17.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] |
03.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] |
19.06.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.07.2015 [2015/30] |
08.05.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.06.2015 [2015/24] |
11.07.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.08.2014 [2014/33] |
02.05.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.06.2014 [2014/23] |
28.02.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.04.2014 [2014/14] |
10.01.2014 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 12.02.2014 [2014/07] |
08.11.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.12.2013 [2013/50] |
01.11.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.12.2013 [2013/49] |
25.10.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.11.2013 [2013/48] |
18.10.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.11.2013 [2013/47] |
06.09.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.10.2013 [2013/41] |
16.08.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.09.2013 [2013/38] |
09.08.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.09.2013 [2013/37] |
02.08.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.09.2013 [2013/36] |
19.07.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.08.2013 [2013/34] |
12.07.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.08.2013 [2013/33] |
08.02.2013 |
Change - applicant |
published on 13.03.2013 [2013/11] |
01.02.2013 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 06.03.2013 [2013/10] |
24.01.2013 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
24.01.2013 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
18.09.2012 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
24.07.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.10.2011 |
Change - extension states |
published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] |
22.07.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.04.2011 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
04.03.2011 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 06.04.2011 [2011/14] |
04.03.2011 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 06.04.2011 [2011/14] |
28.01.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.02.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.02.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.01.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.01.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|