EP2332040 - Countermeasure securing exponentiation based cryptography [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.03.2013 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gemalto SA 6, rue de la Verrerie 92190 Meudon / FR | [2011/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VIGILANT, David Gemalto Sa Intellectual Property Dpt 6 rue de la Verrerie F-92197 Meudon / FR | [2012/20] |
Former [2011/24] | 01 /
VIGILANT, David Gemalto Sa Intellectual Property Dpt 6 rue de la Verrerie F-92197 Meudon / FR | Representative(s) | Lotaut, Yacine Diaw Thales Dis France SAS Intellectual Property Department 6, rue de la Verrerie 92190 Meudon / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/20] | Lotaut, Yacine Diaw Gemalto SA 6, rue de la Verrerie FR-92197 Meudon Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2011/24] | Lotaut, Yacine Diaw Gemalto SA 6, rue de la Verrerie FR-92197 Meudon Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 09781287.9 | 30.07.2009 | [2011/24] | WO2009EP59867 | Priority number, date | EP20080305453 | 06.08.2008 Original published format: EP 08305453 | [2011/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010015562 | Date: | 11.02.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/06] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2332040 | Date: | 15.06.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.02.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2332040 | Date: | 16.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.04.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G06F7/72 | [2011/24] | CPC: |
G06F7/723 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/24] | Title | German: | Gegenmassname zum Schutz von auf potenzierung basierender Kryptographie | [2011/24] | English: | Countermeasure securing exponentiation based cryptography | [2011/24] | French: | Contre-mesure pour sécuriser la cryptographie à base d'exponentiation | [2011/24] | Entry into regional phase | 04.02.2011 | National basic fee paid | 04.02.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.02.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.02.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.02.2011 | Examination requested [2011/24] | 27.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.03.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 29.03.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.07.2011 | Opposition(s) | 19.02.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.07.2009 | AT | 16.05.2012 | BE | 16.05.2012 | CY | 16.05.2012 | CZ | 16.05.2012 | DK | 16.05.2012 | EE | 16.05.2012 | FI | 16.05.2012 | HR | 16.05.2012 | IT | 16.05.2012 | LT | 16.05.2012 | LV | 16.05.2012 | MK | 16.05.2012 | MT | 16.05.2012 | NL | 16.05.2012 | PL | 16.05.2012 | RO | 16.05.2012 | SE | 16.05.2012 | SI | 16.05.2012 | SK | 16.05.2012 | SM | 16.05.2012 | TR | 16.05.2012 | IE | 30.07.2012 | LU | 30.07.2012 | MC | 31.07.2012 | BG | 16.08.2012 | NO | 16.08.2012 | GR | 17.08.2012 | ES | 27.08.2012 | IS | 16.09.2012 | PT | 17.09.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 16.05.2012 | |
BE | 16.05.2012 | ||
CY | 16.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 16.05.2012 | ||
DK | 16.05.2012 | ||
EE | 16.05.2012 | ||
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
HR | 16.05.2012 | ||
IT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
MK | 16.05.2012 | ||
MT | 16.05.2012 | ||
NL | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
RO | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
SK | 16.05.2012 | ||
SM | 16.05.2012 | ||
TR | 16.05.2012 | ||
IE | 30.07.2012 | ||
LU | 30.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
BG | 16.08.2012 | ||
NO | 16.08.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
ES | 27.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 16.05.2012 | |
BE | 16.05.2012 | ||
CY | 16.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 16.05.2012 | ||
DK | 16.05.2012 | ||
EE | 16.05.2012 | ||
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
HR | 16.05.2012 | ||
IT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
MK | 16.05.2012 | ||
MT | 16.05.2012 | ||
NL | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
RO | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
SK | 16.05.2012 | ||
TR | 16.05.2012 | ||
IE | 30.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
BG | 16.08.2012 | ||
NO | 16.08.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
ES | 27.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 16.05.2012 | |
BE | 16.05.2012 | ||
CY | 16.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 16.05.2012 | ||
DK | 16.05.2012 | ||
EE | 16.05.2012 | ||
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
HR | 16.05.2012 | ||
IT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
MK | 16.05.2012 | ||
MT | 16.05.2012 | ||
NL | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
RO | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
SK | 16.05.2012 | ||
IE | 30.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
BG | 16.08.2012 | ||
NO | 16.08.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
ES | 27.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 16.05.2012 | |
BE | 16.05.2012 | ||
CY | 16.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 16.05.2012 | ||
DK | 16.05.2012 | ||
EE | 16.05.2012 | ||
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
HR | 16.05.2012 | ||
IT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
MK | 16.05.2012 | ||
NL | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
RO | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
SK | 16.05.2012 | ||
IE | 30.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
NO | 16.08.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
ES | 27.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | AT | 16.05.2012 | |
BE | 16.05.2012 | ||
CY | 16.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 16.05.2012 | ||
DK | 16.05.2012 | ||
EE | 16.05.2012 | ||
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
