EP2303697 - AUTOMATIC SYSTEM FOR MANOEUVRING AIRCRAFT ON THE GROUND [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 12.05.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.09.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH, LI | published on 25.10.2017 [2017/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Becker, Andreas Liegnitzer Strasse 2 42897 Remscheid / DE | For all designated states Bergerhoff, Eckhard Alte Heide 26 51377 Leverkusen / DE | [2011/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Becker, Andreas Liegnitzer Strasse 2 42897 Remscheid / DE | [2012/51] | Representative(s) | Füssel, Michael Lönsstrasse 55 42289 Wuppertal / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 09775959.1 | 09.07.2009 | [2011/14] | WO2009DE00974 | Priority number, date | DE20081035342 | 29.07.2008 Original published format: DE102008035342 | [2011/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010012261 | Date: | 04.02.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/05] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2303697 | Date: | 06.04.2011 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.02.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2303697 | Date: | 19.12.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B64F1/22 | [2011/14] | CPC: |
B64F1/227 (EP,US);
B64F1/22 (US);
B64F1/228 (EP,US);
G08G5/06 (EP,US);
Y02T50/80 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/14] | Title | German: | AUTOMATISCHES SYSTEM ZUM MANÖVRIEREN VON LUFTFAHRZEUGEN AM BODEN | [2011/14] | English: | AUTOMATIC SYSTEM FOR MANOEUVRING AIRCRAFT ON THE GROUND | [2011/14] | French: | SYSTÈME AUTOMATIQUE UTILISÉ POUR LA MANOEUVRE D'AÉRONEFS AU SOL | [2011/14] | Entry into regional phase | 03.01.2011 | National basic fee paid | 03.01.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.01.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.12.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.01.2011 | Examination requested [2011/14] | 03.09.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.09.2012 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 15.10.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.11.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 08.11.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.09.2012 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
19.09.2013
24.09.2013
ADMISSIBLE Israel Aerospace Industries Ltd. Ben Gurion International Airport 70100 Lod / IL Opponent's representative Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB, et al, et al Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/44] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
19.09.2013
24.09.2013
ADMISSIBLE Israel Aerospace Industries Ltd. Ben Gurion International Airport 70100 Lod / IL Opponent's representative Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser, et al, et al Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | 28.10.2013 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 31.01.2014 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 18.06.2015 | Date of oral proceedings | 28.07.2015 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 28.07.2015 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 08.03.2017 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2017/24] | Appeal following opposition | 24.09.2015 | Appeal received No. T1985/15 | 24.09.2015 | Statement of grounds filed | 08.03.2017 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor inadmissible | 08.03.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 21.03.2017 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.07.2009 | CH | 19.12.2012 | CY | 19.12.2012 | CZ | 19.12.2012 | DK | 19.12.2012 | EE | 19.12.2012 | FI | 19.12.2012 | HR | 19.12.2012 | IT | 19.12.2012 | LI | 19.12.2012 | LT | 19.12.2012 | LV | 19.12.2012 | MC | 19.12.2012 | MK | 19.12.2012 | MT | 19.12.2012 | PL | 19.12.2012 | RO | 19.12.2012 | SE | 19.12.2012 | SI | 19.12.2012 | SK | 19.12.2012 | SM | 19.12.2012 | TR | 19.12.2012 | BG | 19.03.2013 | NO | 19.03.2013 | GR | 20.03.2013 | ES | 30.03.2013 | IS | 19.04.2013 | PT | 19.04.2013 | IE | 09.07.2013 | LU | 09.07.2013 | [2017/43] |
