | Application number, filing date | 09775204.2 | 16.12.2009 | [2018/29] | WO2009EP67308 | Priority number, date | EP20080173022 | 29.12.2008 Original published format: EP 08173022 | [2011/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010076224 | Date: | 08.07.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2382255 | Date: | 02.11.2011 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.07.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2382255 | Date: | 18.07.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/66, C08G18/08, C08G18/48, C08G18/75, G02B6/02, G02B1/04, C08G18/32 | [2018/11] | CPC: |
C08G18/0895 (EP,US);
G02B6/02033 (US);
C08G18/3206 (EP,US);
C08G18/4238 (EP,US);
C08G18/4854 (EP,US);
C08G18/6603 (US);
C08G18/664 (EP,US);
C08G18/667 (US);
C08G18/6674 (EP,US);
C08G18/758 (EP,US);
C08G18/7671 (EP,US);
G02B1/045 (EP,US);
G02B6/02038 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2011/44] | C08G18/75, C08G18/76, C08G18/32, C08G18/48, G02B1/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/29] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LICHTLEITER AUS THERMOPLASTISCHEN POLYURETHANEN | [2011/44] | English: | LIGHT GUIDES MADE OF THERMOPLASTIC POLYURETHANES | [2011/44] | French: | GUIDE D'ONDES LUMINEUSES À BASE DE POLYURÉTHANES THERMOPLASTIQUES | [2011/44] | Entry into regional phase | 29.07.2011 | National basic fee paid | 29.07.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.07.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.07.2011 | Examination requested [2011/44] | 27.02.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.01.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.09.2017 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 19.09.2017 | 19.09.2017 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 22.09.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.01.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.06.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 07.06.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.06.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.07.2014 | Opposition(s) | 23.04.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.12.2009 | CY | 18.07.2018 | CZ | 18.07.2018 | DK | 18.07.2018 | EE | 18.07.2018 | FI | 18.07.2018 | HR | 18.07.2018 | LT | 18.07.2018 | LV | 18.07.2018 | MC | 18.07.2018 | MK | 18.07.2018 | MT | 18.07.2018 | NL | 18.07.2018 | PL | 18.07.2018 | PT | 18.07.2018 | RO | 18.07.2018 | SE | 18.07.2018 | SI | 18.07.2018 | SK | 18.07.2018 | SM | 18.07.2018 | TR | 18.07.2018 | BG | 18.10.2018 | NO | 18.10.2018 | GR | 19.10.2018 | IS | 18.11.2018 | AT | 16.12.2018 | IE | 16.12.2018 | LU | 16.12.2018 | BE | 31.12.2018 | CH | 31.12.2018 | LI | 31.12.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/30] | HU | 16.12.2009 | |
CZ | 18.07.2018 | ||
DK | 18.07.2018 | ||
EE | 18.07.2018 | ||
FI | 18.07.2018 | ||
HR | 18.07.2018 | ||
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LV | 18.07.2018 | ||
MC | 18.07.2018 | ||
MT | 18.07.2018 | ||
NL | 18.07.2018 | ||
PL | 18.07.2018 | ||
PT | 18.07.2018 | ||
RO | 18.07.2018 | ||
SE | 18.07.2018 | ||
SI | 18.07.2018 | ||
SK | 18.07.2018 | ||
SM | 18.07.2018 | ||
TR | 18.07.2018 | ||
BG | 18.10.2018 | ||
NO | 18.10.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
AT | 16.12.2018 | ||
IE | 16.12.2018 | ||
LU | 16.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/27] | CZ | 18.07.2018 | |
DK | 18.07.2018 | ||
EE | 18.07.2018 | ||
FI | 18.07.2018 | ||
HR | 18.07.2018 | ||
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LV | 18.07.2018 | ||
MC | 18.07.2018 | ||
MT | 18.07.2018 | ||
NL | 18.07.2018 | ||
PL | 18.07.2018 | ||
PT | 18.07.2018 | ||
RO | 18.07.2018 | ||
SE | 18.07.2018 | ||
SI | 18.07.2018 | ||
