Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8592557 | Global Dossier | 26.11.2013 | B2 | US2011111494 | 12.05.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2009EP57396 | 15.06.2009 | EP08010978 | 17.06.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2540740 | Global Dossier | 10.09.2014 | B1 | EP2540740 | 24.04.2013 | A3 | EP2540740 | 02.01.2013 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP12176681 | 15.06.2009 | EP09779764 | 15.06.2009 | EP08010978 | 17.06.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2310409 | Global Dossier | 20.04.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP09779764 | 15.06.2009 | WO2009EP57396 | 15.06.2009 | EP08010978 | 17.06.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2010003766 | Global Dossier | 22.04.2010 | A3 | WO2010003766 | 14.01.2010 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP08010978 | 17.06.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2524553T | 10.12.2014 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP08010978 | 17.06.2008 | Type | Divisional application | EP2540740 |