EP2352835 - Clostridium sporosphaeroides for production of biogas from biomass [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/32] | CLOSTRIDIUM SPOROSPAEROIDES FOR THE TREATMENT OF BIOMASS | ||
[2012/26] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.07.2013 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK, MT, TR | published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schmack Biogas GmbH Bayernwerk 8 92421 Schwandorf / DE | [2012/36] |
Former [2011/32] | For all designated states Schmack Biogas GmbH Bayerwerk 8 92421 Schwandorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REUTER, Monika Lessingstrasse 14 84561 Mehring / DE | 02 /
VATER, Daniel Bautzener Strasse 57 02953 Bad Muskau / DE | 03 /
DUCHOW, Vera Friedrich-Gauss Weg 7 88471 Laupheim / DE | [2011/42] |
Former [2011/32] | 01 /
REUTER, Monika Carl-Orff-Strasse 32 84503 Altötting / DE | ||
02 /
VATER, Daniel Bautzener Strasse 57 02953 Bad Muskau / DE | |||
03 /
DUCHOW, Vera Friedrich-Gauss Weg 7 88471 Laupheim / DE | Representative(s) | Glück Kritzenberger Patentanwälte PartGmbB Franz-Mayer-Str. 16a 93053 Regensburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/13] | Graf Glück Kritzenberger Hermann-Köhl-Strasse 2a 93049 Regensburg / DE | ||
Former [2012/36] | Graf Glück Habersack Kritzenberger Postfach 10 08 26 93008 Regensburg / DE | ||
Former [2011/32] | Graf Glück Habersack Kritzenberger Postfach 10 08 26 93008 Regensburg / DE | ||
Former [2011/32] | Graf Glück Habersack Kritzenberger Hermann-Köhl-Straße 2a 93049 Regensburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 09776142.3 | 07.07.2009 | [2011/32] | WO2009DE75035 | Priority number, date | WO2008DE75017 | 23.12.2008 Original published format: PCT/DE2008/075017 | DE20091003587 | 07.03.2009 Original published format: DE102009003587 | [2011/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010072219 | Date: | 01.07.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2352835 | Date: | 10.08.2011 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.07.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2352835 | Date: | 05.09.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C12P5/02, C02F11/04, C12N1/20 | [2012/26] | CPC: |
C12P5/023 (EP,US);
C12N1/205 (EP,US);
C12R2001/145 (EP,US);
Y02E50/10 (EP,US);
Y02E50/30 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/32] | C12P5/02, C02F11/04, C12P7/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/32] | Title | German: | Clostridium sporosphaeroides zur Erzeugung von Biogas aus Biomasse | [2012/26] | English: | Clostridium sporosphaeroides for production of biogas from biomass | [2012/26] | French: | Clostridium sporosphaeroides pour la production de biogaz à partir de la biomasse | [2012/26] |
Former [2011/32] | CLOSTRIDIUM SPOROSPHAEROIDES ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON BIOMASSE | ||
Former [2011/32] | CLOSTRIDIUM SPOROSPAEROIDES FOR THE TREATMENT OF BIOMASS | ||
Former [2011/32] | CLOSTRIDIUM SPOROSPHAEROIDES POUR TRAITER DE LA BIOMASSE | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 03.05.2011 | National basic fee paid | 03.05.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.05.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.05.2011 | Examination requested [2011/32] | 29.06.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.01.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.05.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.06.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.07.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 13.07.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.01.2012 | Opposition(s) | 06.06.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 05.09.2012 | EE | 05.09.2012 | FI | 05.09.2012 | MC | 05.09.2012 | MK | 05.09.2012 | MT | 05.09.2012 | RO | 05.09.2012 | SE | 05.09.2012 | SK | 05.09.2012 | SM | 05.09.2012 | TR | 05.09.2012 | BG | 05.12.2012 | NO | 05.12.2012 | GR | 06.12.2012 | ES | 16.12.2012 | IS | 05.01.2013 | PT | 07.01.2013 | [2015/32] |
