EP2350751 - DRIVE ASSEMBLY FOR MOTORIZED ADJUSTING OF AN ADJUSTING ELEMENT IN A MOTOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.11.2016 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Brose Fahrzeugteile GmbH & Co. Kommanditgesellschaft, Bamberg Berliner Ring 1 96052 Bamberg / DE | [2016/31] |
Former [2011/31] | For all designated states Brose Fahrzeugteile GmbH & Co. KG, Hallstadt Max-Brose-Strasse 2 96103 Hallstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EGGELING, Jürgen Dellwiger Strasse 15 45475 Mülheim an der Ruhr / DE | 02 /
DÜNNE, Klaus Ostring 2a 40882 Ratingen / DE | 03 /
HELLMICH, Dirk Auf dem Dorn 21 47249 Duisberg / DE | [2016/01] |
Former [2011/31] | 01 /
EGGELING, Jürgen Dellwiger Strasse 15 45475 Mülheim an der Ruhr / DE | ||
02 /
DÜNNE, Klaus Ostring2a 40882 Ratingen / DE | |||
03 /
HELLMICH, Dirk Auf dem Dorn 21 47249 Duisberg / DE | Representative(s) | Gottschald, Jan Gottschald Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Klaus-Bungert-Straße 1 40468 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/01] | Gottschald, Jan Patentanwaltskanzlei Gottschald Am Mühlenturm 1 40489 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2011/31] | Gottschald, Jan Patentanwaltskanzlei Gottschald Kaiserswerther Markt 51 40489 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 09778622.2 | 21.09.2009 | [2011/31] | WO2009EP06789 | Priority number, date | DE20081053113 | 25.10.2008 Original published format: DE102008053113 | [2011/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010046008 | Date: | 29.04.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2350751 | Date: | 03.08.2011 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.04.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2350751 | Date: | 06.01.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.04.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/416, E05F15/00, H02P5/00, H02P5/68 | [2011/31] | CPC: |
E05F15/622 (EP,US);
E05F15/00 (KR);
H02P5/68 (US);
G05B19/416 (EP,KR,US);
E05F15/41 (EP,US);
E05Y2400/315 (EP,US);
E05Y2400/41 (EP,US);
E05Y2800/00 (EP,US);
E05Y2900/546 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/01] |
Former [2011/31] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANTRIEBSANORDNUNG ZUR MOTORISCHEN VERSTELLUNG EINES VERSTELLELEMENTS IN EINEM KRAFTFAHRZEUG | [2011/31] | English: | DRIVE ASSEMBLY FOR MOTORIZED ADJUSTING OF AN ADJUSTING ELEMENT IN A MOTOR VEHICLE | [2011/31] | French: | UNITÉ D'ENTRAÎNEMENT POUR LE DÉPLACEMENT MOTORISÉ D'UN ÉLÉMENT À DÉPLACEMENT DANS UN VÉHICULE À MOTEUR | [2011/31] | Entry into regional phase | 25.05.2011 | National basic fee paid | 25.05.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.05.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.05.2011 | Examination requested [2011/31] | 14.12.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.09.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.01.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.07.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.10.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 29.10.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.10.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.09.2014 | Opposition(s) | 07.10.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.09.2009 | CY | 06.01.2016 | CZ | 06.01.2016 | DK | 06.01.2016 | EE | 06.01.2016 | ES | 06.01.2016 | FI | 06.01.2016 | HR | 06.01.2016 | IT | 06.01.2016 | LT | 06.01.2016 | LV | 06.01.2016 | MC | 06.01.2016 | MK | 06.01.2016 | MT | 06.01.2016 | NL | 06.01.2016 | PL | 06.01.2016 | RO | 06.01.2016 | SE | 06.01.2016 | SI | 06.01.2016 | SK | 06.01.2016 | SM | 06.01.2016 | TR | 06.01.2016 | BG | 06.04.2016 | NO | 06.04.2016 | GR | 07.04.2016 | IS | 06.05.2016 | PT | 06.05.2016 | AT | 21.09.2016 | IE | 21.09.2016 | LU | 21.09.2016 | BE | 30.09.2016 | CH | 30.09.2016 | LI | 30.09.2016 | [2018/33] |
Former [2018/29] | HU | 21.09.2009 | |
CY | 06.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
MC | 06.01.2016 | ||
MK | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SI | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
