EP2409444 - HYBRID-ARQ MECHANISM FOR COOPERATIVE BASE STATIONS UPLINK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.08.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.08.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.09.2018 [2018/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/04] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MEYER, Michael Grossheidstrasse 27 52080 Aachen / DE | 02 /
WIEMANN, Henning Kelmesbergweg 7 52080 Aachen / DE | 03 /
FALCONETTI, Laetitia Oligsbendengasse 11 52070 Aachen / DE | 04 /
HOYMANN, Christian Anne-Frank-Str. 13 52064 Aachen / DE | [2012/04] | Representative(s) | Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 5581 Löjtnantsgatan 21 114 85 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/04] | Burchardi, Thomas, et al Ericsson GmbH Ericsson Allee 1 52134 Herzogenrath / DE | Application number, filing date | 09781137.6 | 27.07.2009 | WO2009EP59677 | Priority number, date | US20090161924P | 20.03.2009 Original published format: US 161924 P | [2012/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010105702 | Date: | 23.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/38] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2409444 | Date: | 25.01.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.09.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/18, H04B7/02 | [2012/04] | CPC: |
H04L1/1812 (EP,US);
H04B7/022 (EP,US);
H04L1/1822 (EP,US);
H04L1/1829 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/04] | Title | German: | HYBRID-ARQ-MECHANISMUS FÜR DIE BASISSTATIONS-KOOPERATIV-AUFWÄRTSSTRECKE | [2012/04] | English: | HYBRID-ARQ MECHANISM FOR COOPERATIVE BASE STATIONS UPLINK | [2012/04] | French: | MÉCANISME ARQ HYBRIDE POUR UNE COOPÉRATION DE STATIONS DE BASE SUR LA LIAISON MONTANTE | [2012/04] | Entry into regional phase | 19.10.2011 | National basic fee paid | 19.10.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.10.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.10.2011 | Examination requested [2012/04] | 26.06.2012 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 06.09.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.09.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.04.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/37] | 04.05.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/37] | Divisional application(s) | EP18164002.0 / EP3358773 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.02.2013 | Request for further processing for: | Loss of rights: Claims | 06.09.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 06.09.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.09.2012 | Decision despatched | 06.09.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 06.09.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.09.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 20.10.2011 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   27.12.2011 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO2008040930 (FUJITSU LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,12,14-17,21,22 * abstract * * figures 1a,1b,1c,2 * * page 9, line 18 - page 10, line 20 * * page 11, line 9 - line 17 * * page 12, line 5 - line 11 * [I] 4,19,20; | [X]EP1594246 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1,5-11,15,18,21,22 * abstract * * figures 2,3,5A,5B,7,8 * * paragraphs [0007] , [0014] , [0050] - [0057] *; | [X]WO2008039126 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [X] 1,13,15,21,22 * abstract * * figures 2-6 * * paragraphs [0070] - [0073] - [0078] , [0079] *; | [E]WO2010034528 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [E] 1-3,12,14-17,21,22 * the whole document * | [A] - SIVARAMA VENKATESAN ED - ANONYMOUS, Coordinating Base Stations for Greater Uplink Spectral Efficiency in a Cellular Network, IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON PERSONAL, INDOOR AND MOBILE RADIO COMMUNICATIONS. PIMRC, IEEE; PI, XX, PAGE(S) 1 - 5, (20070901), ISBN 978-1-4244-1143-6, XP031168849 [A] 1,2,15,16,21,22 * figure 2 * * sections I and II/B * | by applicant | WO2008040930 | EP1594246 | WO2008039126 | - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Radio Access Network; Further Advancements for E-UTRA Physical Layer Aspects", 3GPP TR 36.814, (200901), vol. 3.1 |