EP2303495 - CIRCULAR AND MITER BOX SAW [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.12.2015 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Weusthof, Gerhard Buchenweg 6 48480 Schapen / DE | [2011/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2011/14] | Representative(s) | Hübsch, Dirk Hübsch & Weil Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Partnerschaft mbB Oststrasse 9-11 50996 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/08] | Hübsch, Dirk Hübsch & Weil Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Oststrasse 9-11 50996 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2011/14] | Hübsch, Dirk Hübsch & Weil Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Oststrasse 9-11 50996 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 09777330.3 | 21.07.2009 | [2011/14] | WO2009EP05281 | Priority number, date | DE20081034273 | 22.07.2008 Original published format: DE102008034273 | DE20082012213U | 12.09.2008 Original published format: DE 202008012213 U | [2011/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010009861 | Date: | 28.01.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2303495 | Date: | 06.04.2011 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.01.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2303495 | Date: | 18.02.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.01.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B23D45/04, B23D47/02 | [2011/14] | CPC: |
B23D45/048 (EP,US);
B23D47/025 (EP,US);
Y10T83/7684 (EP,US);
Y10T83/7697 (EP,US);
Y10T83/7722 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/14] | Title | German: | KAPP- UND GEHRUNGSSÄGE | [2011/14] | English: | CIRCULAR AND MITER BOX SAW | [2011/14] | French: | SCIE À ONGLET | [2011/14] | Entry into regional phase | 18.01.2011 | National basic fee paid | 18.01.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.01.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.05.2010 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.01.2011 | Examination requested [2011/14] | 01.04.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.09.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.12.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 18.12.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.12.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.09.2014 | Opposition(s) | 19.11.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.07.2009 | BG | 18.02.2015 | CY | 18.02.2015 | CZ | 18.02.2015 | DK | 18.02.2015 | EE | 18.02.2015 | ES | 18.02.2015 | FI | 18.02.2015 | HR | 18.02.2015 | IT | 18.02.2015 | LT | 18.02.2015 | LV | 18.02.2015 | MC | 18.02.2015 | MK | 18.02.2015 | MT | 18.02.2015 | NL | 18.02.2015 | PL | 18.02.2015 | PT | 18.02.2015 | RO | 18.02.2015 | SE | 18.02.2015 | SI | 18.02.2015 | SK | 18.02.2015 | SM | 18.02.2015 | TR | 18.02.2015 | NO | 18.05.2015 | GR | 19.05.2015 | IS | 18.06.2015 | AT | 21.07.2015 | IE | 21.07.2015 | LU | 21.07.2015 | BE | 31.07.2015 | CH | 31.07.2015 | LI | 31.07.2015 | [2018/34] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 21.07.2009 | |
BG | 18.02.2015 | ||
CY | 18.02.2015 | ||
CZ | 18.02.2015 | ||
DK | 18.02.2015 | ||
EE | 18.02.2015 | ||
ES | 18.02.2015 | ||
FI | 18.02.2015 | ||
HR | 18.02.2015 | ||
IT | 18.02.2015 | ||
LT | 18.02.2015 | ||
LV | 18.02.2015 | ||
MC | 18.02.2015 | ||
MK | 18.02.2015 | ||
MT | 18.02.2015 | ||
NL | 18.02.2015 | ||
PL | 18.02.2015 | ||
RO | 18.02.2015 | ||
SE | 18.02.2015 | ||
SI | 18.02.2015 | ||
