EP2304320 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING OR MONITORING FIRING SYSTEMS AND FOR MONITORING BUILDINGS HAVING GAS BURNERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.06.2016 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.07.2016 [2016/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | [2013/11] |
Former [2011/14] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, Jia Ackerstr. 1 Appart. 65 81541 München / DE | 02 /
HANGAUER, Andreas Ackerstrasse 1 81541 München / DE | 03 /
LINK, Hans Vormberger Str. 27 76547 Sinzheim / DE | 04 /
STRZODA, Rainer Batschkastr. 16 81825 München / DE | [2011/14] | Application number, filing date | 09780118.7 | 03.07.2009 | [2011/14] | WO2009EP58384 | Priority number, date | DE20081032223 | 09.07.2008 Original published format: DE102008032223 | DE20091009314 | 17.02.2009 Original published format: DE102009009314 | [2011/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010003890 | Date: | 14.01.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/02] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2304320 | Date: | 06.04.2011 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.01.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F23N5/00, G01J3/42, G01N21/39 | [2011/14] | CPC: |
F23N5/003 (EP,US);
G01J3/4338 (EP,US);
G01N21/3504 (EP,US);
G01N21/39 (EP,US);
F23M2900/11041 (EP,US);
F23N2231/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/14] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR REGELUNG ODER ÜBERWACHUNG VON FEUERUNGSANLAGEN SOWIE ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG VON GEBÄUDEN MIT GASBRENNERN | [2011/14] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING OR MONITORING FIRING SYSTEMS AND FOR MONITORING BUILDINGS HAVING GAS BURNERS | [2011/14] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE RÉGULATION OU DE CONTRÔLE D'INSTALLATIONS DE CHAUFFAGE ET DE CONTRÔLE DE BÂTIMENTS CONTENANT DES BRÛLEURS À GAZ | [2011/14] | Entry into regional phase | 30.11.2010 | National basic fee paid | 30.11.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.11.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.04.2010 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 30.11.2010 | Examination requested [2011/14] | 25.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.02.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/27] | 29.02.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2015 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US7012696 (ORR BRIAN J [AU], et al) [X] 1-8,10,12-15 * column 1, line 10 - line 13 * * column 3, line 16 - column 4, line 31 * * column 7, line 32 - line 45 * * column 14, line 34 - column 15, line 31 * * column 25, line 40 - line 65 * * column 27, line 62 - column 28, line 24 * * figures 1,12,15; table . *; | [A]EP1816464 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1,2,15 * page 3, line 18 - page 4, line 30 * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]DE102006036563 (SIEMENS BUILDING TECH AG [DE]) [A] 1,2,15 * page 2, paragraph 1 * * page 4, paragraph 30 - page 5, paragraph 35 * * figure 1 * |