EP2459944 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR HEAT RECOVERY ON A VAPOUR REFRIGERATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.07.2019 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.08.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Boostherm Chemin Departemental 996 21380 Messigny et Vantoux / FR | [2018/40] |
Former [2018/35] | For all designated states Ecolactis Chemin Departemental 996 21380 Messigny et Vantoux / FR | ||
Former [2012/23] | For all designated states Ecolactis 16 rue du Clos Pofard 21121 Ahuy / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DECAESTECKER, Laurent 1 A rue du moulin 21380 Messigny et Vantoux / FR | [2018/34] |
Former [2012/23] | 01 /
DECAESTECKER, Laurent 16 rue du Clos Pofard F-21121 Ahuy / FR | Representative(s) | Gevers & Orès Immeuble le Palatin 2 3 Cours du Triangle CS 80165 92939 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2018/36] | Gevers & Orès 41 avenue de Friedland 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2012/23] | Thivillier, Patrick, et al Cabinet Laurent & Charras 3 Place de l'Hôtel de Ville B.P. 203 42005 Saint-Etienne Cedex 1 / FR | Application number, filing date | 09781141.8 | 27.07.2009 | [2018/36] | WO2009EP59685 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011012153 | Date: | 03.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2459944 | Date: | 06.06.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.02.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2459944 | Date: | 05.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/36] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP2459944 | Date: | 31.10.2018 | [2018/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F25B29/00, F25B49/02 | [2012/23] | CPC: |
F25B49/027 (EP,US);
A01J9/04 (EP,US);
F25B29/003 (EP,US);
F25B6/04 (US);
F25B2339/047 (EP,US);
F25B2600/01 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/23] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR WÄRMERÜCKGEWINNUNG BEI EINEM DAMPFKÜHLUNGSSYSTEM | [2012/23] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR HEAT RECOVERY ON A VAPOUR REFRIGERATION SYSTEM | [2012/23] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE RÉCUPÉRATION DE CHALEUR SUR UN SYSTÈME FRIGORIFIQUE À COMPRESSION DE VAPEUR | [2012/23] | Entry into regional phase | 19.01.2012 | National basic fee paid | 19.01.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.01.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.01.2012 | Examination requested [2012/23] | 05.10.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.03.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.07.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 16.07.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.07.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.03.2018 | Opposition(s) | 06.06.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.07.2009 | AT | 05.09.2018 | CY | 05.09.2018 | CZ | 05.09.2018 | DK | 05.09.2018 | EE | 05.09.2018 | FI | 05.09.2018 | HR | 05.09.2018 | LT | 05.09.2018 | LV | 05.09.2018 | MC | 05.09.2018 | MK | 05.09.2018 | MT | 05.09.2018 | PL | 05.09.2018 | RO | 05.09.2018 | SE | 05.09.2018 | SI | 05.09.2018 | SK | 05.09.2018 | SM | 05.09.2018 | TR | 05.09.2018 | BG | 05.12.2018 | NO | 05.12.2018 | GR | 06.12.2018 | IS | 05.01.2019 | PT | 05.01.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 27.07.2009 | |
AT | 05.09.2018 | ||
CY | 05.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2018 | ||
DK | 05.09.2018 | ||
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
MC | 05.09.2018 | ||
MT | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
SI | 05.09.2018 | ||
SK | 05.09.2018 | ||
SM | 05.09.2018 | ||
TR | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
PT | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 27.07.2009 | |
AT | 05.09.2018 | ||
CY | 05.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2018 | ||
DK | 05.09.2018 | ||
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
MC | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
SI | 05.09.2018 | ||
SK | 05.09.2018 | ||
SM | 05.09.2018 | ||
TR | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
PT | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AT | 05.09.2018 | |
CY | 05.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2018 | ||
DK | 05.09.2018 | ||
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
MC | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
SI | 05.09.2018 | ||
SK | 05.09.2018 | ||
SM | 05.09.2018 | ||
TR | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
PT | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 05.09.2018 | |
CZ | 05.09.2018 | ||
DK | 05.09.2018 | ||
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
MC | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
SI | 05.09.2018 | ||
SK | 05.09.2018 | ||
SM | 05.09.2018 | ||
TR | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
PT | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AT | 05.09.2018 | |
CZ | 05.09.2018 | ||
DK | 05.09.2018 | ||
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
MC | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
SI | 05.09.2018 | ||
SK | 05.09.2018 | ||
SM | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
PT | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AT | 05.09.2018 | |
CZ | 05.09.2018 | ||
DK | 05.09.2018 | ||
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
SI | 05.09.2018 | ||
SK | 05.09.2018 | ||
SM | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
PT | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AT | 05.09.2018 | |
CZ | 05.09.2018 | ||
DK | 05.09.2018 | ||
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
SK | 05.09.2018 | ||
SM | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
PT | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 05.09.2018 | |
CZ | 05.09.2018 | ||
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
SK | 05.09.2018 | ||
SM | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
PT | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 05.09.2018 | |
CZ | 05.09.2018 | ||
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
SK | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | CZ | 05.09.2018 | |
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 05.09.2018 | |
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/12] | FI | 05.09.2018 | |
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | FI | 05.09.2018 | |
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | FI | 05.09.2018 | |
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 05.09.2018 | |
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 05.09.2018 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2702671 (CARTER FRANKLYN Y) [A] 1-33 * the whole document *; | [A]US3513663 (MARTIN JAMES B JR, et al) [A] 12,19 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2370424 (VIRONNEAU PIERRE [FR]) [A] 1,5,11,12,19,22,24,25,29,30 * the whole document *; | [A]GB1587057 (CONSERVE RECYCLING LTD) [A] 1-33 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0058259 (SCHNEIDER METAL MFG [US]) [A] 1,5,11,12,19,22,24,25,29,30 * page 7, line 23 - page 8, line 23 * * figure 3 *; | [A]GB2102551 (OCEAN SPA [IT]) [A] 12,23,31* the whole document *; | [A]EP1162419 (DENSO CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-33 * the whole document *; | [XI]JP2002081768 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [X] 1,2,4,12,13,15 * abstract * * figures 1,5,8,11,14,16 * [I] 3,5-7,14; | [XI]WO03074953 (OJALA RISTO ANTERO [FI], et al) [X] 1-4,6-8,12-14,16-18 * page 1, lines 6-12 * * page 2, lines 6-10 * * page 3, lines 6-9 * * page 3, lines 16-25 * * page 4, line 31 - page 5, line 7 * * page 5, line 10 - line 17 * * claims 1,2 * * figures 1,4 * [I] 5,9-11,15,19-23,25-33; | [XI]EP1826510 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP]) [X] 1-4,8,12-15,19,23-28,32,33 * paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0042] * * paragraph [0045] * * paragraph [0088] * * paragraph [0107] - paragraph [0115] * * paragraph [0142] - paragraph [0146] * * paragraph [0151] * * paragraph [0168] * * figures 1-5 * [I] 5-7,9-11,16-18,20-22; | [XAI]US2008184724 (JAGUSZTYN TADEUSZ FRANK [US]) [X] 1-3,12-14 * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0055] * * paragraph [0067] - paragraph [0068] * * claims 1-8,18,31 * * figure 4 * [A] 27,28 [I] 4,5,15,16,23,33; | [XI]WO2009006794 (LUO GUIRONG [CN]) [X] 1,3,6,12,17 * abstract * * figures 1-16 * [I] 2,4,7,13-15,18 |