Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP2398668
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
30.12.2016 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 01.02.2017 [2017/05] |
22.09.2016 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
07.04.2016 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
25.02.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.02.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.02.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.02.2013 |
Change - applicant |
published on 13.03.2013 [2013/11] |
21.04.2012 |
Change - extension states |
published on 23.05.2012 [2012/21] |
13.04.2012 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
24.02.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.11.2011 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 28.12.2011 [2011/52] |
25.11.2011 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 28.12.2011 [2011/52] |
26.08.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.08.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.08.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.09.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.08.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.01.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.01.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|