EP2320778 - DISPENSER SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.01.2018 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.02.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deb IP Limited Denby Hall Way Denby, Derbyshire DE5 8JZ / GB | [2017/10] |
Former [2014/45] | For all designated states Deb IP Limited Denby Hall Way Denby, Derbyshire DE5 8JZ / GB | ||
Former [2012/42] | For all designated states Evonik Degussa GmbH Rellinghauser Strasse 1-11 45128 Essen / DE | ||
Former [2011/20] | For all designated states Evonik Stockhausen GmbH Bäkerpfad 25 47805 Krefeld / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALLEF, Petra Raderfeld 71 47807 Krefeld / DE | 02 /
ZUR MÜHLEN, Annette Peter-Lauten-Strasse 8 47803 Krefeld / DE | 03 /
NAUELS, Bernd Krefelder Weg 14d 47906 Kempen / DE | 04 /
PIELEN, Markus Finkenweg 26 41366 Schwalmtal / DE | [2011/20] | Representative(s) | Thurston, Joanna Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/10] | Thurston, Joanna Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | ||
Former [2014/37] | Elsy, David Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | ||
Former [2011/20] | Bungartz, Klaus Peter Patentanwälte Bungartz & Tersteegen Eupener Strasse 161a 50933 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 09779391.3 | 30.04.2009 | [2011/20] | WO2009EP55278 | Priority number, date | DE20081002957 | 22.07.2008 Original published format: DE102008002957 | [2011/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010009910 | Date: | 28.01.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/04] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2320778 | Date: | 18.05.2011 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.01.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2320778 | Date: | 08.03.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A47K5/12 | [2011/20] | CPC: |
A47K5/14 (EP,US);
A47K5/1204 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/10] |
Former [2011/20] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | 14.10.2011 | BA | 14.10.2011 | RS | 14.10.2011 | Title | German: | SPENDERSYSTEM | [2011/20] | English: | DISPENSER SYSTEM | [2011/20] | French: | SYSTÈME DISTRIBUTEUR | [2011/20] | Entry into regional phase | 22.02.2011 | National basic fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.10.2011 | Examination requested [2011/47] | 14.11.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.11.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.05.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.01.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 24.01.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.01.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.11.2015 | Opposition(s) | 11.12.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.04.2009 | CY | 08.03.2017 | CZ | 08.03.2017 | DK | 08.03.2017 | EE | 08.03.2017 | ES | 08.03.2017 | FI | 08.03.2017 | HR | 08.03.2017 | IT | 08.03.2017 | LT | 08.03.2017 | LV | 08.03.2017 | MC | 08.03.2017 | MK | 08.03.2017 | MT | 08.03.2017 | PL | 08.03.2017 | RO | 08.03.2017 | SE | 08.03.2017 | SI | 08.03.2017 | SK | 08.03.2017 | TR | 08.03.2017 | AT | 30.04.2017 | BE | 30.04.2017 | CH | 30.04.2017 | IE | 30.04.2017 | LI | 30.04.2017 | LU | 30.04.2017 | FR | 09.05.2017 | BG | 08.06.2017 | NO | 08.06.2017 | GR | 09.06.2017 | IS | 08.07.2017 | PT | 10.07.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/51] | HU | 30.04.2009 | |
CY | 08.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.03.2017 | ||
DK | 08.03.2017 | ||
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
ES | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
MC | 08.03.2017 | ||
MK | 08.03.2017 | ||
MT | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
SI | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
AT | 30.04.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
IE | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
LU | 30.04.2017 | ||
FR | 09.05.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 30.04.2009 | |
CY | 08.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.03.2017 | ||
DK | 08.03.2017 | ||
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
ES | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
MC | 08.03.2017 | ||
MT | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
SI | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
AT | 30.04.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
IE | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
LU | 30.04.2017 | ||
FR | 09.05.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 30.04.2009 | |
CZ | 08.03.2017 | ||
DK | 08.03.2017 | ||
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
ES | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
MC | 08.03.2017 | ||
MT | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
SI | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
AT | 30.04.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
IE | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
LU | 30.04.2017 | ||
FR | 09.05.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 08.03.2017 | |
DK | 08.03.2017 | ||
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
ES | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
MC | 08.03.2017 | ||
MT | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
SI | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
AT | 30.04.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
IE | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
LU | 30.04.2017 | ||
FR | 09.05.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/40] | CZ | 08.03.2017 | |
DK | 08.03.2017 | ||
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
ES | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
MC | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
SI | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
AT | 30.04.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
IE | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
LU | 30.04.2017 | ||
FR | 09.05.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | CZ | 08.03.2017 | |
DK | 08.03.2017 | ||
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
ES | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
MC | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
SI | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
IE | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
LU | 30.04.2017 | ||
FR | 09.05.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | CZ | 08.03.2017 | |
DK | 08.03.2017 | ||
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
ES | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
MC | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
SI | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
LU | 30.04.2017 | ||
FR | 09.05.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | CZ | 08.03.2017 | |
DK | 08.03.2017 | ||
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
ES | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
MC | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
FR | 09.05.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | CZ | 08.03.2017 | |
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
ES | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
MC | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
FR | 09.05.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/06] | CZ | 08.03.2017 | |
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
ES | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
MC | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | CZ | 08.03.2017 | |
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
ES | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | CZ | 08.03.2017 | |
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
ES | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | CZ | 08.03.2017 | |
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
ES | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | CZ | 08.03.2017 | |
ES | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | ES | 08.03.2017 | |
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE29702014U (FAN CHEN YUEH [TW]) [A] 1-8,20,33* the whole document *; | [I]WO0040131 (STERIS INC [US]) [I] 1,5,6 * figures 1,2 *; | [XI]WO2006015973 (STOCKHAUSEN CHEM FAB GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1,7,8,11,12,14 * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0067]; figures 1-4 * [I] 2-6,20-24,33 | Examination | US5242081 |