Former [2015/24] | CY | 05.09.2012 | |
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
MC | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
SM | 05.09.2012 | ||
BG | 05.12.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
ES | 16.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
PT | 07.01.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | CY | 05.09.2012 | |
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
MC | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
BG | 05.12.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
ES | 16.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
PT | 07.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | CY | 05.09.2012 | |
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
BG | 05.12.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
ES | 16.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
PT | 07.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/46] | EE | 05.09.2012 | |
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
BG | 05.12.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
ES | 16.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
PT | 07.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | EE | 05.09.2012 | |
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
BG | 05.12.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
PT | 07.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | EE | 05.09.2012 | |
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
PT | 07.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | EE | 05.09.2012 | |
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | EE | 05.09.2012 | |
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/12] | FI | 05.09.2012 | |
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | FI | 05.09.2012 | |
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | FI | 05.09.2012 | |
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | NO | 05.12.2012 | Cited in | International search | [XA]WO2006056819 (UNIV SZEGED [HU], et al) [X] 1-3,10-14,16-19,21-23,25 * abstract * * page 1, line 1 - page 5, line 3 * * page 6, line 1 - page 8, line 24 * * page 17; figure 12; example 8 * [A] 4-9,15,20,35-53; | [X]CA2258254 (BALU ANDRE [CA], et al) [X] 1-3,10-14,16-19,21-23,25 * abstract * * page 3, paragraph I * * pages 6-13, paragraphs D,E *; | [X]WO2007052306 (GANGOTREE RESOURCE DEVELOPERS [IN], et al) [X] 1-3,10-14,16-19,21-23,25 * abstract * * pages 4-7, lines 89-192 *; | [X]WO2006119052 (ANAEROBE SYSTEMS [US], et al) [X] 1-3,10-14,16-19,21-23,25,26 * paragraphs [0001] , [0004] , [0009] , [0010] , [0013] , [0014] * * page 6, lines 9,11 * * examples 1,2 * * claims 1,2,6,7,14-27,30 *; | [X] - NIELSEN HENRIK BANGSO ET AL, "Bioaugmentation of a two-stage thermophilic (68 degrees C/55 degrees C) anaerobic digestion concept for improvement of the methane yield from cattle manure", BIOTECHNOLOGY AND BIOENGINEERING, (200708), vol. 97, no. 6, ISSN 0006-3592, pages 1638 - 1643, XP002538156 [X] 1-3,10-14,16-19,21-23,25 * abstract * * page 1639, column 2, paragraph 2 * * page 1641, column 1, paragraph 4 - page 1642, column 2, paragraph 2; figure 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/BIT.21342 | [X] - "Uncultured Clostridiales bacterium clone 1099982248072 16S ribosomal RNA gene, partial sequence", EMBL, (20070321), Database accession no. EF434352, XP002538673 [X] 29-31 * column A * | [A] - LIU W-T ET AL, "Characterization of microbial community in granular sludge treating brewery wastewater", WATER RESEARCH, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20020401), vol. 36, no. 7, ISSN 0043-1354, pages 1767 - 1775, XP004347949 [A] 1-15,20-27,29-53 * abstract * * page 1769, paragraph 2.5. - page 1773, column 2, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0043-1354(01)00377-3 | [PA] - KRÖBER