EP2344709 - LOAD-ABSORBING DEVICE FOR INTRODUCING LOAD FORCES, IN PARTICULAR CABLE FORCES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.03.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.04.2016 [2016/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CARL STAHL GMBH Postweg 41 73079 Süssen / DE | [2011/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIEFER, Michael Mögginger Steig 19 78315 Radolfzelde / DE | [2011/38] |
Former [2011/29] | 01 /
KIEFER, Michael Fritz-Reichle-Ring 8 78315 Radolfzelde / DE | Representative(s) | Bartels, Martin Erich Arthur Patentanwälte Bartels und Partner Lange Strasse 51 70174 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/29] | Bartels, Martin Erich Arthur Patentanwälte Bartels und Partner Lange Strasse 51 70174 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 09776487.2 | 27.03.2009 | [2011/29] | WO2009EP02254 | Priority number, date | DE20082014951U | 11.11.2008 Original published format: DE 202008014951 U | DE20092001107U | 29.01.2009 Original published format: DE 202009001107 U | [2011/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010054704 | Date: | 20.05.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2344709 | Date: | 20.07.2011 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.05.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | E04F10/02, E04H15/58, E04H15/32, F16C11/06 | [2011/29] | CPC: |
F16C11/0623 (EP,US);
E04H15/58 (EP,US);
Y10T403/32 (EP,US);
Y10T403/32631 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/29] | Title | German: | LASTAUFNAHMEVORRICHTUNG ZUM EINLEITEN VON LASTKRÄFTEN, INSBESONDERE VON SEILKRÄFTEN | [2011/29] | English: | LOAD-ABSORBING DEVICE FOR INTRODUCING LOAD FORCES, IN PARTICULAR CABLE FORCES | [2011/29] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE SUSPENSION DE CHARGE POUR INTRODUIRE DES FORCES DE CHARGES, EN PARTICULIER DES FORCES DE CÂBLES | [2011/29] | Entry into regional phase | 17.03.2011 | National basic fee paid | 17.03.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.03.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/29] | 07.12.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.04.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/15] | 04.12.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/15] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.04.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE2913703 (VKI RHEINHOLD & MAHLA GMBH) [X] 1-3 * figure 1 * * page 4, line 27 - page 5, line 5 * * page 9, line 9 - line 13 *; | [X]DE4019396 (LIEBCHEN LARS GUNNAR [DE]) [X] 1-3 * figure 2 * * column 2, line 58 - line 68 *; | [X]DE4329574 (RUMMEL WERNER [DE]) [X] 1-3 * figure 7 * * column 3, line 23 - line 25 *; | [X]DE20007374U (GUNDEL BRABETZ YACHTING GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-3 * figure 4 * * page 2, line 1 - line 2 *; | [X]FR2884239 (RENAULT SAS [FR]) [X] 1-3* figure 4 * |