EP2310156 - METAL FIBRES FOR CATALYST NONWOVENS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.05.2014 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.06.2014 [2014/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Heraeus Materials Technology GmbH & Co. KG Heraeusstrasse 12-14 63450 Hanau / DE | [2011/40] |
Former [2011/16] | For all designated states W.C. Heraeus GmbH Heraeusstrasse 12 - 14 63450 Hanau / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JANTSCH, Uwe Dangelweg 24 63579 Freigericht / DE | 02 /
LUPTON, David, F. Am Rain 8 63571 Gelnhausen / DE | 03 /
MANHARDT, Harald Tannenweg 7 63486 Bruchkoebel / DE | 04 /
VORBERG, Stefan nussallee 27 63450 Hanau / DE | [2011/16] | Representative(s) | Kühn, Hans-Christian Heraeus Holding GmbH Stabsstelle Schutzrechte Heraeusstrasse 12-14 63450 Hanau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/16] | Kühn, Hans-Christian Heraeus Holding GmbH, Stabsstelle Schutzrechte Heraeusstrasse 12-14 63450 Hanau / DE | Application number, filing date | 09777543.1 | 30.07.2009 | [2011/16] | WO2009EP05521 | Priority number, date | DE20081038611 | 12.08.2008 Original published format: DE102008038611 | [2011/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010017894 | Date: | 18.02.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/07] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2310156 | Date: | 20.04.2011 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.02.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B22F1/00, B22F3/00, B22F9/06, F01N3/28, B01J23/40, B01J35/06, C22C5/04 | [2011/16] | CPC: |
B01J23/40 (EP,KR,US);
B01J23/464 (EP,US);
B01J23/652 (EP,KR,US);
B01J23/89 (EP,KR,US);
B01J35/30 (EP,KR,US);
B01J35/56 (EP,KR,US);
B01J35/58 (EP,KR,US);
B01J35/60 (EP,US);
B01J35/617 (EP,KR,US);
B01J37/08 (EP,KR,US);
B01J37/28 (EP,KR,US);
B22F1/00 (EP,US);
B22F1/062 (EP,KR,US);
B22F3/002 (EP,KR,US);
B22F9/06 (EP,KR,US);
C01B21/265 (EP,KR,US);
C01C3/0216 (EP,KR,US);
C22C5/04 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/16] | Title | German: | METALLFASERN FÜR KATALYSATORVLIESE | [2011/16] | English: | METAL FIBRES FOR CATALYST NONWOVENS | [2011/16] | French: | FIBRES MÉTALLIQUES POUR NON-TISSÉS CATALYTIQUES | [2011/16] | Entry into regional phase | 17.01.2011 | National basic fee paid | 17.01.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.01.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.01.2011 | Examination requested [2011/16] | 13.04.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.08.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.01.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/24] | 05.02.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/24] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.08.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2013 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0364153 (JOHNSON MATTHEY PLC [GB]) [A] 2-3 * claim - *; | [XI]GB2273716 (TANAKA ELECTRONICS IND [JP]) [X] 1,4,7 * abstract * * page 2, paragraph 4 - page 3, paragraph 3 * * page 7, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3 * * examples 22-26; tables 1-2 * [I] 5; | [A]EP0606535 (HERAEUS GMBH W C [DE]) [A] 2-3 * example . *; | [X]JPH0813064 (TOKURIKI HONTEN KK) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [A]DE19945742 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [A] 2-4 * the whole document *; | [A]DE10040591 (HERAEUS GMBH W C [DE]) [A] 4-7* the whole document * |