Former [2015/36] | HU | 09.07.2009 | |
CY | 19.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.12.2012 | ||
DK | 19.12.2012 | ||
EE | 19.12.2012 | ||
FI | 19.12.2012 | ||
HR | 19.12.2012 | ||
IT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
MC | 19.12.2012 | ||
MK | 19.12.2012 | ||
MT | 19.12.2012 | ||
PL | 19.12.2012 | ||
RO | 19.12.2012 | ||
SE | 19.12.2012 | ||
SI | 19.12.2012 | ||
SK | 19.12.2012 | ||
SM | 19.12.2012 | ||
TR | 19.12.2012 | ||
BG | 19.03.2013 | ||
NO | 19.03.2013 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
ES | 30.03.2013 | ||
IS | 19.04.2013 | ||
PT | 19.04.2013 | ||
IE | 09.07.2013 | ||
LU | 09.07.2013 | ||
Former [2015/34] | HU | 09.07.2009 | |
CY | 19.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.12.2012 | ||
DK | 19.12.2012 | ||
EE | 19.12.2012 | ||
FI | 19.12.2012 | ||
HR | 19.12.2012 | ||
IT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
MC | 19.12.2012 | ||
MK | 19.12.2012 | ||
MT | 19.12.2012 | ||
NL | 19.12.2012 | ||
PL | 19.12.2012 | ||
RO | 19.12.2012 | ||
SE | 19.12.2012 | ||
SI | 19.12.2012 | ||
SK | 19.12.2012 | ||
SM | 19.12.2012 | ||
TR | 19.12.2012 | ||
BG | 19.03.2013 | ||
NO | 19.03.2013 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
ES | 30.03.2013 | ||
IS | 19.04.2013 | ||
PT | 19.04.2013 | ||
IE | 09.07.2013 | ||
LU | 09.07.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | CY | 19.12.2012 | |
CZ | 19.12.2012 | ||
DK | 19.12.2012 | ||
EE | 19.12.2012 | ||
FI | 19.12.2012 | ||
HR | 19.12.2012 | ||
IT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
MC | 19.12.2012 | ||
MK | 19.12.2012 | ||
MT | 19.12.2012 | ||
NL | 19.12.2012 | ||
PL | 19.12.2012 | ||
RO | 19.12.2012 | ||
SE | 19.12.2012 | ||
SI | 19.12.2012 | ||
SK | 19.12.2012 | ||
SM | 19.12.2012 | ||
TR | 19.12.2012 | ||
BG | 19.03.2013 | ||
NO | 19.03.2013 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
ES | 30.03.2013 | ||
IS | 19.04.2013 | ||
PT | 19.04.2013 | ||
IE | 09.07.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 19.12.2012 | |
CZ | 19.12.2012 | ||
DK | 19.12.2012 | ||
EE | 19.12.2012 | ||
FI | 19.12.2012 | ||
HR | 19.12.2012 | ||
IT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
MC | 19.12.2012 | ||
NL | 19.12.2012 | ||
PL | 19.12.2012 | ||
RO | 19.12.2012 | ||
SE | 19.12.2012 | ||
SI | 19.12.2012 | ||
SK | 19.12.2012 | ||
SM | 19.12.2012 | ||
BG | 19.03.2013 | ||
NO | 19.03.2013 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
ES | 30.03.2013 | ||
IS | 19.04.2013 | ||
PT | 19.04.2013 | ||
IE | 09.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | CY | 19.12.2012 | |
CZ | 19.12.2012 | ||
DK | 19.12.2012 | ||
EE | 19.12.2012 | ||
FI | 19.12.2012 | ||
HR | 19.12.2012 | ||
IT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
MC | 19.12.2012 | ||
NL | 19.12.2012 | ||
PL | 19.12.2012 | ||
RO | 19.12.2012 | ||
SE | 19.12.2012 | ||
SI | 19.12.2012 | ||
SK | 19.12.2012 | ||
BG | 19.03.2013 | ||
NO | 19.03.2013 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
ES | 30.03.2013 | ||
IS | 19.04.2013 | ||
PT | 19.04.2013 | ||
IE | 09.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | CY | 19.12.2012 | |
CZ | 19.12.2012 | ||
DK | 19.12.2012 | ||
EE | 19.12.2012 | ||
FI | 19.12.2012 | ||
HR | 19.12.2012 | ||
IT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
MC | 19.12.2012 | ||
NL | 19.12.2012 | ||
PL | 19.12.2012 | ||
RO | 19.12.2012 | ||
SE | 19.12.2012 | ||
SI | 19.12.2012 | ||
SK | 19.12.2012 | ||
BG | 19.03.2013 | ||
NO | 19.03.2013 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
ES | 30.03.2013 | ||
IS | 19.04.2013 | ||
PT | 19.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/03] | CY | 19.12.2012 | |
CZ | 19.12.2012 | ||
DK | 19.12.2012 | ||
EE | 19.12.2012 | ||
FI | 19.12.2012 | ||
HR | 19.12.2012 | ||
IT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
NL | 19.12.2012 | ||
PL | 19.12.2012 | ||
RO | 19.12.2012 | ||
SE | 19.12.2012 | ||
SI | 19.12.2012 | ||
SK | 19.12.2012 | ||
BG | 19.03.2013 | ||
NO | 19.03.2013 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
ES | 30.03.2013 | ||
IS | 19.04.2013 | ||
PT | 19.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | CY | 19.12.2012 | |
CZ | 19.12.2012 | ||
DK | 19.12.2012 | ||
EE | 19.12.2012 | ||
