EP2331803 - TWO-STAGE COOLED EXHAUST GAS RECIRCULATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.09.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 03.08.2016 [2016/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DEUTZ Aktiengesellschaft Ottostrasse 1 51149 Köln / DE | [2011/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HÜLSMANN, Bernd Am Brückentor 47 40764 Langenfeld / DE | [2011/24] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/47] | Application number, filing date | 09778787.3 | 30.09.2009 | [2011/24] | WO2009EP07033 | Priority number, date | DE20081050368 | 02.10.2008 Original published format: DE102008050368 | [2011/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010037540 | Date: | 08.04.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2331803 | Date: | 15.06.2011 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.04.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2331803 | Date: | 21.11.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.04.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F02M25/07 | [2011/24] | CPC: |
F02M26/05 (EP,US);
F02M26/10 (EP,US);
F02M26/24 (EP,US);
F02M26/44 (EP,US);
F02M26/38 (EP,US);
F02M26/39 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/24] | Title | German: | ZWEISTUFIG GEKÜHLTES ABGASRÜCKFÜHRSYSTEM | [2011/24] | English: | TWO-STAGE COOLED EXHAUST GAS RECIRCULATION SYSTEM | [2011/24] | French: | SYSTÈME DE RÉINJECTION DES GAZ D'ÉCHAPPEMENT AVEC DEUX ÉTAGES DE REFROIDISSEMENT | [2011/24] | Entry into regional phase | 15.03.2011 | National basic fee paid | 15.03.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.03.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/24] | 08.11.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.06.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.10.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 05.10.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.06.2012 | Opposition(s) | 22.08.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.09.2009 | CY | 21.11.2012 | CZ | 21.11.2012 | DK | 21.11.2012 | EE | 21.11.2012 | FI | 21.11.2012 | HR | 21.11.2012 | IS | 21.11.2012 | LT | 21.11.2012 | LV | 21.11.2012 | MC | 21.11.2012 | MK | 21.11.2012 | MT | 21.11.2012 | PL | 21.11.2012 | RO | 21.11.2012 | SI | 21.11.2012 | SK | 21.11.2012 | SM | 21.11.2012 | TR | 21.11.2012 | BG | 21.02.2013 | GR | 22.02.2013 | PT | 21.03.2013 | [2016/31] |
Former [2015/34] | HU | 30.09.2009 | |
CY | 21.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2012 | ||
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
EE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
HR | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
MC | 21.11.2012 | ||
MK | 21.11.2012 | ||
MT | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
RO | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SK | 21.11.2012 | ||
SM | 21.11.2012 | ||
TR | 21.11.2012 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | CY | 21.11.2012 | |
CZ | 21.11.2012 | ||
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
EE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
HR | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
MC | 21.11.2012 | ||
MK | 21.11.2012 | ||
MT | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
RO | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SK | 21.11.2012 | ||
SM | 21.11.2012 | ||
TR | 21.11.2012 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
Former [2015/30] | CY | 21.11.2012 | |
CZ | 21.11.2012 | ||
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
EE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
HR | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
MC | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
RO | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SK | 21.11.2012 | ||
SM | 21.11.2012 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CZ | 21.11.2012 | |
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
EE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
HR | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
MC | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
RO | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SK | 21.11.2012 | ||
SM | 21.11.2012 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | CZ | 21.11.2012 | |
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
EE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
HR | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
MC | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
RO | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SK | 21.11.2012 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | CZ | 21.11.2012 | |
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
EE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
HR | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
RO | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SK | 21.11.2012 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | CZ | 21.11.2012 | |
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
EE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
RO | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SK | 21.11.2012 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CZ | 21.11.2012 | |
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
EE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SK | 21.11.2012 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | DK | 21.11.2012 | |
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | FI | 21.11.2012 | |
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | FI | 21.11.2012 | |
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | FI | 21.11.2012 | |
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | FI | 21.11.2012 | |
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 21.11.2012 | |
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | LT | 21.11.2012 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE19821792 (AVL LIST GMBH [AT]) [A] 1 * column 4, lines 6-16; figure 2 *; | [Y]DE19734801 (PIERBURG AG [DE]) [Y] 1-7 * column 1, line 54 - column 2, line 19 * * column 2, lines 63-66; figure 1 *; | [Y]DE10018503 (PIERBURG AG [DE]) [Y] 1-7 * paragraph [0018]; figure 1 *; | [A]WO2004038191 (INT ENGINE INTELLECTUAL PROP [US], et al) [A] 1-7 * page 6, line 1 - page 7, line 3; figure 3 *; | [Y]WO2004051069 (BEHR GMBH & CO KG [DE], et al) [Y] 1-7 * page 2, paragraph 3 * * page 3, line 32 - page 6, line 3; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]EP1464823 (ISUZU MOTORS LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-7 * paragraphs [0030] , [0032] - [0034]; figure 1 *; | [Y]WO2005095780 (SCANIA CV ABP [SE], et al) [Y] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1640594 (FORD GLOBAL TECH LLC [US]) [A] 1 * figure 5 *; | [Y]WO2006096346 (INT ENGINE INTELLECTUAL PROP [US], et al) [Y] 1-7 * page 11, paragraphs 3,4; figure 1 *; | [A]DE102006057488 (AUDI AG [DE]) [A] 1* abstract * |