EP2313488 - STRAIN OF ENTOMOPATHOGENIC FUNGUS ISARIA FUMOSOROSEA CCM 8367 (CCEFO.011.PFR) AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING INSECT AND MITE PESTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/17] | STRAIN OF ENTOMOPATHOGENIC FUNGUS ISARIA FUMOSOROSEA CCM 8367 (CCEFO.011.PFR) AND THE METHOD FOR CONTROLLING INSECT AND MITE PESTS | ||
[2015/02] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.03.2016 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Biology Centre AV CR, v.v.i. Branisovska 1160/31 370 05 Ceske Budejovice / CZ | [2015/18] |
Former [2014/37] | For all designated states Biology Centre AS CR, v.v.i. Branisovska 1160/31 370 05 Ceske Budejovice / CZ | ||
Former [2011/17] | For all designated states Biology Centre As Cr, V.v.i. Branisovska 31 37005 Ceske Budejovice / CZ | ||
For all designated states Prenerova, Eva Olesna 87 398 43 Bernartice u Milevska / CZ | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PRENEROVA, Eva Olesna 87 398 43 Bernartice u Milevska / CZ | 02 /
ZEMEK, Rostislav Hodejovicka 337 370 08 Stare Hodejovice / CZ | 03 /
VOLTER, Lubomír Manetinska 21 323 00 Plzen / CZ | 04 /
WEYDA, Frantisek Vetrna 72/1454 370 05 Ceske Budejovice / CZ | [2011/17] | Representative(s) | Beetz & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstraße 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/18] | Beetz & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Steinsdorfstraße 10 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/17] | Beetz & Partner Patentanwälte Steinsdorfstrasse 10 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09775812.2 | 23.06.2009 | [2011/17] | WO2009CZ00088 | Priority number, date | CZ20080000394 | 23.06.2008 Original published format: CZ 20080394 | [2011/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010006563 | Date: | 21.01.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2313488 | Date: | 27.04.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.01.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2313488 | Date: | 29.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.01.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C12N1/14, A01N63/04 | [2011/17] | CPC: |
C12N1/14 (EP,US);
C12N1/145 (EP,US);
A01N63/30 (EP,US);
C12R2001/645 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/18] |
Former [2011/17] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | STAMM DES ENTOMOPATHOGENEN PILZES ISARIA FUMOSOROSEA CCM 8367 (CCEFO.011.PFR) UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEKÄMPFUNG VON INSEKTEN- UND MILBEN-SCHÄDLINGEN | [2011/17] | English: | STRAIN OF ENTOMOPATHOGENIC FUNGUS ISARIA FUMOSOROSEA CCM 8367 (CCEFO.011.PFR) AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING INSECT AND MITE PESTS | [2015/02] | French: | SOUCHE DU CHAMPIGNON ENTOMOPATHOGÈNE ISARIA FUMOSOROSEA CCM 8367 (CCEFO.011.PFR) ET PROCÉDÉ POUR LUTTER CONTRE LES INSECTES ET LES ACARIENS NUISIBLES | [2011/17] |
Former [2011/17] | STRAIN OF ENTOMOPATHOGENIC FUNGUS ISARIA FUMOSOROSEA CCM 8367 (CCEFO.011.PFR) AND THE METHOD FOR CONTROLLING INSECT AND MITE PESTS | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 24.01.2011 | National basic fee paid | 24.01.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.01.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.01.2011 | Examination requested [2011/17] | 18.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.01.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.03.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 20.03.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.03.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.07.2013 | Opposition(s) | 01.02.