EP2313436 - AMINO ACID SEQUENCES DIRECTED AGAINST MULTITARGET SCAVENGER RECEPTORS AND POLYPEPTIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.10.2015 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ablynx N.V. Technologiepark 21 9052 Ghent-Zwijnaarde / BE | [2014/48] |
Former [2011/17] | For all designated states Ablynx NV Technologiepark 21 9052 Ghent-Zwijnaarde / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SARAIVA, Maria Joao R Bessa Leite 856 Hab 31 P-4150 Porto / PT | 02 /
VANLANDSCHOOT, Peter Markettestraat 20-A B-9881 Bellem / BE | 03 /
DOLK, Edward Aldo van Eyckplantsoen 95 NL-3544 LD Utrecht / NL | 04 /
DE BRUIN, Renée Raamstraat 26 NL-3513 EZ Utrecht / NL | [2014/47] |
Former [2011/24] | 01 /
SARAIVA, Maria Joao R Bessa Leite 856 Hab 31 P-4150 Porto / PT | ||
02 /
VANLANDSCHOOT, Peter Markettestraat 20-A B-9881 Bellem / BE | |||
03 /
DOLK, Edward Aldo van Eyckplantsoen 95 NL-3544 LD Utrecht / NL | |||
04 /
DE BRUIN, Renee Titus van Rijnstraat 275 NL-1058 GB Amsterdam / NL | |||
Former [2011/17] | 01 /
SARAIVA, Maria Joao R Bessa Leite 856 Hab 31 P-4150 Porto / PT | ||
02 /
VANLANDSCHOOT, Peter Markettestraat 20-A B-9881 Bellem / BE | |||
03 /
DOLK, Edward Aldo van Eyckplantsoen 95 NL-3544 LD Utrecht / NL | |||
04 /
DE BRUIN, Renee Raamstraat 26 NL-3513 EZ Utrecht / NL | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2014/48] |
Former [2011/17] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastraße 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09780925.5 | 22.07.2009 | [2011/17] | WO2009EP59424 | Priority number, date | US20080082614P | 22.07.2008 Original published format: US 82614 P | [2011/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010010119 | Date: | 28.01.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2313436 | Date: | 27.04.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.01.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2313436 | Date: | 26.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.01.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/28 | [2011/17] | CPC: |
C07K16/2803 (EP,US);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/17] | Title | German: | GEGEN MULTITARGET-SCAVENGER-REZEPTOREN UND POLYPEPTIDE GERICHTETE AMINOSÄURESEQUENZEN | [2011/17] | English: | AMINO ACID SEQUENCES DIRECTED AGAINST MULTITARGET SCAVENGER RECEPTORS AND POLYPEPTIDES | [2011/17] | French: | SÉQUENCES D ACIDES AMINÉS DIRIGÉES CONTRE DES RÉCEPTEURS DE DÉSACTIVEURS MULTICIBLES ET POLYPEPTIDES | [2011/17] | Entry into regional phase | 03.02.2011 | National basic fee paid | 03.02.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.02.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.02.2011 | Examination requested [2011/17] | 18.04.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.10.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.2014 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 13.02.2014 | 13.02.2014 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 30.06.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.10.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 14.10.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.10.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.03.2012 | Opposition(s) | 27.08.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.07.2009 | AT | 26.11.2014 | BE | 26.11.2014 | BG | 26.11.2014 | CY | 26.11.2014 | CZ | 26.11.2014 | DK | 26.11.2014 | EE | 26.11.2014 | ES | 26.11.2014 | FI | 26.11.2014 | HR | 26.11.2014 | IT | 26.11.2014 | LT | 26.11.2014 | LV | 26.11.2014 | MC | 26.11.2014 | MK | 26.11.2014 | MT | 26.11.2014 | NL | 26.11.2014 | PL | 26.11.2014 | RO | 26.11.2014 | SE | 26.11.2014 | SI | 26.11.2014 | SK | 26.11.2014 | SM | 26.11.2014 | TR | 26.11.2014 | NO | 26.02.2015 | GR | 27.02.2015 | IS | 26.03.2015 | PT | 26.03.2015 | LU | 22.07.2015 | [2018/30] |
Former [2017/46] | HU | 22.07.2009 | |
AT | 26.11.2014 | ||
BE | 26.11.2014 | ||
BG | 26.11.2014 | ||
CY | 26.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.11.2014 | ||
DK | 26.11.2014 | ||
EE | 26.11.2014 | ||
ES | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
HR | 26.11.2014 | ||
