EP2312928 - DRIVE SYSTEM FOR AN INFEED CONVEYOR OF A HARVESTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.11.2012 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deere & Company One John Deere Place Moline, IL 61265 / US | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/17] | For all designated states Deere & Company One John Deere Place Moline, IL 61265-8098 / US | ||
For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOHRER, Stefan Mühlenstrasse 3 66606 St. Wendel / DE | 02 /
ROSSBACH, Konrad Max-Schmied-Str. 47 89358 Kammeltal / DE | [2011/17] | Representative(s) | Holst, Sönke John Deere GmbH & Co. KG Global Intellectual Property Services John-Deere-Strasse 70 68163 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/04] | Holst, Sönke Deere & Company European Office Global Intellectual Property Services John-Deere-Strasse 70 68163 Mannheim / DE | ||
Former [2011/17] | Holst, Sönke Deere & Company European Office Global Intellectual Property Services John-Deere-Strasse 70 68163 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 09780288.8 | 07.07.2009 | [2011/17] | WO2009EP58636 | Priority number, date | DE20081040357 | 11.07.2008 Original published format: DE102008040357 | DE20091002849 | 06.05.2009 Original published format: DE102009002849 | [2011/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010003966 | Date: | 14.01.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2312928 | Date: | 27.04.2011 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.01.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2312928 | Date: | 25.01.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.01.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A01D75/18, F16P3/00, F16H61/42 | [2011/39] | CPC: |
A01D41/1274 (EP,US);
A01D75/187 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/17] | A01F29/16, F16H61/42 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/17] | Title | German: | ANTRIEBSSYSTEM FÜR EINEN EINZUGSFÖRDERER EINER ERNTEMASCHINE | [2011/17] | English: | DRIVE SYSTEM FOR AN INFEED CONVEYOR OF A HARVESTER | [2011/17] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ENTRAÎNEMENT POUR UN TRANSPORTEUR D'ALIMENTATION DE MOISSONNEUSE | [2011/17] | Entry into regional phase | 11.02.2011 | National basic fee paid | 11.02.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.02.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.12.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.02.2011 | Examination requested [2011/17] | 16.09.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.12.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 05.12.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.09.2011 | Opposition(s) | 26.10.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.07.2009 | CY | 25.01.2012 | CZ | 25.01.2012 | DK | 25.01.2012 | EE | 25.01.2012 | FI | 25.01.2012 | HR | 25.01.2012 | IE | 25.01.2012 | IT | 25.01.2012 | LT | 25.01.2012 | LV | 25.01.2012 | MK | 25.01.2012 | MT | 25.01.2012 | NL | 25.01.2012 | PL | 25.01.2012 | RO | 25.01.2012 | SE | 25.01.2012 | SI | 25.01.2012 | SK | 25.01.2012 | SM | 25.01.2012 | TR | 25.01.2012 | BG | 25.04.2012 | NO | 25.04.2012 | GR | 26.04.2012 | ES | 06.05.2012 | IS | 25.05.2012 | PT | 25.05.2012 | LU | 07.07.2012 | FR | 31.07.2012 | MC | 31.07.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | CY | 25.01.2012 | |
CZ | 25.01.2012 | ||
DK | 25.01.2012 | ||
EE | 25.01.2012 | ||
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
HR | 25.01.2012 | ||
IE | 25.01.2012 | ||
IT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LV | 25.01.2012 | ||
MK | 25.01.2012 | ||
MT | 25.01.2012 | ||
NL | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
RO | 25.01.2012 | ||
SE | 25.01.2012 | ||
SI | 25.01.2012 | ||
SK | 25.01.2012 | ||
SM | 25.01.2012 | ||
TR | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
ES | 06.05.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
LU | 07.07.2012 | ||
FR | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 25.01.2012 | |
CZ | 25.01.2012 | ||
DK | 25.01.2012 | ||
EE | 25.01.2012 | ||
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
HR | 25.01.2012 | ||
IE | 25.01.2012 | ||
IT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LV | 25.01.2012 | ||
MK | 25.01.2012 | ||
MT | 25.01.2012 | ||
NL | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
RO | 25.01.2012 | ||
SE | 25.01.2012 | ||
SI | 25.01.2012 | ||
SK | 25.01.2012 | ||
TR | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
ES | 06.05.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
FR | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CY | 25.01.2012 | |
CZ | 25.01.2012 | ||
DK | 25.01.2012 | ||
EE | 25.01.2012 | ||
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
HR | 25.01.2012 | ||
IE | 25.01.2012 | ||
IT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LV | 25.01.2012 | ||
MK | 25.01.2012 | ||
MT | 25.01.2012 | ||
