EP2297993 - PROTECTING A MOBILE DEVICE AGAINST A DENIAL OF SERVICE ATTACK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.07.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.07.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.02.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke KPN N.V. Wilhelminakade 123 3072 AP Rotterdam / NL | For all designated states Nederlandse Organisatie voor toegepast- natuurwetenschappelijk onderzoek TNO Anna van Buerenplein 1 2595 DA 's-Gravenhage / NL | [2018/24] |
Former [2011/12] | For all designated states Koninklijke KPN N.V. Maanplein 55 2516 CK The Hague / NL | ||
For all designated states Nederlandse Organisatie voor Toegepast -Natuurwetenschappelijk Onderzoek TNO Schoemakerstraat 97 2628 VK Delft / NL | |||
Former [2011/12] | For all designated states Nederlandse Organisatie voor Toegepast- Natuurwetenschappelijk Onderzoek TNO Schoemakerstraat 97 2628 VK Delft / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAARAKKERS, Jeroen Hof van Loosduinen 3 NL-2631 WK Nootdorp / NL | 02 /
MULLER, Frank Hopstraat 59 NL-2611 TB Delft / NL | [2011/12] | Representative(s) | Wuyts, Koenraad Maria Koninklijke KPN N.V. Intellectual Property Group P.O. Box 25110 3001 HC Rotterdam / NL | [2019/32] |
Former [2011/12] | Wuyts, Koenraad Maria Koninklijke KPN N.V., Intellectual Property Group, P.O. Box 95321 2509 CH Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 09776754.5 | 16.06.2009 | [2011/12] | WO2009EP04352 | Priority number, date | EP20080010876 | 16.06.2008 Original published format: EP 08010876 | [2011/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010003525 | Date: | 14.01.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/02] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2297993 | Date: | 23.03.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.01.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2297993 | Date: | 07.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04W12/12, H04L29/06, // H04W88/02 | [2019/08] | CPC: |
H04L63/1458 (EP,US);
H04W12/128 (EP,US);
H04W88/02 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/12] | H04W12/12, H04L29/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/32] |
Former [2011/12] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | SCHUTZ EINER MOBILEN VORRICHTUNG GEGEN ABLEHNUNG EINES DIENSTANGRIFFS | [2019/08] | English: | PROTECTING A MOBILE DEVICE AGAINST A DENIAL OF SERVICE ATTACK | [2011/12] | French: | PROTECTION D'UN DISPOSITIF MOBILE CONTRE UNE ATTAQUE DE REFUS DE SERVICE | [2019/11] |
Former [2011/12] | SCHUTZ EINER MOBILEN VORRICHTUNG VOR DoS-ANGRIFFEN | ||
Former [2011/12] | PROTECTION D UN DISPOSITIF MOBILE CONTRE UNE ATTAQUE ENTRAÎNANT UN REFUS DE SERVICE | Entry into regional phase | 17.01.2011 | National basic fee paid | 17.01.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.01.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.01.2011 | Examination requested [2011/12] | 10.05.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 27.05.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.08.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.03.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.05.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 13.05.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.05.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.08.2017 | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/32] | Request for further processing for: | 27.05.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 27.05.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.09.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 02.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 01.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.06.2009 | AT | 07.08.2019 | CY | 07.08.2019 | CZ | 07.08.2019 | DK | 07.08.2019 | EE | 07.08.2019 | ES | 07.08.2019 | FI | 07.08.2019 | HR | 07.08.2019 | IT | 07.08.2019 | LT | 07.08.2019 | LV | 07.08.2019 | MC | 07.08.2019 | MK | 07.08.2019 | MT | 07.08.2019 | PL | 07.08.2019 | RO | 07.08.2019 | SE | 07.08.2019 | SI | 07.08.2019 | SK | 07.08.2019 | TR | 07.08.2019 | BG | 07.11.2019 | NO | 07.11.2019 | GR | 08.11.2019 | IS | 07.12.2019 | PT | 09.12.2019 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 16.06.2009 | |
AT | 07.08.2019 | ||
CY | 07.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 07.08.2019 | ||
DK | 07.08.2019 | ||
EE | 07.08.2019 | ||
ES | 07.08.2019 | ||
FI | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
IT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
MC | 07.08.2019 | ||
MT | 07.08.2019 | ||
PL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RO | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
SI | 07.08.2019 | ||
SK | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
IS | 07.12.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
Former [2021/12] | AT | 07.08.2019 | |
CZ | 07.08.2019 | ||
DK | 07.08.2019 | ||
EE | 07.08.2019 | ||
ES | 07.08.2019 | ||
FI | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
IT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
MC | 07.08.2019 | ||
PL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RO | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
SI | 07.08.2019 | ||
SK | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
IS | 07.12.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AT | 07.08.2019 | |
CZ | 07.08.2019 | ||
DK | 07.08.2019 | ||
EE | 07.08.2019 | ||
ES | 07.08.2019 | ||
FI | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
IT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
PL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RO | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
SI | 07.08.2019 | ||
SK | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
IS | 07.12.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AT | 07.08.2019 | |
CZ | 07.08.2019 | ||
DK | 07.08.2019 | ||
EE | 07.08.2019 | ||
ES | 07.08.2019 | ||
FI | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
IT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
PL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RO | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
SK | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
IS | 07.12.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AT | 07.08.2019 | |
CZ | 07.08.2019 | ||
DK | 07.08.2019 | ||
EE | 07.08.2019 | ||
ES | 07.08.2019 | ||
FI | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
IT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
PL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RO | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
SK | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AT | 07.08.2019 | |
DK | 07.08.2019 | ||
EE | 07.08.2019 | ||
ES | 07.08.2019 | ||
FI | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
IT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
PL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RO | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AT | 07.08.2019 | |
DK | 07.08.2019 | ||
EE | 07.08.2019 | ||
ES | 07.08.2019 | ||
FI | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
IT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
PL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RO | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
IS | 07.12.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/22] | DK | 07.08.2019 | |
EE | 07.08.2019 | ||
ES | 07.08.2019 | ||
FI | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
IS | 07.12.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | ES | 07.08.2019 | |
FI | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
IS | 07.12.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | ES | 07.08.2019 | |
FI | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
IS | 07.12.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | ES | 07.08.2019 | |
FI | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | FI | 07.08.2019 | |
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 07.08.2019 | |
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 07.08.2019 | |
NO | 07.11.2019 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP1413980 (SCHLUMBERGER SYSTEMS & SERVICE [FR]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0007] ** paragraph [0015] *; | [I]US2005064859 (KOTZIN MICHAEL D [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * figures 1,2,4 * * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0041] *; | [A]US2006010314 (XU YONGYONG [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0031] * |