EP2445677 - SOLDER ROD, SOLDERING OF HOLES, METHOD FOR COATING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.07.2013 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.08.2013 [2013/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | [2013/11] |
Former [2012/18] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LADRU, Francis-Jurjen Havelschanze 41 13587 Berlin / DE | 02 /
REICH, Gerhard Holsteinische Str. 38 10717 Berlin / DE | 03 /
WOLLNIK, Adrian Feldstr. 9 13585 Berlin / DE | [2012/18] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2013/23] |
Former [2012/18] | Wolff, Harry Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09776855.0 | 26.06.2009 | WO2009EP04646 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010149189 | Date: | 29.12.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2445677 | Date: | 02.05.2012 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.12.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B23K3/06, B23K35/40 | [2012/18] | CPC: |
B23K3/0623 (EP,US);
B23K35/0227 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12493 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12535 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12861 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12944 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2012/18] | Title | German: | LÖTGUTSTÄBCHEN, BELOTUNG VON LÖCHERN, VERFAHREN ZUM BESCHICHTEN | [2012/18] | English: | SOLDER ROD, SOLDERING OF HOLES, METHOD FOR COATING | [2012/18] | French: | BARRETTES DE BRASAGE, BRASAGE DE TROUS, PROCÉDÉ DE REVÊTEMENT | [2012/18] | Entry into regional phase | 22.11.2011 | National basic fee paid | 22.11.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.11.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.11.2011 | Examination requested [2012/18] | 10.02.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.01.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/32] | 26.02.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2012 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]GB119096 (JONES ERNEST HENRY [GB]) [X] 1,2,7,9* figure 4; claim 1 *; | [X]WO9315870 (AMERICAN IRON & METAL COMPANY [CA]) [X] 1,2,7,9 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [XY]US5957365 (ANTHON ROYCE A [US]) [X] 1,2,7,9 * column 3, line 34 - line 43; figures 1, 2 * [Y] 13-20,22,23; | [XY]EP1772594 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 12 * figure 2; claim 1 * [Y] 13-20,22,23 |