SK | 18.07.2018 | ||
SM | 18.07.2018 | ||
TR | 18.07.2018 | ||
BG | 18.10.2018 | ||
NO | 18.10.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
AT | 16.12.2018 | ||
IE | 16.12.2018 | ||
LU | 16.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/23] | CZ | 18.07.2018 | |
DK | 18.07.2018 | ||
EE | 18.07.2018 | ||
FI | 18.07.2018 | ||
HR | 18.07.2018 | ||
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LV | 18.07.2018 | ||
MC | 18.07.2018 | ||
MT | 18.07.2018 | ||
NL | 18.07.2018 | ||
PL | 18.07.2018 | ||
RO | 18.07.2018 | ||
SE | 18.07.2018 | ||
SI | 18.07.2018 | ||
SK | 18.07.2018 | ||
SM | 18.07.2018 | ||
TR | 18.07.2018 | ||
BG | 18.10.2018 | ||
NO | 18.10.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
AT | 16.12.2018 | ||
IE | 16.12.2018 | ||
LU | 16.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | CZ | 18.07.2018 | |
DK | 18.07.2018 | ||
EE | 18.07.2018 | ||
FI | 18.07.2018 | ||
HR | 18.07.2018 | ||
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LV | 18.07.2018 | ||
MC | 18.07.2018 | ||
MT | 18.07.2018 | ||
NL | 18.07.2018 | ||
PL | 18.07.2018 | ||
RO | 18.07.2018 | ||
SE | 18.07.2018 | ||
SI | 18.07.2018 | ||
SK | 18.07.2018 | ||
SM | 18.07.2018 | ||
TR | 18.07.2018 | ||
BG | 18.10.2018 | ||
NO | 18.10.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
IE | 16.12.2018 | ||
LU | 16.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | CZ | 18.07.2018 | |
DK | 18.07.2018 | ||
EE | 18.07.2018 | ||
FI | 18.07.2018 | ||
HR | 18.07.2018 | ||
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LV | 18.07.2018 | ||
MC | 18.07.2018 | ||
MT | 18.07.2018 | ||
NL | 18.07.2018 | ||
PL | 18.07.2018 | ||
RO | 18.07.2018 | ||
SE | 18.07.2018 | ||
SI | 18.07.2018 | ||
SK | 18.07.2018 | ||
SM | 18.07.2018 | ||
BG | 18.10.2018 | ||
NO | 18.10.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
IE | 16.12.2018 | ||
LU | 16.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/04] | CZ | 18.07.2018 | |
DK | 18.07.2018 | ||
EE | 18.07.2018 | ||
FI | 18.07.2018 | ||
HR | 18.07.2018 | ||
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LV | 18.07.2018 | ||
MC | 18.07.2018 | ||
NL | 18.07.2018 | ||
PL | 18.07.2018 | ||
RO | 18.07.2018 | ||
SE | 18.07.2018 | ||
SI | 18.07.2018 | ||
SK | 18.07.2018 | ||
SM | 18.07.2018 | ||
BG | 18.10.2018 | ||
NO | 18.10.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
IE | 16.12.2018 | ||
LU | 16.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | CZ | 18.07.2018 | |
DK | 18.07.2018 | ||
EE | 18.07.2018 | ||
FI | 18.07.2018 | ||
HR | 18.07.2018 | ||
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LV | 18.07.2018 | ||
MC | 18.07.2018 | ||
NL | 18.07.2018 | ||
PL | 18.07.2018 | ||
RO | 18.07.2018 | ||
SE | 18.07.2018 | ||
SI | 18.07.2018 | ||
SK | 18.07.2018 | ||
SM | 18.07.2018 | ||
BG | 18.10.2018 | ||
NO | 18.10.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
IE | 16.12.2018 | ||
LU | 16.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/48] | CZ | 18.07.2018 | |
DK | 18.07.2018 | ||
EE | 18.07.2018 | ||
FI | 18.07.2018 | ||
HR | 18.07.2018 | ||
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LV | 18.07.2018 | ||
MC | 18.07.2018 | ||
NL | 18.07.2018 | ||
PL | 18.07.2018 | ||
RO | 18.07.2018 | ||
SE | 18.07.2018 | ||
SI | 18.07.2018 | ||
SK | 18.07.2018 | ||
SM | 18.07.2018 | ||
BG | 18.10.2018 | ||
NO | 18.10.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
IE | 16.12.2018 | ||
LU | 16.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | CZ | 18.07.2018 | |
DK | 18.07.2018 | ||
EE | 18.07.2018 | ||
FI | 18.07.2018 | ||
HR | 18.07.2018 | ||
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LV | 18.07.2018 | ||
MC | 18.07.2018 | ||
NL | 18.07.2018 | ||
PL | 18.07.2018 | ||
RO | 18.07.2018 | ||