FI | 19.12.2012 | ||
HR | 19.12.2012 | ||
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
NL | 19.12.2012 | ||
PL | 19.12.2012 | ||
RO | 19.12.2012 | ||
SE | 19.12.2012 | ||
SI | 19.12.2012 | ||
SK | 19.12.2012 | ||
BG | 19.03.2013 | ||
NO | 19.03.2013 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
ES | 30.03.2013 | ||
IS | 19.04.2013 | ||
PT | 19.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | CZ | 19.12.2012 | |
DK | 19.12.2012 | ||
EE | 19.12.2012 | ||
FI | 19.12.2012 | ||
HR | 19.12.2012 | ||
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
NL | 19.12.2012 | ||
PL | 19.12.2012 | ||
RO | 19.12.2012 | ||
SE | 19.12.2012 | ||
SI | 19.12.2012 | ||
SK | 19.12.2012 | ||
BG | 19.03.2013 | ||
NO | 19.03.2013 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
ES | 30.03.2013 | ||
IS | 19.04.2013 | ||
PT | 19.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | CZ | 19.12.2012 | |
EE | 19.12.2012 | ||
FI | 19.12.2012 | ||
HR | 19.12.2012 | ||
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
NL | 19.12.2012 | ||
PL | 19.12.2012 | ||
RO | 19.12.2012 | ||
SE | 19.12.2012 | ||
SI | 19.12.2012 | ||
SK | 19.12.2012 | ||
BG | 19.03.2013 | ||
NO | 19.03.2013 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
ES | 30.03.2013 | ||
IS | 19.04.2013 | ||
PT | 19.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | CZ | 19.12.2012 | |
EE | 19.12.2012 | ||
FI | 19.12.2012 | ||
HR | 19.12.2012 | ||
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
NL | 19.12.2012 | ||
PL | 19.12.2012 | ||
RO | 19.12.2012 | ||
SE | 19.12.2012 | ||
SI | 19.12.2012 | ||
SK | 19.12.2012 | ||
BG | 19.03.2013 | ||
NO | 19.03.2013 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
ES | 30.03.2013 | ||
IS | 19.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | CZ | 19.12.2012 | |
EE | 19.12.2012 | ||
FI | 19.12.2012 | ||
HR | 19.12.2012 | ||
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
PL | 19.12.2012 | ||
SE | 19.12.2012 | ||
SI | 19.12.2012 | ||
SK | 19.12.2012 | ||
BG | 19.03.2013 | ||
NO | 19.03.2013 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
ES | 30.03.2013 | ||
IS | 19.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CZ | 19.12.2012 | |
EE | 19.12.2012 | ||
FI | 19.12.2012 | ||
HR | 19.12.2012 | ||
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
SE | 19.12.2012 | ||
SI | 19.12.2012 | ||
SK | 19.12.2012 | ||
BG | 19.03.2013 | ||
NO | 19.03.2013 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
ES | 30.03.2013 | ||
IS | 19.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | FI | 19.12.2012 | |
HR | 19.12.2012 | ||
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
SE | 19.12.2012 | ||
SI | 19.12.2012 | ||
BG | 19.03.2013 | ||
NO | 19.03.2013 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
ES | 30.03.2013 | ||
IS | 19.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | FI | 19.12.2012 | |
HR | 19.12.2012 | ||
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
SE | 19.12.2012 | ||
SI | 19.12.2012 | ||
NO | 19.03.2013 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
ES | 30.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | FI | 19.12.2012 | |
HR | 19.12.2012 | ||
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
SE | 19.12.2012 | ||
NO | 19.03.2013 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
ES | 30.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | FI | 19.12.2012 | |
HR | 19.12.2012 | ||
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
SE | 19.12.2012 | ||
NO | 19.03.2013 | ||
ES | 30.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 19.12.2012 | |
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
SE | 19.12.2012 | ||
NO | 19.03.2013 | ||
ES | 30.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/21] | LT | 19.12.2012 | |
SE | 19.12.2012 | ||
NO | 19.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/20] | LT | 19.12.2012 | |
NO | 19.03.2013 | Cited in | International search | [Y]GB527994 (OWEN FINDLAY MACLAREN); | [X]EP0206038 (KRAUSS MAFFEI AG [DE]); | [X]FR2675919 (AEROSPATIALE [FR], et al); | [Y]US5845975 (WELLS TREVOR CHARLES [GB]); | [XI]US6305484 (LEBLANC EDWARD L [CA]); | [XYI]US2008083851 (PERRY ARIE [IL], et al) |