EP2320816 - SHORT PIN FOR TAKING CARE OF EPIPHYSIS FRACTURES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.12.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tantum AG Memellandstr. 2 24537 Neumünster / DE | [2011/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JENSEN, Harm-Iven Haffkamp 16 24214 Noer / DE | 02 /
LÜCKERT, Ole Hardenbergstrasse 15 24105 Kiel / DE | [2011/20] | Representative(s) | Stork Bamberger Patentanwälte PartmbB Meiendorfer Strasse 89 22145 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/07] | Stork Bamberger Patentanwälte Postfach 73 04 66 22124 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2011/20] | Wenzel & Kalkoff Patentanwälte Postfach 73 04 66 22124 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 09777876.5 | 07.08.2009 | [2011/20] | WO2009EP05895 | Priority number, date | DE20082010922U | 12.08.2008 Original published format: DE 202008010922 U | [2011/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010017990 | Date: | 18.02.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2320816 | Date: | 18.05.2011 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.02.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2320816 | Date: | 12.02.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.02.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/72, A61B17/80 | [2013/35] | CPC: |
A61B17/7233 (EP,US);
A61B17/68 (EP,US);
A61B17/72 (EP,US);
A61B17/8061 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/20] | A61B17/72 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/20] | Title | German: | KURZNAGEL ZUM VERSORGEN VON EPIPHYSEFRAKTUREN | [2011/20] | English: | SHORT PIN FOR TAKING CARE OF EPIPHYSIS FRACTURES | [2011/20] | French: | CLOU COURT POUR TRAITER DES FRACTURES DE L'ÉPIPHYSE | [2011/20] | Entry into regional phase | 09.03.2011 | National basic fee paid | 09.03.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.03.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/20] | 26.04.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.08.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.12.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 23.12.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.08.2013 | Opposition(s) | 13.11.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.08.2009 | BG | 12.02.2014 | CY | 12.02.2014 | CZ | 12.02.2014 | DK | 12.02.2014 | EE | 12.02.2014 | FI | 12.02.2014 | HR | 12.02.2014 | LT | 12.02.2014 | LV | 12.02.2014 | MC | 12.02.2014 | MK | 12.02.2014 | MT | 12.02.2014 | NL | 12.02.2014 | PL | 12.02.2014 | RO | 12.02.2014 | SI | 12.02.2014 | SK | 12.02.2014 | SM | 12.02.2014 | NO | 12.05.2014 | GR | 13.05.2014 | IS | 12.06.2014 | PT | 12.06.2014 | IE | 07.08.2014 | LU | 07.08.2014 | BE | 31.08.2014 | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 07.08.2009 | |
BG | 12.02.2014 | ||
CY | 12.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.02.2014 | ||
DK | 12.02.2014 | ||
EE | 12.02.2014 | ||
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
HR | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LV | 12.02.2014 | ||
MC | 12.02.2014 | ||
MT | 12.02.2014 | ||
NL | 12.02.2014 | ||
PL | 12.02.2014 | ||
RO | 12.02.2014 | ||
SI | 12.02.2014 | ||
SK | 12.02.2014 | ||
SM | 12.02.2014 | ||
NO | 12.05.2014 | ||
GR | 13.05.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
IE | 07.08.2014 | ||
LU | 07.08.2014 | ||
BE | 31.08.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | BG | 12.02.2014 | |
CY | 12.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.02.2014 | ||
DK | 12.02.2014 | ||
EE | 12.02.2014 | ||
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
HR | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LV | 12.02.2014 | ||
MC | 12.02.2014 | ||
MT | 12.02.2014 | ||
NL | 12.02.2014 | ||
PL | 12.02.2014 | ||
RO | 12.02.2014 | ||
SI | 12.02.2014 | ||
SK | 12.02.2014 | ||
SM | 12.02.2014 | ||
NO | 12.05.2014 | ||
GR | 13.05.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
IE | 07.08.2014 | ||
LU | 07.08.2014 | ||
BE | 31.08.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CY | 12.02.2014 | |
CZ | 12.02.2014 | ||
DK | 12.02.2014 | ||
EE | 12.02.2014 | ||
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
