EP2304259 - BEARING RING AND METHOD FOR COOLING A BEARING RING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.11.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MTU Aero Engines AG Dachauer Strasse 665 80995 München / DE | [2013/45] |
Former [2011/14] | For all designated states MTU Aero Engines GmbH Dachauer Strasse 665 80995 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FLOUROS, Michael Fürstenriederstrasse 141 80686 München / DE | [2011/14] | Application number, filing date | 09776034.2 | 30.07.2009 | [2011/14] | WO2009DE01064 | Priority number, date | DE20081036196 | 02.08.2008 Original published format: DE102008036196 | [2011/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010015233 | Date: | 11.02.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2304259 | Date: | 06.04.2011 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.02.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2304259 | Date: | 08.01.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.02.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F16C37/00 | [2011/14] | CPC: |
F16C37/007 (EP,US);
F16C27/045 (EP,US);
F16C33/586 (EP,US);
F16C19/06 (EP,US);
F16C2240/42 (EP,US);
F16C2300/02 (EP,US);
F16C33/6659 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/14] | Title | German: | LAGERRING UND VERFAHREN ZUM KÜHLEN EINES LAGERRINGS | [2011/14] | English: | BEARING RING AND METHOD FOR COOLING A BEARING RING | [2011/14] | French: | BAGUE DE PALIER ET PROCÉDÉ DE REFROIDISSEMENT D'UNE BAGUE DE PALIER | [2011/14] | Entry into regional phase | 16.12.2010 | National basic fee paid | 16.12.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.12.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.12.2010 | Examination requested [2011/14] | 19.04.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.03.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.07.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.09.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.11.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 26.11.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.03.2013 | Opposition(s) | 09.10.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2013 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   29.08.2013 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.07.2009 | BG | 08.01.2014 | CY | 08.01.2014 | CZ | 08.01.2014 | DK | 08.01.2014 | EE | 08.01.2014 | ES | 08.01.2014 | FI | 08.01.2014 | HR | 08.01.2014 | IT | 08.01.2014 | LT | 08.01.2014 | LV | 08.01.2014 | MC | 08.01.2014 | MK | 08.01.2014 | MT | 08.01.2014 | NL | 08.01.2014 | PL | 08.01.2014 | RO | 08.01.2014 | SE | 08.01.2014 | SI | 08.01.2014 | SK | 08.01.2014 | SM | 08.01.2014 | TR | 08.01.2014 | NO | 08.04.2014 | GR | 09.04.2014 | IS | 08.05.2014 | PT | 08.05.2014 | AT | 30.07.2014 | IE | 30.07.2014 | LU | 30.07.2014 | BE | 31.07.2014 | CH | 31.07.2014 | LI | 31.07.2014 | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/33] | HU | 30.07.2009 | |
BG | 08.01.2014 | ||
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
IT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
MC | 08.01.2014 | ||
MT | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
PL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
SI | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
SM | 08.01.2014 | ||
TR | 08.01.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
GR | 09.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
AT | 30.07.2014 | ||
IE | 30.07.2014 | ||
LU | 30.07.2014 | ||
BE | 31.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 30.07.2009 | |
BG | 08.01.2014 | ||
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
IT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
MC | 08.01.2014 | ||
MT | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
PL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
SI | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
SM | 08.01.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
GR | 09.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
AT | 30.07.2014 | ||
IE | 30.07.2014 | ||
LU | 30.07.2014 | ||
BE | 31.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2016/29] | BG | 08.01.2014 | |
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
IT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
MC | 08.01.2014 | ||
MT | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
PL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
SI | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
SM | 08.01.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
GR | 09.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
AT | 30.07.2014 | ||
IE | 30.07.2014 | ||
LU | 30.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | BG | 08.01.2014 | |
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
MC | 08.01.2014 | ||
MT | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
PL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
SI | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
SM | 08.01.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
GR | 09.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
AT | 30.07.2014 | ||
IE | 30.07.2014 | ||
LU | 30.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CY | 08.01.2014 | |
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
MC | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
PL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
SI | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
SM | 08.01.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
AT | 30.07.2014 | ||
IE | 30.07.2014 | ||
LU | 30.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2016/21] | CY | 08.01.2014 | |
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
MC | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
PL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
SI | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
AT | 30.07.2014 | ||
IE | 30.07.2014 | ||
LU | 30.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/51] | CY | 08.01.2014 | |
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
PL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
SI | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
AT | 30.07.2014 | ||
IE | 30.07.2014 | ||
LU | 30.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/37] | CY | 08.01.2014 | |
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
PL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
SI | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
IE | 30.07.2014 | ||
LU | 30.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 08.01.2014 | |
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
PL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
SI | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
LU | 30.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | CY | 08.01.2014 | |
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
PL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
LU | 30.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/13] | CY | 08.01.2014 | |
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
PL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
LU | 30.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 08.01.2014 | |
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
PL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 08.01.2014 | |
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 08.01.2014 | |
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | CY | 08.01.2014 | |
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/39] | CY | 08.01.2014 | |
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | CY | 08.01.2014 | |
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | LT | 08.01.2014 | |
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | Cited in | International search | [XY]DE102005029075 (SKF AB [SE]) [X] 1,2,5 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0038]; figure - * [Y] 3,4,6; | [YA]US6293703 (DATE TAKAO [JP]) [Y] 3 * column 5, line 3 - column 10, line 4; figure - * [A] 1; | [Y]GB2187239 (KLOECKNER HUMBOLDT DEUTZ AG) [Y] 4 * the whole document *; | [Y]GB2111136 (ROLLS ROYCE) [Y] 6 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2004104434 (MTU AERO ENGINES GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1,3 * page 2, line 15 - page 3, line 16; figure - *; | [A]US969763 (NEWMANN JOHN [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US2744796 (WALTERS MICHAEL E) [A] 1 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE102005029075 | US6293703 |