EP2443728 - POWER SUPPLY CONNECTED IN PARALLEL TO A POWER SWITCH FOR THE CONTROL CIRCUIT THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.03.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | [2013/11] |
Former [2012/17] | For all designated states Siemens AG Wittelsbacher Platz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STAHLHUT, Nils Schulstrasse 15 91341 Röttenbach / DE | [2012/17] | Application number, filing date | 09776847.7 | 16.06.2009 | WO2009EP04616 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010145682 | Date: | 23.12.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2443728 | Date: | 25.04.2012 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2443728 | Date: | 15.05.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H02M1/096 | [2012/17] | CPC: |
H02M1/096 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2012/17] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PARALLEL ZUM LEISTUNGSSCHALTER GESCHALTETE STROMVERSORGUNG FÜR DESSEN STEUERSCHALTUNG | [2012/17] | English: | POWER SUPPLY CONNECTED IN PARALLEL TO A POWER SWITCH FOR THE CONTROL CIRCUIT THEREOF | [2012/17] | French: | ALIMENTATION EN COURANT MONTÉE EN PARALLÈLE AVEC UN COMMUTATEUR DE PUISSANCE POUR SON CIRCUIT DE COMMANDE | [2012/17] | Entry into regional phase | 24.11.2011 | National basic fee paid | 24.11.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.11.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.11.2011 | Examination requested [2012/17] | 25.07.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.12.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.04.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 04.04.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.12.2012 | Opposition(s) | 18.02.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.06.2009 | CY | 15.05.2013 | CZ | 15.05.2013 | DK | 15.05.2013 | EE | 15.05.2013 | FI | 15.05.2013 | HR | 15.05.2013 | IT | 15.05.2013 | LT | 15.05.2013 | LV | 15.05.2013 | MC | 15.05.2013 | MK | 15.05.2013 | MT | 15.05.2013 | NL | 15.05.2013 | PL | 15.05.2013 | RO | 15.05.2013 | SI | 15.05.2013 | SK | 15.05.2013 | TR | 15.05.2013 | IE | 16.06.2013 | LU | 16.06.2013 | BE | 30.06.2013 | BG | 15.08.2013 | NO | 15.08.2013 | GR | 16.08.2013 | ES | 26.08.2013 | IS | 15.09.2013 | PT | 16.09.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | CY | 15.05.2013 | |
CZ | 15.05.2013 | ||
DK | 15.05.2013 | ||
EE | 15.05.2013 | ||
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
HR | 15.05.2013 | ||
IT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LV | 15.05.2013 | ||
MC | 15.05.2013 | ||
MK | 15.05.2013 | ||
MT | 15.05.2013 | ||
NL | 15.05.2013 | ||
PL | 15.05.2013 | ||
RO | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
SK | 15.05.2013 | ||
TR | 15.05.2013 | ||
IE | 16.06.2013 | ||
BE | 30.06.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
NO | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
ES | 26.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2015/30] | CY | 15.05.2013 | |
CZ | 15.05.2013 | ||
DK | 15.05.2013 | ||
EE | 15.05.2013 | ||
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
HR | 15.05.2013 | ||
IT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LV | 15.05.2013 | ||
MC | 15.05.2013 | ||
MT | 15.05.2013 | ||
NL | 15.05.2013 | ||
PL | 15.05.2013 | ||
RO | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
SK | 15.05.2013 | ||
IE | 16.06.2013 | ||
BE | 30.06.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
NO | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
ES | 26.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2015/13] | CZ | 15.05.2013 | |
DK | 15.05.2013 | ||
EE | 15.05.2013 | ||
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
HR | 15.05.2013 | ||
IT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LV | 15.05.2013 | ||
MC | 15.05.2013 | ||
MT | 15.05.2013 | ||
NL | 15.05.2013 | ||
PL | 15.05.2013 | ||
RO | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
SK | 15.05.2013 | ||
IE | 16.06.2013 | ||
BE | 30.06.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
NO | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
ES | 26.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | CZ | 15.05.2013 | |
DK | 15.05.2013 | ||
EE | 15.05.2013 | ||
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
HR | 15.05.2013 | ||
IT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LV | 15.05.2013 | ||
MC | 15.05.2013 | ||
NL | 15.05.2013 | ||
PL | 15.05.2013 | ||
RO | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
SK | 15.05.2013 | ||
IE | 16.06.2013 | ||
BE | 30.06.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
NO | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
ES | 26.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | CZ | 15.05.2013 | |
DK | 15.05.2013 | ||
EE | 15.05.2013 | ||
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
HR | 15.05.2013 | ||
IT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LV | 15.05.2013 | ||
MC | 15.05.2013 | ||
NL | 15.05.2013 | ||
PL | 15.05.2013 | ||
RO | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
SK | 15.05.2013 | ||
BE | 30.06.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
NO | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
ES | 26.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | CZ | 15.05.2013 | |
DK | 15.05.2013 | ||
EE | 15.05.2013 | ||
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
HR | 15.05.2013 | ||
IT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LV | 15.05.2013 | ||
MC | 15.05.2013 | ||
NL | 15.05.2013 | ||
PL | 15.05.2013 | ||
RO | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
SK | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
NO | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
ES | 26.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CZ | 15.05.2013 | |
DK | 15.05.2013 | ||
EE | 15.05.2013 | ||
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
HR | 15.05.2013 | ||
IT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LV | 15.05.2013 | ||
PL | 15.05.2013 | ||
RO | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
SK | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
NO | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
ES | 26.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CZ | 15.05.2013 | |
DK | 15.05.2013 | ||
EE | 15.05.2013 | ||
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
HR | 15.05.2013 | ||
LT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LV | 15.05.2013 | ||
PL | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
SK | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
NO | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
ES | 26.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | DK | 15.05.2013 | |
EE | 15.05.2013 | ||
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
HR | 15.05.2013 | ||
LT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LV | 15.05.2013 | ||
PL | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
NO | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
ES | 26.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/02] | FI | 15.05.2013 | |
HR | 15.05.2013 | ||
LT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LV | 15.05.2013 | ||
PL | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
NO | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
ES | 26.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | FI | 15.05.2013 | |
HR | 15.05.2013 | ||
LT | 15.05.2013 | ||
PL | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
NO | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
ES | 26.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | FI | 15.05.2013 | |
LT | 15.05.2013 | ||
PL | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
NO | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
ES | 26.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | FI | 15.05.2013 | |
LT | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
NO | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
ES | 26.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | LT | 15.05.2013 | |
NO | 15.08.2013 | ||
ES | 26.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 15.05.2013 | |
NO | 15.08.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | Cited in | International search | [DA]DE10045093 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [DA] 1-9 * abstract * * figures 1,2 * * paragraph [0040] *; | [A]US3961204 (LEOWALD KARL-FRIEDRICH, et al) [A] 1-9 * figure 1 * * abstract *; | [A]EP0271687 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [A] 1-9 * figure 1 *; | [DA]EP0868014 (ABB AB [SE]) [DA] 1-9 * figures 3-9 * | by applicant | US3961204 | EP0271687 | EP0868014 |