HR | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LV | 12.02.2014 | ||
MC | 12.02.2014 | ||
NL | 12.02.2014 | ||
PL | 12.02.2014 | ||
RO | 12.02.2014 | ||
SI | 12.02.2014 | ||
SK | 12.02.2014 | ||
SM | 12.02.2014 | ||
NO | 12.05.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
IE | 07.08.2014 | ||
LU | 07.08.2014 | ||
BE | 31.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/37] | CY | 12.02.2014 | |
CZ | 12.02.2014 | ||
DK | 12.02.2014 | ||
EE | 12.02.2014 | ||
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
HR | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LV | 12.02.2014 | ||
MC | 12.02.2014 | ||
NL | 12.02.2014 | ||
PL | 12.02.2014 | ||
RO | 12.02.2014 | ||
SI | 12.02.2014 | ||
SK | 12.02.2014 | ||
NO | 12.05.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
IE | 07.08.2014 | ||
LU | 07.08.2014 | ||
BE | 31.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 12.02.2014 | |
CZ | 12.02.2014 | ||
DK | 12.02.2014 | ||
EE | 12.02.2014 | ||
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
HR | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LV | 12.02.2014 | ||
MC | 12.02.2014 | ||
NL | 12.02.2014 | ||
PL | 12.02.2014 | ||
RO | 12.02.2014 | ||
SI | 12.02.2014 | ||
SK | 12.02.2014 | ||
NO | 12.05.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
LU | 07.08.2014 | ||
BE | 31.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/19] | CY | 12.02.2014 | |
CZ | 12.02.2014 | ||
DK | 12.02.2014 | ||
EE | 12.02.2014 | ||
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
HR | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LV | 12.02.2014 | ||
MC | 12.02.2014 | ||
NL | 12.02.2014 | ||
PL | 12.02.2014 | ||
RO | 12.02.2014 | ||
SK | 12.02.2014 | ||
NO | 12.05.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
LU | 07.08.2014 | ||
BE | 31.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | CY | 12.02.2014 | |
CZ | 12.02.2014 | ||
DK | 12.02.2014 | ||
EE | 12.02.2014 | ||
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
HR | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LV | 12.02.2014 | ||
MC | 12.02.2014 | ||
NL | 12.02.2014 | ||
PL | 12.02.2014 | ||
RO | 12.02.2014 | ||
SK | 12.02.2014 | ||
NO | 12.05.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 12.02.2014 | |
CZ | 12.02.2014 | ||
DK | 12.02.2014 | ||
EE | 12.02.2014 | ||
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
HR | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LV | 12.02.2014 | ||
NL | 12.02.2014 | ||
PL | 12.02.2014 | ||
RO | 12.02.2014 | ||
SK | 12.02.2014 | ||
NO | 12.05.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 12.02.2014 | |
CZ | 12.02.2014 | ||
DK | 12.02.2014 | ||
EE | 12.02.2014 | ||
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
HR | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LV | 12.02.2014 | ||
NL | 12.02.2014 | ||
RO | 12.02.2014 | ||
NO | 12.05.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 12.02.2014 | |
CZ | 12.02.2014 | ||
DK | 12.02.2014 | ||
EE | 12.02.2014 | ||
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
HR | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LV | 12.02.2014 | ||
NL | 12.02.2014 | ||
NO | 12.05.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | CY | 12.02.2014 | |
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
HR | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LV | 12.02.2014 | ||
NL | 12.02.2014 | ||
NO | 12.05.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/39] | CY | 12.02.2014 | |
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
NL | 12.02.2014 | ||
NO | 12.05.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | CY | 12.02.2014 | |
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
NO | 12.05.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | LT | 12.02.2014 | |
NO | 12.05.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO2007035440 (DVO EXTREMITY SOLUTIONS LLC [US], et al) [Y] 1-10 * page 7, paragraph 37 * * page 13, paragraph 54 * * figures 2,22,23 *; | [DY]WO2004039271 (TANTUM AG [DE], et al) [DY] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [YA]EP1486175 (MUECKTER HELMUT DR MED DIPL-IN [DE], et al) [Y] 7 * figure 9 * [A] 1; | [A]DE9106152U (OSWALD LEIBINGER GMBH, 7202 MUEHLHEIM, DE) [A] 1 * page 5, paragraph 4 - page 7, paragraph 2 * * figures 5,6 * |