17.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] |
03.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] |
08.05.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.06.2015 [2015/24] |
01.08.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.09.2014 [2014/36] |
11.04.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.05.2014 [2014/20] |
22.11.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.12.2013 [2013/52] |
30.08.2013 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 02.10.2013 [2013/40] |
09.08.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.09.2013 [2013/37] |
26.07.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.08.2013 [2013/35] |
19.07.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.08.2013 [2013/34] |
07.06.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.07.2013 [2013/28] |
24.05.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.06.2013 [2013/26] |
10.05.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.06.2013 [2013/24] |
03.05.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.06.2013 [2013/23] |
26.04.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.05.2013 [2013/22] |
19.04.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.05.2013 [2013/21] |
21.09.2012 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 24.10.2012 [2012/43] |
21.09.2012 |
Change - applicant |
published on 24.10.2012 [2012/43] |
21.09.2012 |
Change - inventor |
published on 24.10.2012 [2012/43] |
19.09.2012 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
19.09.2012 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
20.07.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.05.2012 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
22.12.2011 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
21.10.2011 |
Change - extension states |
published on 23.11.2011 [2011/47] |
15.08.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.05.2011 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 29.06.2011 [2011/26] |
27.05.2011 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 29.06.2011 [2011/26] |
13.05.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.07.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.06.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.03.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.02.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.01.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.01.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|