HR | 16.05.2012 | ||
IT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
MK | 16.05.2012 | ||
NL | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
RO | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
SK | 16.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
NO | 16.08.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
ES | 27.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 16.05.2012 | |
BE | 16.05.2012 | ||
CY | 16.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 16.05.2012 | ||
DK | 16.05.2012 | ||
EE | 16.05.2012 | ||
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
HR | 16.05.2012 | ||
IT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
MK | 16.05.2012 | ||
NL | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
RO | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
SK | 16.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
NO | 16.08.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 16.05.2012 | |
BE | 16.05.2012 | ||
CY | 16.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 16.05.2012 | ||
DK | 16.05.2012 | ||
EE | 16.05.2012 | ||
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
HR | 16.05.2012 | ||
IT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
NL | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
RO | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
SK | 16.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
NO | 16.08.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 16.05.2012 | |
BE | 16.05.2012 | ||
CY | 16.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 16.05.2012 | ||
DK | 16.05.2012 | ||
EE | 16.05.2012 | ||
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
HR | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
NL | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
RO | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
SK | 16.05.2012 | ||
NO | 16.08.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 16.05.2012 | |
BE | 16.05.2012 | ||
CY | 16.05.2012 | ||
DK | 16.05.2012 | ||
EE | 16.05.2012 | ||
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
HR | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
NL | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
NO | 16.08.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 16.05.2012 | |
BE | 16.05.2012 | ||
CY | 16.05.2012 | ||
DK | 16.05.2012 | ||
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
HR | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
NL | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
NO | 16.08.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 16.05.2012 | |
BE | 16.05.2012 | ||
CY | 16.05.2012 | ||
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
HR | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
NO | 16.08.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/04] | BE | 16.05.2012 | |
CY | 16.05.2012 | ||
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
HR | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
NO | 16.08.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | CY | 16.05.2012 | |
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
HR | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
NO | 16.08.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | CY | 16.05.2012 | |
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
HR | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
NO | 16.08.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 16.05.2012 | |
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
HR | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
NO | 16.08.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 16.05.2012 | |
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
NO | 16.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 16.05.2012 | |
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
NO | 16.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | LT | 16.05.2012 | |
NO | 16.08.2012 | Cited in | International search | [AD] - AUMUELLER C ET AL, "FAULT ATTACKS ON RSA WITH CRT: CONCRETE RESULTS AND PRACTICAL COUNTERMEASURES", CRYPTOGRAPHIC HARDWARE AND EMBEDDED SYSTEMS. INTERNATIONALWORKSHOP, XX, XX, (20020813), pages 260 - 275, XP001160527 [AD] 1-11 * the whole document * | [AD] - CIET AND M JOYE M, "Practical fault countermeasures for Chinese Remaindering based RSA (Extended Abstract)", FAULT DIAGNOSIS AND TOLERANCE IN CRYPTOGRAPHY FDTC 05,, (20050902), pages 121 - 131, XP007906966 [AD] 1-11 * the whole document * | [A] - YEN S-M ET AL, "HARDWARE FAULT ATTACK ON RSA WITH CRT REVISITED", LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE, SPRINGER VERLAG, BERLIN; DE, (20021128), vol. 2587, ISSN 0302-9743, pages 374 - 388, XP001160549 [A] 1-11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/3-540-45675-9 | [A] - CHONG HEE KIM ET AL, "Fault Attacks for CRT Based RSA: New Attacks, New Results, and New Countermeasures", INFORMATION SECURITY THEORY AND PRACTICES. SMART CARDS, MOBILE AND UBIQUITOUS COMPUTING SYSTEMS; [LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE;;LNCS], SPRINGER BERLIN HEIDELBERG, BERLIN, HEIDELBERG, (20070509), vol. 4462, ISBN 978-3-540-72353-0, pages 215 - 228, XP019058003 [A] 1-11 * the whole document * | by applicant | - DIFFIE, W., HELLMAN, M.E., "New directions in cryptography", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON INFORMATION THEORY, (1976), vol. IT-22, no. 6, pages 644 - 654 | - EI GAMAL, T., "A public-key cryptosystem and a signature scheme based on discrete logarithms", CRYPTO, (1984), pages 10 - 18 | - SCHNORR, C.P., "Efficient signature generation by smart cards", JOURNAL OF CRYPTOLOGY, (1991), vol. 4, no. 3, pages 161 - 174 | - "National Institute of Standards and Technology: Digital Standard Signature", FEDERAL INFORMATION PROCESSING STANDARDS PUBLICATIONS, (1994), page 186 | - "A study on the proposed korean digital signature algorithm", LIM, LEE, ASIACRYPT: Advances in Cryptology - ASIACRYPT: International Conference on the Theory and Application of Cryptology, LNCS, SPRINGER-VERLAG, (1998), pages 175 - 186 |