EP2310409 - MULTIMERIC TNF RECEPTORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.02.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.02.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.03.2013 [2013/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Apogenix GmbH Im Neuenheimer Feld 584 69120 Heidelberg / DE | [2011/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HILL, Oliver Greiner Straße 40 69239 Neckarsteinach / DE | 02 /
GIEFFERS, Christian Blütenweg 12 69221 Dossenheim / DE | 03 /
FISCHER, Carmen Kelterwiesen 27 74889 Sinsheim-Dühren / DE | [2011/16] | Representative(s) | Heubeck, Christian, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/02] | Heubeck, Christian, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/16] | Martin, Peter mtm laboratories AG Im Neuenheimer Feld 583 69120 Heidelberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 09779764.1 | 15.06.2009 | [2011/16] | WO2009EP57396 | Priority number, date | EP20080010978 | 17.06.2008 Original published format: EP 08010978 | [2011/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010003766 | Date: | 14.01.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/02] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2310409 | Date: | 20.04.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.01.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.04.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/705, C12N15/62 | [2011/16] | CPC: |
C07K14/70578 (EP,US);
C12N15/62 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/16] | Title | German: | MULTIMERE TNF-REZEPTOREN | [2011/16] | English: | MULTIMERIC TNF RECEPTORS | [2011/16] | French: | RÉCEPTEURS MULTIMÉRIQUES TNF | [2011/16] | Entry into regional phase | 17.01.2011 | National basic fee paid | 17.01.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.01.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.01.2011 | Examination requested [2011/16] | 28.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.01.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.09.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/11] | 29.10.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/11] | Divisional application(s) | EP12176681.0 / EP2540740 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.07.2011 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 19.01.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 19.01.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 01.02.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO02090553 (APOTECH RES & DEV LTD [CH], et al) [X] 1-36 * page 3 - page 6 *; | [Y]WO2004033486 (ZYMOGENETICS INC [US]) [Y] 1-36 * page 8 - page 9 *; | [Y]WO0200893 (CANCER RES VENTURES LTD [GB], et al) [Y] 1-36 * the whole document *; | [A] - MEIER S ET AL, "Foldon, The Natural Trimerization Domain of T4 Fibritin, Dissociates into a Monomeric A-state Form containing a Stable beta-Hairpin: Atomic Details of Trimer Dissociation and Local beta-Hairpin Stability from Residual Dipolar Couplings", JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, LONDON, GB, (20041203), vol. 344, no. 4, ISSN 0022-2836, pages 1051 - 1069, XP004635848 [A] 1-36 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jmb.2004.09.079 | [DA] - HAAKANSSON K ET AL, "Collectin structure: a review", PROTEIN SCIENCE, CAMBRIDGE UNIVERSITY PRESS, CAMBRIDGE, GB, (20000901), vol. 9, no. 9, ISSN 0961-8368, pages 1607 - 1617, XP002528952 [DA] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1110/ps.9.9.1607 | [DA] - WAJANT H, "DEATH RECEPTORS", ESSAYS IN BIOCHEMISTRY, PORTLAND PRESS, COLCHESTER, GB, (20030101), vol. 39, ISSN 0071-1365, pages 53 - 71, XP009027937 [DA] * the whole document * | Examination | WO2008025516 |