IT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
MC | 26.11.2014 | ||
MT | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
PL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RO | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
SI | 26.11.2014 | ||
SK | 26.11.2014 | ||
SM | 26.11.2014 | ||
TR | 26.11.2014 | ||
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
LU | 22.07.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 22.07.2009 | |
AT | 26.11.2014 | ||
BG | 26.11.2014 | ||
CY | 26.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.11.2014 | ||
DK | 26.11.2014 | ||
EE | 26.11.2014 | ||
ES | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
HR | 26.11.2014 | ||
IT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
MC | 26.11.2014 | ||
MT | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
PL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RO | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
SI | 26.11.2014 | ||
SK | 26.11.2014 | ||
SM | 26.11.2014 | ||
TR | 26.11.2014 | ||
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
LU | 22.07.2015 | ||
Former [2017/21] | AT | 26.11.2014 | |
CY | 26.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.11.2014 | ||
DK | 26.11.2014 | ||
EE | 26.11.2014 | ||
ES | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
HR | 26.11.2014 | ||
IT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
MC | 26.11.2014 | ||
MT | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
PL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RO | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
SI | 26.11.2014 | ||
SK | 26.11.2014 | ||
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
LU | 22.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/15] | AT | 26.11.2014 | |
CY | 26.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.11.2014 | ||
DK | 26.11.2014 | ||
EE | 26.11.2014 | ||
ES | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
HR | 26.11.2014 | ||
IT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
MC | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
PL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RO | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
SI | 26.11.2014 | ||
SK | 26.11.2014 | ||
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
LU | 22.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/13] | AT | 26.11.2014 | |
CY | 26.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.11.2014 | ||
DK | 26.11.2014 | ||
EE | 26.11.2014 | ||
ES | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
HR | 26.11.2014 | ||
IT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
MC | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
PL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RO | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
SI | 26.11.2014 | ||
SK | 26.11.2014 | ||
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 26.11.2014 | |
CY | 26.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.11.2014 | ||
DK | 26.11.2014 | ||
EE | 26.11.2014 | ||
ES | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
HR | 26.11.2014 | ||
IT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
PL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RO | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
SI | 26.11.2014 | ||
SK | 26.11.2014 | ||
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | AT | 26.11.2014 | |
CY | 26.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.11.2014 | ||
DK | 26.11.2014 | ||
EE | 26.11.2014 | ||
ES | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
HR | 26.11.2014 | ||
IT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
PL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RO | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
SK | 26.11.2014 | ||
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 26.11.2014 | |
CY | 26.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.11.2014 | ||
DK | 26.11.2014 | ||
EE | 26.11.2014 | ||
ES | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
HR | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
PL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RO | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
