|
22.12.2021 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.03.2021 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.01.2021 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.01.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.01.2021 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.01.2021 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
06.01.2021 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
17.09.2020 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.09.2020 |
Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.09.2020 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.09.2020 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
16.09.2020 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
16.09.2020 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
18.06.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.06.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
18.06.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.06.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.06.2020 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.02.2020 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.02.2020 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.01.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.01.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.01.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.01.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.01.2020 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
19.09.2019 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.09.2019 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.02.2019 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.02.2019 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.02.2019 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
04.02.2019 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
04.02.2019 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.11.2018 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.11.2018 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.11.2018 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.03.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.03.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
19.03.2018 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.03.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
19.03.2018 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.03.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.03.2018 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
29.01.2018 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
29.01.2018 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.06.2017 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.10.2016 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.10.2016 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.07.2016 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.07.2016 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
19.07.2016 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.06.2016 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
17.02.2016 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.02.2016 |
Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure |
Search / examination |
33 |
|
09.02.2016 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.12.2015 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.12.2015 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.08.2013 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.08.2013 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.08.2013 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.07.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.07.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.07.2012 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.07.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.07.2012 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
15.03.2012 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
15.03.2012 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.09.2011 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.06.2011 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
17.05.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.05.2011 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
17.05.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
17.05.2011 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.05.2011 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
17.05.2011 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.05.2011 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
26.04.2011 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.07.2010 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
29 |
|
17.06.2010 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.06.2010 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
05.03.2010 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
05.03.2010 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
05.03.2010 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
18.12.2009 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
18.12.2009 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
18.12.2009 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
12 |
|
18.12.2009 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
2 |