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.06.2009 | AT | 29.04.2015 | BG | 29.04.2015 | CY | 29.04.2015 | CZ | 29.04.2015 | DK | 29.04.2015 | EE | 29.04.2015 | ES | 29.04.2015 | FI | 29.04.2015 | HR | 29.04.2015 | IT | 29.04.2015 | LT | 29.04.2015 | LV | 29.04.2015 | MC | 29.04.2015 | MK | 29.04.2015 | MT | 29.04.2015 | PL | 29.04.2015 | RO | 29.04.2015 | SE | 29.04.2015 | SI | 29.04.2015 | SK | 29.04.2015 | TR | 29.04.2015 | IE | 23.06.2015 | LU | 23.06.2015 | CH | 30.06.2015 | LI | 30.06.2015 | GB | 29.07.2015 | NO | 29.07.2015 | GR | 30.07.2015 | IS | 29.08.2015 | PT | 31.08.2015 | [2018/30] |
Former [2017/39] | HU | 23.06.2009 | |
AT | 29.04.2015 | ||
BG | 29.04.2015 | ||
CY | 29.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2015 | ||
DK | 29.04.2015 | ||
EE | 29.04.2015 | ||
ES | 29.04.2015 | ||
FI | 29.04.2015 | ||
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
MC | 29.04.2015 | ||
MT | 29.04.2015 | ||
PL | 29.04.2015 | ||
RO | 29.04.2015 | ||
SE | 29.04.2015 | ||
SI | 29.04.2015 | ||
SK | 29.04.2015 | ||
TR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IE | 23.06.2015 | ||
LU | 23.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
GB | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 29.04.2015 | |
CZ | 29.04.2015 | ||
DK | 29.04.2015 | ||
EE | 29.04.2015 | ||
ES | 29.04.2015 | ||
FI | 29.04.2015 | ||
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
MC | 29.04.2015 | ||
MT | 29.04.2015 | ||
PL | 29.04.2015 | ||
RO | 29.04.2015 | ||
SI | 29.04.2015 | ||
SK | 29.04.2015 | ||
IE | 23.06.2015 | ||
LU | 23.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
GB | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 29.04.2015 | |
CZ | 29.04.2015 | ||
DK | 29.04.2015 | ||
EE | 29.04.2015 | ||
ES | 29.04.2015 | ||
FI | 29.04.2015 | ||
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
MC | 29.04.2015 | ||
PL | 29.04.2015 | ||
RO | 29.04.2015 | ||
SI | 29.04.2015 | ||
SK | 29.04.2015 | ||
IE | 23.06.2015 | ||
LU | 23.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
GB | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 29.04.2015 | |
CZ | 29.04.2015 | ||
DK | 29.04.2015 | ||
EE | 29.04.2015 | ||
ES | 29.04.2015 | ||
FI | 29.04.2015 | ||
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
MC | 29.04.2015 | ||
PL | 29.04.2015 | ||
RO | 29.04.2015 | ||
SK | 29.04.2015 | ||
IE | 23.06.2015 | ||
LU | 23.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
GB | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 29.04.2015 | |
CZ | 29.04.2015 | ||
DK | 29.04.2015 | ||
EE | 29.04.2015 | ||
ES | 29.04.2015 | ||
FI | 29.04.2015 | ||
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
MC | 29.04.2015 | ||
PL | 29.04.2015 | ||
RO | 29.04.2015 | ||
SK | 29.04.2015 | ||
IE | 23.06.2015 | ||
LU | 23.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 29.04.2015 | |
CZ | 29.04.2015 | ||
DK | 29.04.2015 | ||
EE | 29.04.2015 | ||
ES | 29.04.2015 | ||
FI | 29.04.2015 | ||
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
MC | 29.04.2015 | ||
PL | 29.04.2015 | ||
RO | 29.04.2015 | ||
SK | 29.04.2015 | ||
IE | 23.06.2015 | ||
LU | 23.06.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | AT | 29.04.2015 | |
CZ | 29.04.2015 | ||
DK | 29.04.2015 | ||
EE | 29.04.2015 | ||
ES | 29.04.2015 | ||
FI | 29.04.2015 | ||
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
MC | 29.04.2015 | ||
PL | 29.04.2015 | ||
RO | 29.04.2015 | ||
SK | 29.04.2015 | ||
LU | 23.06.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | AT | 29.04.2015 | |
DK | 29.04.2015 | ||
EE | 29.04.2015 | ||
ES | 29.04.2015 | ||
FI | 29.04.2015 | ||
