EP2408437 - CONTROLLED RELEASE PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION WITH RESISTANCE AGAINST THE INFLUENCE OF ETHANOL EMPLOYING A COATING COMPRISING A POLYMER MIXTURE AND EXCIPIENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.06.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.06.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.07.2016 [2016/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Evonik Röhm GmbH Kirschenallee 64293 Darmstadt / DE | [2012/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BÄR, Hans Balsbach 7 64753 Brombachtal / DE | 02 /
FÜRST, Thomas Boskoopstrasse 19 b 60435 Frankfurt / DE | 03 /
RUPP, Thomas Bleichstrasse 59a 64673 Zwingenberg / DE | 04 /
RENNER, Gerhard Berliner Strasse 29 64589 Stockstadt am Rhein / DE | 05 /
GOTTSCHALK, Michael Weimarer Strasse 28 64372 Ober-Ramstadt / DE | [2012/04] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/04] | Application number, filing date | 09779170.1 | 18.03.2009 | WO2009EP53177 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010105673 | Date: | 23.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2408437 | Date: | 25.01.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.09.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/50, A61K31/485 | [2012/04] | CPC: |
A61K9/5078 (EP,US);
A61K9/16 (KR);
A61K47/38 (KR);
A61K9/20 (KR);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P11/08 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P7/12 (EP);
A61P9/06 (EP);
A61P9/08 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2012/04] | Title | German: | PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT KONTROLLIERTER FREISETZUNG UND WIDERSTANDSFESTIGKEIT GEGEN DEN EINFLUSS VON ETHANOL MIT EINER BESCHICHTUNG AUS EINEM POLYMERGEMISCH UND HILFSSTOFFEN | [2012/04] | English: | CONTROLLED RELEASE PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION WITH RESISTANCE AGAINST THE INFLUENCE OF ETHANOL EMPLOYING A COATING COMPRISING A POLYMER MIXTURE AND EXCIPIENTS | [2012/04] | French: | COMPOSITION PHARMACEUTIQUE À LIBÉRATION CONTROLÉE AVEC RÉSISTANCE CONTRE L'INFLUENCE D'ÉTHANOL AU MOYEN D'UN ENROBAGE COMPORTANT UN MÉLANGE DE POLYMÈRES ET EXCIPIENTS | [2012/04] | Entry into regional phase | 23.08.2011 | National basic fee paid | 23.08.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.08.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.08.2011 | Examination requested [2012/04] | 20.03.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.08.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.02.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/29] | 16.03.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/29] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.08.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2004039357 (ROEHM GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-39 * examples 1-4 * * claim 1 *; | [DY]US2005163856 (MALONEY ANN [US], et al) [DY] 1-39 * claim 7 * * tables 1,3 * * abstract *; | [Y]WO2006125483 (ROEHM GMBH [DE], et al) [Y] 1-39 * page 47 - page 49 * * tables 1-3 *; | [A]WO2007085024 (ABBOTT GMBH & CO KG [DE], et al) [A] 1-39 * table 1 ** claims 1,10 *; | [Y]WO2008049657 (EVONIK ROEHM GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-39 * page 8 - page 11 * * examples 1-5 * * claims 1-11 * |