SE | 18.07.2018 | ||
SI | 18.07.2018 | ||
SK | 18.07.2018 | ||
SM | 18.07.2018 | ||
BG | 18.10.2018 | ||
NO | 18.10.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
LU | 16.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/39] | CZ | 18.07.2018 | |
DK | 18.07.2018 | ||
EE | 18.07.2018 | ||
FI | 18.07.2018 | ||
HR | 18.07.2018 | ||
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LV | 18.07.2018 | ||
NL | 18.07.2018 | ||
PL | 18.07.2018 | ||
RO | 18.07.2018 | ||
SE | 18.07.2018 | ||
SI | 18.07.2018 | ||
SK | 18.07.2018 | ||
SM | 18.07.2018 | ||
BG | 18.10.2018 | ||
NO | 18.10.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
LU | 16.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | CZ | 18.07.2018 | |
DK | 18.07.2018 | ||
EE | 18.07.2018 | ||
FI | 18.07.2018 | ||
HR | 18.07.2018 | ||
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LV | 18.07.2018 | ||
NL | 18.07.2018 | ||
PL | 18.07.2018 | ||
RO | 18.07.2018 | ||
SE | 18.07.2018 | ||
SI | 18.07.2018 | ||
SK | 18.07.2018 | ||
SM | 18.07.2018 | ||
BG | 18.10.2018 | ||
NO | 18.10.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | CZ | 18.07.2018 | |
DK | 18.07.2018 | ||
EE | 18.07.2018 | ||
FI | 18.07.2018 | ||
HR | 18.07.2018 | ||
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LV | 18.07.2018 | ||
NL | 18.07.2018 | ||
PL | 18.07.2018 | ||
RO | 18.07.2018 | ||
SE | 18.07.2018 | ||
SK | 18.07.2018 | ||
SM | 18.07.2018 | ||
BG | 18.10.2018 | ||
NO | 18.10.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | CZ | 18.07.2018 | |
EE | 18.07.2018 | ||
FI | 18.07.2018 | ||
HR | 18.07.2018 | ||
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LV | 18.07.2018 | ||
NL | 18.07.2018 | ||
PL | 18.07.2018 | ||
RO | 18.07.2018 | ||
SE | 18.07.2018 | ||
SK | 18.07.2018 | ||
BG | 18.10.2018 | ||
NO | 18.10.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | CZ | 18.07.2018 | |
FI | 18.07.2018 | ||
HR | 18.07.2018 | ||
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LV | 18.07.2018 | ||
NL | 18.07.2018 | ||
PL | 18.07.2018 | ||
RO | 18.07.2018 | ||
SE | 18.07.2018 | ||
BG | 18.10.2018 | ||
NO | 18.10.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | FI | 18.07.2018 | |
HR | 18.07.2018 | ||
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LV | 18.07.2018 | ||
NL | 18.07.2018 | ||
PL | 18.07.2018 | ||
SE | 18.07.2018 | ||
BG | 18.10.2018 | ||
NO | 18.10.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | FI | 18.07.2018 | |
HR | 18.07.2018 | ||
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
NL | 18.07.2018 | ||
PL | 18.07.2018 | ||
SE | 18.07.2018 | ||
BG | 18.10.2018 | ||
NO | 18.10.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | FI | 18.07.2018 | |
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
NL | 18.07.2018 | ||
PL | 18.07.2018 | ||
SE | 18.07.2018 | ||
BG | 18.10.2018 | ||
NO | 18.10.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 18.07.2018 | |
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
NL | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.10.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 18.07.2018 | |
NL | 18.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/04] | NL | 18.07.2018 | Cited in | International search | [X]US4915473 (HAESE NATHAN N [US], et al) [X] 1-9 * page 2, line 48 - page 3, line 62; example 1; claim 4 *; | [X]EP1197505 (TALEX OPTICAL CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-5 * paragraphs [0012] - [0019]; examples 1-3 *; | [A]US4621113 (COLLINS GUY R [US]) [A] 1-9 * column 3, line 10 - column 4, line 23; examples 1,3; table 13 *; | [PX]EP2036933 (MITSUI CHEMICALS POLYURETHANES [JP]) [PX] 1,2,4,5 * paragraphs [0005] , [0015] - [0017]; examples 2,3 * | Examination | US3620905 | EP1302491 | EP0603675 | EP1090940 |