EP2359029 - TRANSMISSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.09.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Spinea S.R.O. Okrajová 33 08005 Presov / SK | [2013/18] |
Former [2011/34] | For all designated states Spinea S.R.O. Orkrajová 33 08005 Presov / SK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FECKO, Tibor Obrancov mieru 56 080 01 Presov / SK | [2011/34] | Representative(s) | Jeck, Anton Jeck, Fleck & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Klingengasse 2 71665 Vaihingen/Enz / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/44] | Jeck, Anton Jeck - Fleck - Herrmann Klingengasse 2/1 71657 Vaihingen/Enz / DE | ||
Former [2011/34] | Jeck, Anton Jeck - Fleck - Herrmann Klingengasse 2/1 71657 Vaihingen/Enz / DE | Application number, filing date | 09777718.9 | 07.08.2009 | [2011/34] | WO2009EP05722 | Priority number, date | EP20080014093 | 07.08.2008 Original published format: EP 08014093 | [2011/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010015406 | Date: | 11.02.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2359029 | Date: | 24.08.2011 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.02.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2359029 | Date: | 31.10.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.02.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F16H1/32 | [2011/34] | CPC: |
F16H1/32 (EP);
F16H2001/326 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/34] | Title | German: | GETRIEBE | [2011/34] | English: | TRANSMISSION | [2011/34] | French: | TRANSMISSION | [2011/34] | Entry into regional phase | 24.06.2011 | National basic fee paid | 24.06.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.06.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.04.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time | 24.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/34] | 06.02.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.06.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.09.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 18.09.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.06.2012 | Opposition(s) | 01.08.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/41] | Request for further processing for: | 24.06.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 24.06.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.07.2011 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 24.06.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 24.06.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.07.2011 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 24.06.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 24.06.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.07.2011 | Decision despatched | 24.06.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 24.06.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.07.2011 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT | 24.06.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 24.06.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.07.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.08.2009 | CY | 31.10.2012 | EE | 31.10.2012 | FI | 31.10.2012 | HR | 31.10.2012 | LT | 31.10.2012 | LV | 31.10.2012 | MC | 31.10.2012 | MK | 31.10.2012 | MT | 31.10.2012 | RO | 31.10.2012 | SI | 31.10.2012 | SM | 31.10.2012 | BG | 31.01.2013 | GR | 01.02.2013 | IS | 28.02.2013 | PT | 28.02.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | CY | 31.10.2012 | |
EE | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
HR | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LV | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
MK | 31.10.2012 | ||
MT | 31.10.2012 | ||
RO | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
SM | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 31.10.2012 | |
EE | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
HR | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LV | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
RO | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
SM | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | CY | 31.10.2012 | |
EE | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
HR | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LV | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
RO | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | CY | 31.10.2012 | |
EE | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
HR | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LV | 31.10.2012 | ||
RO | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | EE | 31.10.2012 | |
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
HR | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LV | 31.10.2012 | ||
RO | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | EE | 31.10.2012 | |
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
HR | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LV | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | FI | 31.10.2012 | |
HR | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LV | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | FI | 31.10.2012 | |
HR | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LV | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | FI | 31.10.2012 | |
HR | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LV | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | FI | 31.10.2012 | |
HR | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LV | 31.10.2012 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | FI | 31.10.2012 | |
HR | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LV | 31.10.2012 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 31.10.2012 | |
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/20] | LT | 31.10.2012 | Cited in | International search | [DXA]WO9522017 (SPINEA SRO [SK], et al) [DX] 9-11 * figures 1,2 * [A] 1-8; | [XA]WO2006058743 (SPINEA SRO [SK], et al) [X] 1,2,5-8 * figures 1,10 * * page 17, paragraph LAST - page 18, paragraph 1 * [A] 3,4,9-11 | by applicant | WO9522017 |