SK | 26.11.2014 | ||
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 26.11.2014 | |
CY | 26.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.11.2014 | ||
DK | 26.11.2014 | ||
EE | 26.11.2014 | ||
ES | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
HR | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RO | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 26.11.2014 | |
CY | 26.11.2014 | ||
DK | 26.11.2014 | ||
EE | 26.11.2014 | ||
ES | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
HR | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/26] | AT | 26.11.2014 | |
CY | 26.11.2014 | ||
ES | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
HR | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 26.11.2014 | |
ES | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
HR | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | ES | 26.11.2014 | |
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
HR | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | ES | 26.11.2014 | |
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | LT | 26.11.2014 | |
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/21] | LT | 26.11.2014 | |
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 26.11.2014 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO2007109747 (WYETH CORP [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * page 1, paragraph 3 - page 59, paragraph 2 *; | [Y]WO2007109749 (WYETH CORP [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * page 4 - page 10; example 29 *; | [Y]US2003143226 (KOBAYASHI YUKO [JP], et al) [Y] 1,15 * page 2, paragraph 19 - page 9, paragraph 155 *; | [Y]WO2006079372 (ABLYNX NV [BE], et al) [Y] 1-15 * page 12 - page 38 * * page 79 - page 135; examples 1-21 *; | [Y] - BRO S ET AL, "A neutralizing antibody against receptor for advanced glycation end products (RAGE) reduces atherosclerosis in uremic mice", ATHEROSCLEROSIS, ELSEVIER IRELAND LTD, IE, vol. 201, no. 2, ISSN 0021-9150, (200812), pages 274 - 280, (20080216), XP025780373 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.atherosclerosis.2008.01.015 | [Y] - LUTTERLOH EMILY C ET AL, "Inhibition of the RAGE products increases survival in experimental models of severe sepsis and systemic infection", CRITICAL CARE, BIOMED CENTRAL LTD., LONDON, GB, (20071106), vol. 11, no. 6, ISSN 1364-8535, page R122, XP021041366 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * | [Y] - ABD SEROTEC, "DATASHEET MCA1322T", (2007), URL: http://www.abdserotec.com/catalog/datasheetPdf.ashx?ProductID=143497&EntityID=0, (20091030), XP002553159 [Y] 1,15 * the whole document * | [Y] - ARBABI GHAHROUDI M ET AL, "Selection and identification of single domain antibody fragments from camel heavy-chain antibodies", FEBS LETTERS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (19970915), vol. 414, no. 3, ISSN 0014-5793, pages 521 - 526, XP004261105 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0014-5793(97)01062-4 | [Y] - HOLLIGER PHILIPP ET AL, "Engineered antibody fragments and the rise of single domains", NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20050901), vol. 23, no. 9, ISSN 1087-0156, pages 1126 - 1136, XP008076746 [Y] 1-15 * page 1127 - page 1128 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt1142 | [Y] - REVETS H ET AL, "Nanobodies as novel agents for cancer therapy", EXPERT OPINION ON BIOLOGICAL THERAPY, ASHLEY, LONDON, GB, (20050101), vol. 5, no. 1, ISSN 1471-2598, pages 111 - 124, XP009076361 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1517/14712598.5.1.111 | [Y] - HULSTEIN JANINE J J ET AL, "A novel nanobody that detects the gain-of-function phenotype of von Willebrand factor in ADAMTS 13 deficiency and von Willebrand disease type 2B", BLOOD, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF HEMATOLOGY, US, (20051101), vol. 106, no. 9, ISSN 0006-4971, pages 3035 - 3042, XP002434260 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1182/blood-2005-03-1153 | [Y] - LUE L-F ET AL, "Preventing Activation of Receptor for Advanced Glycation Endproducts in Alzheimer's DiseaseSE", CURRENT DRUG TARGETS. CNS & NEUROLOGICAL DISORDERS, BENTHAM SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, HILVERSUM, NL, (20050601), vol. 4, no. 3, ISSN 1568-007X, pages 249 - 266, XP009058262 [Y] 4,15 * page 261 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2174/1568007054038210 | [Y] - BUCCIARELLI L G ET AL, "RAGE is a multiligand receptor of the immunoglobulin superfamily: implications for homeostasis and chronic disease", CMLS CELLULAR AND MOLECULAR LIFE SCIENCES, BIRKHAUSER VERLAG, HEIDELBERG, DE, (20020101), vol. 59, no. 7, ISSN 1420-682X, pages 1117 - 1128, XP001181919 [Y] 4,15 * page 1121 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00018-002-8491-x | [Y] - DEANE RASHID ET AL, "RAGE (yin) versus LRP (yang) balance regulates alzheimer amyloid beta-peptide clearance through transport across the blood-brain barrier.", STROKE; A JOURNAL OF CEREBRAL CIRCULATION NOV 2004, (200411), vol. 35, no. 11 Suppl 1, ISSN 1524-4628, pages 2628 - 2631, XP002553160 [Y] 4,15 * page 2630 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/ | [Y] - YAN SHI DU ET AL, "Receptor-dependent cell stress and amyloid accumulation in systemic amyloidosis", NATURE MEDICINE, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20000601), vol. 6, no. 6, ISSN 1078-8956, pages 643 - 651, XP002316616 [Y] 4,15 * page 644 - page 647 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/76216 | [Y] - HUSEMANN JENS ET AL, "Scavenger receptors in neurobiology and neuropathology: their role on microglia and other cells of the nervous system.", GLIA NOV 2002, (200211), vol. 40, no. 2, ISSN 0894-1491, pages 195 - 205, XP002553161 [Y] 15 * page 200, column 2 - page 202, column 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/glia.10148 | Examination | - MONTEIRO ET AL, "In vitro inhibition of transthyretin aggregate-induced cytotoxicity by full and peptide derived forms of the soluble receptor for advanced glycation end products (RAGE)", FEBS LETTERS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20060612), vol. 580, no. 14, doi:10.1016/J.FEBSLET.2006.05.020, ISSN 0014-5793, pages 3451 - 3456, XP005511106 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.febslet.2006.05.020 | - SOUSA ET AL, "Familial amyloid polyneuropathy: receptor for advanced glycation end products-dependent triggering of neuronal inflammatory and apoptotic pathways.", JOURNAL OF NEUROSCIENCE, (20011001), vol. 21, no. 19, ISSN 0270-6474, pages 7576 - 7586, XP055021746 | - STURCHLER EMMANUEL ET AL, "Site-specific blockade of RAGE-V-d prevents amyloid-beta oligomer neurotoxicity", JOURNAL OF NEUROSCIENCE, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20080501), vol. 28, no. 20, doi:10.1523/JNEUROSCI.4878-07.2008, ISSN 0270-6474, pages 5149 - 5158, XP002541369 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1523/JNEUROSCI.4878-07.2008 | - SOUSA MONICA MENDES ET AL, "Interaction of the receptor for advanced glycation end products (RAGE) with transthyretin triggers nuclear transcription factor kB (NF-kB) activation", LABORATORY INVESTIGATION, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, THE UNITED STATES AND CANADIAN ACADEMY OF PALHOLOGY, INC, (20000701), vol. 80, no. 7, ISSN 0023-6837, pages 1101 - 1110, XP002316617 | by applicant | WO2008020079 | WO03054016 | WO0029004 | WO0027435 | WO9822141 | WO0177137 | WO2007112940 | WO9942077 | WO2006040153 | WO2006122825 | WO9404678 | WO2004081026 | - PRESTA, ADV. DRUG DELIV. REV., (2006), vol. 58, no. 5-6, pages 640 - 56 | - LEVIN; WEISS, MOL. BIOSYST., (2006), vol. 2, no. 1, pages 49 - 57 | - IRVING ET AL., J. IMMUNOL. METHODS, (2001), vol. 248, no. 1-2, pages 31 - 45 | - SCHMITZ ET AL., PLACENTA, (2000), vol. 21, no. A, pages 106 - 12 | - GONZALES ET AL., TUMOUR BIOL., (2005), vol. 26, no. 1, pages 31 - 43 | - NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (2005), vol. 23, no. 9, pages 1105 - 1116 | - HOOGENBOOM ET AL., NAT BIOTECHNOL, (2005), vol. 23, page 1105 | - BINZ ET AL., NAT BIOTECHNOL, (2005), vol. 23, page 1247 | - LUNDBLAD; BRADSHAW, BIOTECHNOL. APPL. BIOCHEM., (1997), vol. 26, pages 143 - 151 | - HOLLIGER; HUDSON, NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (2005), vol. 23, no. 9, pages 1126 - 1136 |