EP2337933 - DEVICE FOR THE METERED ADDITION OF FUEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.05.2012 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.05.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.06.2012 [2012/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2011/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOERNER, Markus Rudolfstr. 15 70794 Filderstadt-Bernhausen / DE | 02 /
BENITSCH, Jens Erlenstr. 2 89077 Ulm / DE | [2011/26] | Application number, filing date | 09780605.3 | 15.07.2009 | [2011/26] | WO2009EP59032 | Priority number, date | DE20081042108 | 15.09.2008 Original published format: DE102008042108 | [2011/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010028888 | Date: | 18.03.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2337933 | Date: | 29.06.2011 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.03.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F01N3/025, F01N3/20, F01N3/36, F01N9/00 | [2011/26] | CPC: |
F01N3/0253 (EP,US);
F01N3/36 (EP,US);
F01N2260/04 (EP,US);
F01N2610/03 (EP,US);
F01N2610/14 (EP,US);
F01N2610/1446 (EP,US);
F01N2610/1473 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/26] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR EINDOSIERUNG VON KRAFTSTOFF | [2011/26] | English: | DEVICE FOR THE METERED ADDITION OF FUEL | [2011/26] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DOSAGE DE CARBURANT | [2011/26] | Entry into regional phase | 15.04.2011 | National basic fee paid | 15.04.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.04.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.04.2011 | Examination requested [2011/26] | 31.05.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.08.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.12.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/24] | 30.01.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/24] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.08.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE102006062491 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1-6 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0029] *; | [X]DE102006032155 (DAIMLER AG [DE]) [X] 1-3,6 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0016]; figure 1 *; | [A]WO0079108 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al) [A] 1 * page 7, line 22 - page 8, line 4; figure 1 *; | [A]US2005252201 (LECEA OSCAR A [US], et al) [A] 1 * paragraph [0033]; figure 3 * |