MAGDALENA ET AL, "Phylogenetic characterization of a biogas plant microbial community integrating clone library 16S-rDNA sequences and metagenome sequence data obtained by 454-pyrosequencing.", JOURNAL OF BIOTECHNOLOGY, (20090601), vol. 142, no. 1, ISSN 1873-4863, pages 38 - 49, XP002538671 [PA] 1-15,20-27,29-53 * abstract * * page 40, column 2, paragraph 2 - page 42, column 1, paragraph 1; figures 1,2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/J.JBIOTEC.2009.02.010 | [A] - SNEATH P H A ET AL (EDS.), Bergey's manual of systematic bacteriology, Volume 2, Section 13: Endospore-forming Gram-positive rods and cocci, WILLIAMS & WILKINS, BALTIMORE, USA, (1986), XP002538672 [A] 1-15,20-27,29-53 * page 1151; table 13.13 * * pages 1192-93, paragraph 70. * | [A] - QUENTMEIER A ET AL, "CHARACTERIZATION OF CITRATE LYASE FROM CLOSTRIDIUM-SPOROSPHAEROIDES", BIOSIS, BIOSCIENCES INFORMATION SERVICE, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, (1985), Database accession no. PREV198579108063, XP002538674 [A] 1-15,20-27,29-53 * abstract * | [ ] - ARCHIVES OF MICROBIOLOGY, (1985), vol. 141, no. 1, ISSN 0302-8933, pages 85 - 90 | [A] - WILDE E ET AL, "Clostridium pascui sp. nov., a new glutamate-fermenting sporeformer from a pasture in Pakistan.", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF SYSTEMATIC BACTERIOLOGY, (199701), vol. 47, no. 1, ISSN 0020-7713, pages 164 - 170, XP002538670 [A] 1-15,20-27,29-53 * page 167, column 1, paragraph 2; table 1 * | [A] - STENGL S ET AL, "Betriebsstabilität von Biogasanlagen", ETA ENERGIE, Succidia AG, Darmstadt, Deutschland, no. 3, (2007), pages 30 - 33, URL: http://www.succidia.de/n_energie.html, (20070107), XP002562310 [A] 12 * page 31, column 1, paragraph 2 * | [A] - SNEATH P H A ET AL, "Bergey's manual of systematic bacteriology, Endospore-forming Gram-positive rods and cocci", BERGEY'S MANUAL OF SYSTEMATIC BACTERIOLOGY, WILLIAMS & WILKINS, BALTIMORE, USA, (19860101), vol. 2, ISBN 978-0-683-07893-0, pages 1154,1187 - 1188, XP002538393 [A] 16,17,28 * page 1154; table 13.14 * * pages 1187-88, paragraph 63. * | [PA] - HU B ET AL, "Changes in microbial community composition following treatment of methanogenic granules with chloroform", ENVIRONMENTAL PROGRESS & SUSTAINABLE ENERGY, JOHN WILEY & SONS, INC, US, vol. 28, no. 1, ISSN 1944-7442, (20090401), pages 60 - 71, (20090217), XP002538843 [PA] 16,17,28 * abstract * * page 65, column 2, paragraph 1 - page 67, column 1, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/EP.10338 | [A] - SNEATH P H A ET AL, "Bergey's manual of systematic bacteriology, Endospore-forming Gram-positive rods and cocci", BERGEY'S MANUAL OF SYSTEMATIC BACTERIOLOGY, WILLIAMS & WILKINS, BALTIMORE, USA, (19860101), vol. 2, ISBN 978-0-683-07893-0, pages 1118,1123 - 1124,1133, XP002539295 [A] 18,19 * page 1118, column 2, paragraphs 7,8 * * tables 13.4,13.6 * * page 1133, paragraph 21. * | [A] - VAN HEERDEN I ET AL, "Microbial, chemical and physical aspects of citrus waste composting", BIORESOURCE TECHNOLOGY, ELSEVIER BV, GB, (20020101), vol. 81, no. 1, ISSN 0960-8524, pages 71 - 76, XP002539293 [A] 18,19 * abstract * * page 73, column 2, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0960-8524(01)00058-X | [A] - RYCKEBOER J ET AL, "Microbiological aspects of biowaste during composting in a monitored compost bin", JOURNAL OF APPLIED MICROBIOLOGY, OXFORD, GB, (20030101), vol. 94, no. 1, ISSN 1364-5072, pages 127 - 137, XP002539294 [A] 18,19 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1365-2672.2003.01800.x | Examination | - "C. sartagoforme-Einsatz in Biogasanlagen", ISF SCHAUMANN FORSCHUNG, (20120113), pages 1 - 6, XP007920122 | by applicant | WO2006056819 | CA2258254 | WO2007052306 | WO2006119052 | - NIELSEN H. B. ET AL., BIOTECHNOLOGY AND BIOENGINEERING, (2007), vol. 97, no. 6, pages 1638 - 1643 | - HANS G. SCHLEGEL, Allgemeine Mikrobiologie, GEORG THIEME VERLAG, (1992), vol. 7, page 205 |