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
MC | 29.04.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | AT | 29.04.2015 | |
DK | 29.04.2015 | ||
ES | 29.04.2015 | ||
FI | 29.04.2015 | ||
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 29.04.2015 | |
DK | 29.04.2015 | ||
ES | 29.04.2015 | ||
FI | 29.04.2015 | ||
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/51] | AT | 29.04.2015 | |
ES | 29.04.2015 | ||
FI | 29.04.2015 | ||
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | ES | 29.04.2015 | |
FI | 29.04.2015 | ||
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | ES | 29.04.2015 | |
FI | 29.04.2015 | ||
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0494592 (GRACE W R & CO [US], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2007059765 (UNIV GOETTINGEN GEORG AUGUST [DE], et al) [A] 2* the whole document *; | [X] - ZEMEK ROSTISLAV ET AL, "Perspectives for the biological control of Cameraria ohridella.", COMMUNICATIONS IN AGRICULTURAL AND APPLIED BIOLOGICAL SCIENCES, (2007), vol. 72, no. 3, ISSN 1379-1176, pages 521 - 526, XP008114865 [X] 1-3 * the whole document * * CONCLUSIONS * | [X] - ZEMEK ROSTISLAV ET AL, "The first record of entomopathogenic fungus Paecilomyces fumosoroseus (Deuteromycota : Hyphomycetes) on the hibernating pupae of Cameraria ohridella (Lepidoptera : Gracillariidae)", ENTOMOLOGICAL RESEARCH, (200708), vol. 37, no. Suppl. 1, ISSN 1738-2297, pages A135 - A136, XP008114913 [X] 1-3 * the whole document * | [Y] - RICHTER DOREEN ET AL, "Pathogenicity of entomopathogenic fungi on hibernating pupae of Cameraria ohridella Deschka & Dimic 1986 (Lepidoptera, Gracillariidae). Part 1: Pathogenicity against the naked pupa.", COMMUNICATIONS IN AGRICULTURAL AND APPLIED BIOLOGICAL SCIENCES, (2007), vol. 72, no. 3, ISSN 1379-1176, pages 399 - 410, XP008114864 [Y] 1-3 * the whole document * | [Y] - RICHTER DOREEN ET AL, "Pathogenicity of entomopathogenic fungi on hibernating pupae of Cameraria ohridella Deschka & Dimic 1986 (Lepidoptera, Gracillariidae). Part 2: Efficacy of entomopathogenic fungi against pupa in her pupal cell.", COMMUNICATIONS IN AGRICULTURAL AND APPLIED BIOLOGICAL SCIENCES, (2007), vol. 72, no. 3, ISSN 1379-1176, pages 411 - 421, XP008114863 [Y] 1-3 * the whole document * | [Y] - KALMUS M ET AL, "Efficacy of entomopathogenic fungi against eggs and larvae of the horse chestnut leafminer Cameraria ohridella", JOURNAL OF PLANT DISEASES AND PROTECTION, (200704), vol. 114, no. 2, ISSN 1861-3829, page 92, XP001537307 [Y] 1-3 * the whole document * | [A] - CANTONE ET AL, "Intraspecific diversity in Paecilomyces fumosoroseus", MYCOLOGICAL RESEARCH, ELSEVIER, GB, (19980201), vol. 102, no. 2, ISSN 0953-7562, pages 209 - 215, XP022451572 [A] 1 * abstract * * table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1017/S0953756297004590 | [A] - FARGUES ET AL, "Genetic variability among Paecilomyces fumosoroseus isolates from various geographical and host insect origins based on the rDNA-ITS regions", MYCOLOGICAL RESEARCH, (20020901), vol. 106, no. 9, ISSN 0953-7562, pages 1066 - 1074, XP022474272 [A] 1 * abstract * * table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1017/S0953756202006408 | by applicant | - R. ZEMEK ET AL., COMM. APPL. BIOL. SCI., (2007), vol. 72, no. 3, page 521 | - R. ZEMEK, ENTOMOLOGICAL RESEARCH, (200708), vol. 37, no. 1, pages A135 - A136 | - D. RICHTER ET AL., COMM. APPL. BIOL. SCI., (2007), vol. 72, no. 3, pages 399 - 410 | - D. RICHTER ET AL., COMM. APPL. BIOL. SCI., (2007), vol. 72, no. 3, pages 411 - 421 | - M. KALMUS; C. BUTTNER, JOURNAL OF PLANT DISEASES AND PROTECTION, (200704), vol. 114, no. 2, page 92 |