EP2299892 - CONNECTABLE DOSING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 22.10.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstraße 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/13] | For all designated states Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KESSLER, Arnd Humboldtstraße 53 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | 02 /
FILECCIA, Salvatore Tulpenstr. 20 46049 Oberhausen / DE | 03 /
EICHHOLZ, Dieter Wittekindweg 8a 58642 Iserlohn / DE | 04 /
JANS, Gerold Reinhold-Abele-Str. 24 88289 Waldburg / DE | [2011/13] | Representative(s) | Wagner Albiger & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Siegfried-Leopold-Straße 27 53225 Bonn / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 09780541.0 | 14.07.2009 | [2011/13] | WO2009EP58959 | Priority number, date | DE20081033108 | 15.07.2008 Original published format: DE102008033108 | [2011/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010007045 | Date: | 21.01.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2299892 | Date: | 30.03.2011 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.01.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2299892 | Date: | 17.06.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.01.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A47L15/44 | [2011/13] | CPC: |
A47L15/4463 (EP,US);
A47L15/006 (EP,US);
A47L15/4454 (EP,US);
A47L2401/30 (EP,US);
A47L2501/07 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/25] |
Former [2011/13] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | KOPPELBARES DOSIERGERÄT | [2011/13] | English: | CONNECTABLE DOSING DEVICE | [2011/13] | French: | APPAREIL DE DOSAGE COUPLABLE | [2011/13] | Entry into regional phase | 11.11.2010 | National basic fee paid | 11.11.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.11.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.11.2010 | Examination requested [2011/13] | 08.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.08.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.12.2014 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 27.01.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.04.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 30.04.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.04.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.08.2014 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
17.03.2016
22.03.2016
ADMISSIBLE Reckitt Benckiser Finish B.V. Siriusdreef 14 2132 WT Hoofddorp / NL Opponent's representative Heritage, Kevin Stephen Charles, et al, et al Reckitt Benckiser Corporate Services Limited Legal Department - Patents Group Dansom Lane Hull HU8 7DS / GB | [2017/15] |
Former [2016/16] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.03.2016
Reckitt Benckiser Finish B.V. Siriusdreef 14 2132 WT Hoofddorp / NL Opponent's representative Hewett, Erica Louise, et al, et al Reckitt Benckiser Corporate Services Limited Legal Department - Patents Group Dansom Lane Hull, East Yorkshire HU8 7DS / GB | 21.04.2016 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 17.08.2016 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 27.10.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 20.12.2017 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 20.12.2017 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 07.10.2021 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2021/47] | Appeal following opposition | 20.02.2018 | Appeal received No. T0501/18 | 30.04.2018 | Statement of grounds filed | 07.10.2021 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent withdrawn | 07.10.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.07.2009 | CY | 17.06.2015 | CZ | 17.06.2015 | DK | 17.06.2015 | EE | 17.06.2015 | FI | 17.06.2015 | HR | 17.06.2015 | LT | 17.06.2015 | LV | 17.06.2015 | MC | 17.06.2015 | MK | 17.06.2015 | MT | 17.06.2015 | NL | 17.06.2015 | RO | 17.06.2015 | SE | 17.06.2015 | SI | 17.06.2015 | SK | 17.06.2015 | SM | 17.06.2015 | IE | 14.07.2015 | LU | 14.07.2015 | BE | 31.07.2015 | BG | 17.09.2015 | NO | 17.09.2015 | GR | 18.09.2015 | IS | 17.10.2015 | PT | 19.10.2015 | AT | 14.07.2019 | IT | 14.07.2019 | PL | 14.07.2019 | TR | 14.07.2019 | ES | 15.07.2019 | CH | 31.07.2019 | LI | 31.07.2019 | [2022/30] |
Former [2022/13] | HU | 14.07.2009 | |
CY | 17.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2015 | ||
DK | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
MC | 17.06.2015 | ||
MK | 17.06.2015 | ||
MT | 17.06.2015 | ||
NL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
SE | 17.06.2015 | ||
SI | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
SM | 17.06.2015 | ||
IE | 14.07.2015 | ||
LU | 14.07.2015 | ||
BE | 31.07.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
AT | 14.07.2019 | ||
IT | 14.07.2019 | ||
PL | 14.07.2019 | ||
ES | 15.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
Former [2021/09] | HU | 14.07.2009 | |
CY | 17.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2015 | ||
DK | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
MC | 17.06.2015 | ||
MK | 17.06.2015 | ||
MT | 17.06.2015 | ||
NL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
SE | 17.06.2015 | ||
SI | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
SM | 17.06.2015 | ||
IE | 14.07.2015 | ||
LU | 14.07.2015 | ||
BE | 31.07.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