SM | 06.01.2016 | ||
TR | 06.01.2016 | ||
BG | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
AT | 21.09.2016 | ||
IE | 21.09.2016 | ||
LU | 21.09.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 21.09.2009 | |
CY | 06.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
MC | 06.01.2016 | ||
MK | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SI | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
SM | 06.01.2016 | ||
BG | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
AT | 21.09.2016 | ||
IE | 21.09.2016 | ||
LU | 21.09.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
Former [2018/10] | CZ | 06.01.2016 | |
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
MC | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SI | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
SM | 06.01.2016 | ||
BG | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
AT | 21.09.2016 | ||
IE | 21.09.2016 | ||
LU | 21.09.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/41] | CZ | 06.01.2016 | |
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
MC | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SI | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
SM | 06.01.2016 | ||
BG | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
IE | 21.09.2016 | ||
LU | 21.09.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/31] | CZ | 06.01.2016 | |
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
MC | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SI | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
SM | 06.01.2016 | ||
BG | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/12] | CZ | 06.01.2016 | |
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SI | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
SM | 06.01.2016 | ||
BG | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | CZ | 06.01.2016 | |
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
SM | 06.01.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | DK | 06.01.2016 | |
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | DK | 06.01.2016 | |
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | ES | 06.01.2016 | |
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | ES | 06.01.2016 | |
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | ES | 06.01.2016 | |
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | ES | 06.01.2016 | |
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/30] | NL | 06.01.2016 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US3845366 (METZLER J, et al) [Y] 1-7,9,11,14-16 * column 1, lines 7-10 * * column 1, lines 21-40 * * column 1, lines 51-53 * * column 2, lines 7-25 * * column 2, lines 42-54 * * column 2, line 55 - column 3, line 32 * * column 3, line 43 - column 4, line 51 * * column 7, lines 12-34 * * claim 1 *; | [A]DE4041087 (AUMUELLER AUMATIC GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-16* the whole document *; | [Y]JPH0884492 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [Y] 1,3-7,9,14-16 * paragraphs [0013] - [0026] *; | [Y]US5625262 (LAPOTA ROBERT J [US]) [Y] 1-7,9-10,14-16 * column 1, lines 4-10 * * column 2, lines 28-37 * * column 2, line 40 - column 3, line 48 * * column 4, lines 26-49 * * column 5, lines 1-59 * * column 7, lines 31-58 * * claim 1 * * claim 3 * * claim 8 * * claim 9 *; | [YA]WO9837297 (RASMUSSEN KANN IND AS [DK], et al) [Y] 10-13 * the whole document * [A] 1-9,14-16; | [Y]US2005168010 (CLELAND TERRY P [CA], et al) [Y] 1,3,7,12-16 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0066] - paragraph [0068] * * paragraph [0073] * * paragraph [0081] - paragraph [0082] * * paragraph [0086] - paragraph [0088] * * paragraph [0112] *; | [Y]EP1746715 (BOSCH REXROTH AG [DE]) [Y] 1,3-5,7,9,14-16 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0024] * * claim 1 * * claim 9 * | Examination | - Kurt Breckner, "Regel- und Rechenschaltungen in der Prozeßautomatisierung: Bewährte Beispiele aus der Praxis", Regel- und Rechenschaltungen in der Prozeßautomatisierung: Bewährte Beispiele aus der Praxis, Oldenbourg Industrieverlag, (19990131), pages 318 - 320, ISBN 978-3-83-564729-9, XP055137854 |