NL | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
RO | 25.01.2012 | ||
SE | 25.01.2012 | ||
SI | 25.01.2012 | ||
SK | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
ES | 06.05.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
FR | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | CY | 25.01.2012 | |
CZ | 25.01.2012 | ||
DK | 25.01.2012 | ||
EE | 25.01.2012 | ||
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
HR | 25.01.2012 | ||
IE | 25.01.2012 | ||
IT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LV | 25.01.2012 | ||
MK | 25.01.2012 | ||
NL | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
RO | 25.01.2012 | ||
SE | 25.01.2012 | ||
SI | 25.01.2012 | ||
SK | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
ES | 06.05.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
FR | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 25.01.2012 | |
CZ | 25.01.2012 | ||
DK | 25.01.2012 | ||
EE | 25.01.2012 | ||
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
HR | 25.01.2012 | ||
IE | 25.01.2012 | ||
IT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LV | 25.01.2012 | ||
MK | 25.01.2012 | ||
NL | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
RO | 25.01.2012 | ||
SE | 25.01.2012 | ||
SI | 25.01.2012 | ||
SK | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
ES | 06.05.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | CY | 25.01.2012 | |
CZ | 25.01.2012 | ||
DK | 25.01.2012 | ||
EE | 25.01.2012 | ||
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
HR | 25.01.2012 | ||
IE | 25.01.2012 | ||
IT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LV | 25.01.2012 | ||
MK | 25.01.2012 | ||
NL | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
RO | 25.01.2012 | ||
SE | 25.01.2012 | ||
SI | 25.01.2012 | ||
SK | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | CY | 25.01.2012 | |
CZ | 25.01.2012 | ||
DK | 25.01.2012 | ||
EE | 25.01.2012 | ||
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
HR | 25.01.2012 | ||
IE | 25.01.2012 | ||
IT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LV | 25.01.2012 | ||
NL | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
RO | 25.01.2012 | ||
SE | 25.01.2012 | ||
SI | 25.01.2012 | ||
SK | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 25.01.2012 | |
CZ | 25.01.2012 | ||
DK | 25.01.2012 | ||
EE | 25.01.2012 | ||
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
HR | 25.01.2012 | ||
IE | 25.01.2012 | ||
IT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LV | 25.01.2012 | ||
NL | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
RO | 25.01.2012 | ||
SE | 25.01.2012 | ||
SI | 25.01.2012 | ||
SK | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 25.01.2012 | |
CZ | 25.01.2012 | ||
DK | 25.01.2012 | ||
EE | 25.01.2012 | ||
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
HR | 25.01.2012 | ||
IE | 25.01.2012 | ||
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LV | 25.01.2012 | ||
NL | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
RO | 25.01.2012 | ||
SE | 25.01.2012 | ||
SI | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | CY | 25.01.2012 | |
EE | 25.01.2012 | ||
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
HR | 25.01.2012 | ||
IE | 25.01.2012 | ||
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LV | 25.01.2012 | ||
NL | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
SE | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | CY | 25.01.2012 | |
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
HR | 25.01.2012 | ||
IE | 25.01.2012 | ||
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LV | 25.01.2012 | ||
NL | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | CY | 25.01.2012 | |
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
HR | 25.01.2012 | ||
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LV | 25.01.2012 | ||
NL | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/39] | FI | 25.01.2012 | |
HR | 25.01.2012 | ||
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LV | 25.01.2012 | ||
NL | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | FI | 25.01.2012 | |
HR | 25.01.2012 | ||
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
NL | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | HR | 25.01.2012 | |
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
NL | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | LT | 25.01.2012 | |
NL | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.04.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | LT | 25.01.2012 | |
NO | 25.04.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | Cited in | International search | [DA]WO0165919 (FORD NEW HOLLAND NV [BE], et al) [DA] 1-12 * page 11, paragraph 2; figure 3 *; | [DX]WO0209498 (CASE HARVESTING SYS GMBH [DE], et al) [DX] 1,11,12 * page 7, paragraph 4 - page 9, paragraph 1; figures 1-3 *; | [DA]EP1721518 (CLAAS SELBSTFAHR ERNTEMASCH [DE]) [DA] 1-12* paragraph [0035]; figure 3 * |