EP2306881 - HOUSEHOLD APPLIANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 30.06.2023 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.08.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.04.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstraße 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/40] | For all designated states Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2011/15] | For all designated states Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHROTT, Harald Oeschländerweg 1 88131 Lindau / DE | [2011/15] | Application number, filing date | 09777606.6 | 03.08.2009 | [2011/15] | WO2009EP05597 | Priority number, date | DE20081036586 | 06.08.2008 Original published format: DE102008036586 | [2011/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010015367 | Date: | 11.02.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/06] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2306881 | Date: | 13.04.2011 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.02.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2306881 | Date: | 30.09.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.04.2010 | Classification | IPC: | D06F33/00, A47L15/42, A47L15/44, A47L15/46, D06F39/00, D06F39/02, A47L15/00, D06F34/22, D06F34/28 | [2020/18] | CPC: |
A47L15/0055 (EP,KR,US);
A47L15/4445 (EP,KR,US);
D06F33/37 (EP,KR,US);
D06F39/024 (EP,KR,US);
A47L2301/04 (EP,KR,US);
A47L2401/02 (EP,KR,US);
A47L2401/03 (EP,KR,US);
D06F2101/20 (EP,KR,US);
D06F2103/00 (EP,KR,US);
D06F2103/16 (EP,KR,US);
D06F2103/20 (EP,KR,US);
D06F2103/22 (EP,KR,US);
D06F2103/26 (EP,KR,US);
D06F2103/42 (EP,KR,US);
D06F2103/64 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2011/15] | A47L15/42, A47L15/44, A47L15/46, D06F33/02, D06F39/00, D06F39/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/40] |
Former [2011/15] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | HAUSHALTSMASCHINE | [2011/15] | English: | HOUSEHOLD APPLIANCE | [2011/15] | French: | APPAREIL MENAGER | [2020/18] |
Former [2011/15] | APPAREIL ÉLECTROMÉNAGER | Entry into regional phase | 23.08.2010 | National basic fee paid | 23.08.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.08.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.08.2010 | Examination requested [2011/15] | 18.04.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.06.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.02.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.08.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.12.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.07.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 28.07.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.07.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.03.2017 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
30.06.2021
Reckitt Benckiser Finish B.V. Siriusdreef 14 2132 WT Hoofddorp / NL Opponent's representative Heritage, Kevin Stephen Charles Reckitt Benckiser Corporate Services Limited Legal Department - Patents Group Dansom Lane Hull HU8 7DS / GB | [2021/31] | 14.07.2021 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 24.11.2021 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 20.10.2022 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2023/31] | 20.10.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | 16.03.2023 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 16.03.2023 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 20.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.08.2009 | CY | 30.09.2020 | CZ | 30.09.2020 | DK | 30.09.2020 | EE | 30.09.2020 | ES | 30.09.2020 | FI | 30.09.2020 | HR | 30.09.2020 | IT | 30.09.2020 | LT | 30.09.2020 | LV | 30.09.2020 | MC | 30.09.2020 | MK | 30.09.2020 | NL | 30.09.2020 | PL | 30.09.2020 | RO | 30.09.2020 | SE | 30.09.2020 | SI | 30.09.2020 | SK | 30.09.2020 | SM | 30.09.2020 | TR | 30.09.2020 | BG | 30.12.2020 | NO | 30.12.2020 | GR | 31.12.2020 | IS | 30.01.2021 | PT | 01.02.2021 | AT | 03.08.2021 | IE | 03.08.2021 | LU | 03.08.2021 | BE | 31.08.2021 | CH | 31.08.2021 | LI | 31.08.2021 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 03.08.2009 | |
CY | 30.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2020 | ||
DK | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
IT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
MC | 30.09.2020 | ||
MK | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SI | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
SM | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
IS | 30.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
AT | 03.08.2021 | ||
IE | 03.08.2021 | ||
LU | 03.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
Former [2023/29] | HU | 03.08.2009 | |
CY | 30.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2020 | ||
DK | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
IT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
MC | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SI | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
SM | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
IS | 30.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
AT | 03.08.2021 | ||
IE | 03.08.2021 | ||
LU | 03.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
Former [2023/24] | CY | 30.09.2020 | |
CZ | 30.09.2020 | ||
DK | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
IT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
MC | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SI | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
SM | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
IS | 30.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
AT | 03.08.2021 | ||
IE | 03.08.2021 | ||
LU | 03.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/48] | CZ | 30.09.2020 | |
DK | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
IT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
MC | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SI | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
SM | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
IS | 30.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
AT | 03.08.2021 | ||
IE | 03.08.2021 | ||
LU | 03.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/35] | CZ | 30.09.2020 | |
DK | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
IT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
MC | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SI | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
SM | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
IS | 30.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
IE | 03.08.2021 | ||
LU | 03.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | CZ | 30.09.2020 | |
DK | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
IT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
MC | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SI | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
SM | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
IS | 30.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
LU | 03.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | CZ | 30.09.2020 | |
DK | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
IT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
MC | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SI | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
SM | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
IS | 30.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
LU | 03.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | CZ | 30.09.2020 | |
DK | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
IT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
MC | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SI | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
SM | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
IS | 23.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/18] | CZ | 30.09.2020 | |
DK | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
IT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
MC | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SI | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
SM | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
IS | 23.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | CZ | 30.09.2020 | |
DK | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
IT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SI | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
SM | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
IS | 23.12.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | CZ | 30.09.2020 | |
DK | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
IT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SI | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
SM | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
IS | 30.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | CZ | 30.09.2020 | |
DK | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
IT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
SM | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
IS | 30.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | CZ | 30.09.2020 | |
DK | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
SM | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
IS | 30.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | CZ | 30.09.2020 | |
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
SM | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
IS | 30.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | CZ | 30.09.2020 | |
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SM | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
IS | 30.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | CZ | 30.09.2020 | |
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SM | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | CZ | 30.09.2020 | |
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/21] | FI | 30.09.2020 | |
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 30.09.2020 | |
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | FI | 30.09.2020 | |
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | FI | 30.09.2020 | |
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 30.09.2020 | |
NO | 30.12.2020 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2002088502 (VAN ROMPUY TANYA CECILE CORNEE [BE], et al) [A] 1-9 * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0012] , [0017] - [0019] - [0023] , [0024] , [0031] - [0035] - [0051] - [0059] - [0071] , [0072]; figure -; claim - *; | [A]WO02077353 (HENKEL KGAA [DE], et al) [A] 1-9 * Seite 5, Absatz 6 - Seite 7, Absatz 3; Seite 9, Absatz 2; Ansprüche; Abbildungen *; | [A]WO03100153 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 1-9* the whole document *; | [A]DE10260144 (BSH BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [A] 1-9 * paragraphs [0021] - [0037]; figure -; claim - * | Opposition | GB2134141 | DE102006026800 | DE102006038341 | DE102006043916 | DE102006043973 |