Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP2344711
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
11.03.2016 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 13.04.2016 [2016/15] |
04.12.2015 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
31.08.2015 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
12.05.2015 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
01.05.2015 |
First examination report |
|
28.02.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.02.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.03.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.03.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.01.2012 |
Change - extension states |
published on 15.02.2012 [2012/07] |
15.12.2011 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
19.08.2011 |
Change - inventor |
published on 21.09.2011 [2011/38] |
17.06.2011 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 20.07.2011 [2011/29] |
17.06.2011 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 20.07.2011 [2011/29] |
04.04.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.03.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.06.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.05.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.01.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.01.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|