SK | 18.02.2015 | ||
SM | 18.02.2015 | ||
TR | 18.02.2015 | ||
NO | 18.05.2015 | ||
GR | 19.05.2015 | ||
IS | 18.06.2015 | ||
AT | 21.07.2015 | ||
IE | 21.07.2015 | ||
LU | 21.07.2015 | ||
BE | 31.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 21.07.2009 | |
BG | 18.02.2015 | ||
CY | 18.02.2015 | ||
CZ | 18.02.2015 | ||
DK | 18.02.2015 | ||
EE | 18.02.2015 | ||
ES | 18.02.2015 | ||
FI | 18.02.2015 | ||
HR | 18.02.2015 | ||
IT | 18.02.2015 | ||
LT | 18.02.2015 | ||
LV | 18.02.2015 | ||
MC | 18.02.2015 | ||
MT | 18.02.2015 | ||
NL | 18.02.2015 | ||
PL | 18.02.2015 | ||
RO | 18.02.2015 | ||
SE | 18.02.2015 | ||
SI | 18.02.2015 | ||
SK | 18.02.2015 | ||
SM | 18.02.2015 | ||
TR | 18.02.2015 | ||
NO | 18.05.2015 | ||
GR | 19.05.2015 | ||
IS | 18.06.2015 | ||
AT | 21.07.2015 | ||
IE | 21.07.2015 | ||
LU | 21.07.2015 | ||
BE | 31.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
Former [2017/21] | CZ | 18.02.2015 | |
DK | 18.02.2015 | ||
EE | 18.02.2015 | ||
ES | 18.02.2015 | ||
FI | 18.02.2015 | ||
HR | 18.02.2015 | ||
IT | 18.02.2015 | ||
LT | 18.02.2015 | ||
LV | 18.02.2015 | ||
MC | 18.02.2015 | ||
MT | 18.02.2015 | ||
NL | 18.02.2015 | ||
PL | 18.02.2015 | ||
RO | 18.02.2015 | ||
SE | 18.02.2015 | ||
SI | 18.02.2015 | ||
SK | 18.02.2015 | ||
NO | 18.05.2015 | ||
GR | 19.05.2015 | ||
IS | 18.06.2015 | ||
AT | 21.07.2015 | ||
IE | 21.07.2015 | ||
LU | 21.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/50] | CZ | 18.02.2015 | |
DK | 18.02.2015 | ||
EE | 18.02.2015 | ||
ES | 18.02.2015 | ||
FI | 18.02.2015 | ||
HR | 18.02.2015 | ||
IT | 18.02.2015 | ||
LT | 18.02.2015 | ||
LV | 18.02.2015 | ||
MC | 18.02.2015 | ||
NL | 18.02.2015 | ||
PL | 18.02.2015 | ||
RO | 18.02.2015 | ||
SE | 18.02.2015 | ||
SI | 18.02.2015 | ||
SK | 18.02.2015 | ||
NO | 18.05.2015 | ||
GR | 19.05.2015 | ||
IS | 18.06.2015 | ||
AT | 21.07.2015 | ||
IE | 21.07.2015 | ||
LU | 21.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | CZ | 18.02.2015 | |
DK | 18.02.2015 | ||
EE | 18.02.2015 | ||
ES | 18.02.2015 | ||
FI | 18.02.2015 | ||
HR | 18.02.2015 | ||
IT | 18.02.2015 | ||
LT | 18.02.2015 | ||
LV | 18.02.2015 | ||
MC | 18.02.2015 | ||
NL | 18.02.2015 | ||
PL | 18.02.2015 | ||
RO | 18.02.2015 | ||
SE | 18.02.2015 | ||
SI | 18.02.2015 | ||
SK | 18.02.2015 | ||
NO | 18.05.2015 | ||
GR | 19.05.2015 | ||
IS | 18.06.2015 | ||
IE | 21.07.2015 | ||
LU | 21.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CZ | 18.02.2015 | |
DK | 18.02.2015 | ||
EE | 18.02.2015 | ||
ES | 18.02.2015 | ||
FI | 18.02.2015 | ||
HR | 18.02.2015 | ||
IT | 18.02.2015 | ||
LT | 18.02.2015 | ||
LV | 18.02.2015 | ||
MC | 18.02.2015 | ||
NL | 18.02.2015 | ||
PL | 18.02.2015 | ||
RO | 18.02.2015 | ||
SE | 18.02.2015 | ||
SI | 18.02.2015 | ||
SK | 18.02.2015 | ||
NO | 18.05.2015 | ||
GR | 19.05.2015 | ||
IS | 18.06.2015 | ||
LU | 21.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/15] | CZ | 18.02.2015 | |
DK | 18.02.2015 | ||
EE | 18.02.2015 | ||
ES | 18.02.2015 | ||
FI | 18.02.2015 | ||
HR | 18.02.2015 | ||
IT | 18.02.2015 | ||
LT | 18.02.2015 | ||
LV | 18.02.2015 | ||
MC | 18.02.2015 | ||
NL | 18.02.2015 | ||
PL | 18.02.2015 | ||
RO | 18.02.2015 | ||
SE | 18.02.2015 | ||
SI | 18.02.2015 | ||
SK | 18.02.2015 | ||
NO | 18.05.2015 | ||
GR | 19.05.2015 | ||
IS | 18.06.2015 | ||
LU | 21.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/13] | CZ | 18.02.2015 | |
DK | 18.02.2015 | ||
EE | 18.02.2015 | ||
ES | 18.02.2015 | ||
FI | 18.02.2015 | ||
HR | 18.02.2015 | ||