AT | 14.07.2019 | ||
IT | 14.07.2019 | ||
ES | 15.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/39] | HU | 14.07.2009 | |
CY | 17.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2015 | ||
DK | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
MC | 17.06.2015 | ||
MK | 17.06.2015 | ||
MT | 17.06.2015 | ||
NL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
SE | 17.06.2015 | ||
SI | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
SM | 17.06.2015 | ||
IE | 14.07.2015 | ||
LU | 14.07.2015 | ||
BE | 31.07.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
AT | 14.07.2019 | ||
IT | 14.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | HU | 14.07.2009 | |
CY | 17.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2015 | ||
DK | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
MC | 17.06.2015 | ||
MK | 17.06.2015 | ||
MT | 17.06.2015 | ||
NL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
SE | 17.06.2015 | ||
SI | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
SM | 17.06.2015 | ||
IE | 14.07.2015 | ||
LU | 14.07.2015 | ||
BE | 31.07.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
AT | 14.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/23] | HU | 14.07.2009 | |
CY | 17.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2015 | ||
DK | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
MC | 17.06.2015 | ||
MK | 17.06.2015 | ||
MT | 17.06.2015 | ||
NL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
SE | 17.06.2015 | ||
SI | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
SM | 17.06.2015 | ||
IE | 14.07.2015 | ||
LU | 14.07.2015 | ||
BE | 31.07.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
AT | 14.07.2019 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 14.07.2009 | |
CY | 17.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2015 | ||
DK | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
MC | 17.06.2015 | ||
MK | 17.06.2015 | ||
MT | 17.06.2015 | ||
NL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
SE | 17.06.2015 | ||
SI | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
SM | 17.06.2015 | ||
IE | 14.07.2015 | ||
LU | 14.07.2015 | ||
BE | 31.07.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
Former [2018/02] | HU | 14.07.2009 | |
CY | 17.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2015 | ||
DK | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
MC | 17.06.2015 | ||
MT | 17.06.2015 | ||
NL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
SE | 17.06.2015 | ||
SI | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
SM | 17.06.2015 | ||
IE | 14.07.2015 | ||
LU | 14.07.2015 | ||
BE | 31.07.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 14.07.2009 | |
CY | 17.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2015 | ||
DK | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
MC | 17.06.2015 | ||
MT | 17.06.2015 | ||
NL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
SE | 17.06.2015 | ||
SI | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
SM | 17.06.2015 | ||
IE | 14.07.2015 | ||
BE | 31.07.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
Former [2017/21] | CZ | 17.06.2015 | |
DK | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
MC | 17.06.2015 | ||
MT | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
SI | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
IE | 14.07.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | CZ | 17.06.2015 | |
DK | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
MC | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
SI | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
IE | 14.07.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | CZ | 17.06.2015 | |
DK | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
MC | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
IE | 14.07.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | CZ | 17.06.2015 | |
DK | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
MC | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/18] | CZ | 17.06.2015 | |
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
MC | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | CZ | 17.06.2015 | |
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | EE | 17.06.2015 | |
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | FI | 17.06.2015 | |
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | FI | 17.06.2015 | |
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO0229150 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * page 4, line 30 - page 22, line 20 *; | [Y]DE102006043916 (BSH BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0018] - [0025] - [0052] *; | [YA]DE102006038341 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [Y] 1 * paragraphs [0027] - [0066] * [A] 2-14; | [A]DE10260144 (BSH BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0034] , [0035] *; | [YP]DE102008027284 (AWECO APPLIANCE SYS GMBH & CO [DE]) [YP] 1-3 * paragraphs [0041] - [0053] *; | [YP]DE202007018460U (AWECO APPLIANCE SYS GMBH & CO [DE]) [YP] 1 * paragraphs [0017] - [0023] *; | [Y]DE102006043973 (BSH BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [Y] 1,6 * paragraphs [0047] - [0048] *; | [AP]WO2009022223 (ELTEK SPA [IT], et al) [AP] 1-15 * page 7, line 22 - page 75, line 10 * | Opposition | DE102006043916 | EP0678275 | EP0392196 |