IT | 18.02.2015 | ||
LT | 18.02.2015 | ||
LV | 18.02.2015 | ||
MC | 18.02.2015 | ||
NL | 18.02.2015 | ||
PL | 18.02.2015 | ||
RO | 18.02.2015 | ||
SE | 18.02.2015 | ||
SI | 18.02.2015 | ||
SK | 18.02.2015 | ||
NO | 18.05.2015 | ||
GR | 19.05.2015 | ||
IS | 18.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | CZ | 18.02.2015 | |
DK | 18.02.2015 | ||
EE | 18.02.2015 | ||
ES | 18.02.2015 | ||
FI | 18.02.2015 | ||
HR | 18.02.2015 | ||
IT | 18.02.2015 | ||
LT | 18.02.2015 | ||
LV | 18.02.2015 | ||
NL | 18.02.2015 | ||
PL | 18.02.2015 | ||
RO | 18.02.2015 | ||
SE | 18.02.2015 | ||
SI | 18.02.2015 | ||
SK | 18.02.2015 | ||
NO | 18.05.2015 | ||
GR | 19.05.2015 | ||
IS | 18.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | CZ | 18.02.2015 | |
DK | 18.02.2015 | ||
EE | 18.02.2015 | ||
ES | 18.02.2015 | ||
FI | 18.02.2015 | ||
HR | 18.02.2015 | ||
IT | 18.02.2015 | ||
LT | 18.02.2015 | ||
LV | 18.02.2015 | ||
NL | 18.02.2015 | ||
PL | 18.02.2015 | ||
RO | 18.02.2015 | ||
SE | 18.02.2015 | ||
SK | 18.02.2015 | ||
NO | 18.05.2015 | ||
GR | 19.05.2015 | ||
IS | 18.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | CZ | 18.02.2015 | |
DK | 18.02.2015 | ||
EE | 18.02.2015 | ||
ES | 18.02.2015 | ||
FI | 18.02.2015 | ||
HR | 18.02.2015 | ||
LT | 18.02.2015 | ||
LV | 18.02.2015 | ||
NL | 18.02.2015 | ||
PL | 18.02.2015 | ||
RO | 18.02.2015 | ||
SE | 18.02.2015 | ||
SK | 18.02.2015 | ||
NO | 18.05.2015 | ||
GR | 19.05.2015 | ||
IS | 18.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | CZ | 18.02.2015 | |
DK | 18.02.2015 | ||
EE | 18.02.2015 | ||
ES | 18.02.2015 | ||
FI | 18.02.2015 | ||
HR | 18.02.2015 | ||
LT | 18.02.2015 | ||
LV | 18.02.2015 | ||
NL | 18.02.2015 | ||
RO | 18.02.2015 | ||
SE | 18.02.2015 | ||
SK | 18.02.2015 | ||
NO | 18.05.2015 | ||
GR | 19.05.2015 | ||
IS | 18.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | ES | 18.02.2015 | |
FI | 18.02.2015 | ||
HR | 18.02.2015 | ||
LT | 18.02.2015 | ||
LV | 18.02.2015 | ||
NL | 18.02.2015 | ||
SE | 18.02.2015 | ||
NO | 18.05.2015 | ||
GR | 19.05.2015 | ||
IS | 18.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | ES | 18.02.2015 | |
FI | 18.02.2015 | ||
HR | 18.02.2015 | ||
LT | 18.02.2015 | ||
SE | 18.02.2015 | ||
NO | 18.05.2015 | ||
GR | 19.05.2015 | ||
IS | 18.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | ES | 18.02.2015 | |
FI | 18.02.2015 | ||
HR | 18.02.2015 | ||
LT | 18.02.2015 | ||
SE | 18.02.2015 | ||
NO | 18.05.2015 | ||
GR | 19.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | ES | 18.02.2015 | |
FI | 18.02.2015 | ||
HR | 18.02.2015 | ||
LT | 18.02.2015 | ||
SE | 18.02.2015 | ||
NO | 18.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | ES | 18.02.2015 | |
LT | 18.02.2015 | ||
NO | 18.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/33] | ES | 18.02.2015 | Cited in | International search | [XI]US5870939 (MATSUBARA KOUJI [JP]) [X] 1,3-5,9,12-16,19-22 * abstract * [I] 2,6-8,10-11,17-18,23; | [AD]EP0379322 (MAKITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD [JP]) [AD] 1-23 * figure 4 *; | [A]EP1405703 (BLACK & DECKER INC [US]) [A] 1-23 * figure 2 *; | [AP]GB2446317 (MILWAUKEE ELECTRIC TOOL CORP [US]) [AP] 1-23 * figure 8 *; | [AD]DE20313885U (METABOWERKE GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1-23 * the whole document *; | [AD]DE202006012418U (METABOWERKE GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1-23 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE20313885U | DE202006012418U | EP0379322 |