EP2313615 - BLADE ARRANGEMENT OF A GAS TURBINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 25.08.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.08.2023 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 27.09.2023 [2023/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ansaldo Energia IP UK Limited 5th Floor, North Side 7/10 Chandos Street Cavendish Square London W1G 9DQ / GB | [2023/39] |
Former [2017/21] | For all designated states Ansaldo Energia IP UK Limited 5th Floor, North Side 7/10 Chandos Street Cavendish Square London W1G 9DQ / GB | ||
Former [2016/33] | For all designated states General Electric Technology GmbH Brown Boveri Strasse 7 5400 Baden / CH | ||
Former [2016/12] | For all designated states ALSTOM Technology Ltd Brown Boveri Strasse 7 5400 Baden / CH | ||
Former [2011/17] | For all designated states Alstom Technology Ltd Brown Boveri Strasse 7 5400 Baden / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEINZ-SCHWARZMAIER, Thomas Ackerstrasse 3 CH-5430 WETTINGEN / CH | 02 /
DUDA, Thomas Halbartenstrasse 56 CH-5430 Wettingen / CH | 03 /
SCHNELL, Alexander Buchenweg 2 CH-5400 Baden / CH | [2011/22] |
Former [2011/17] | 01 /
HEINZ-SCHWARZMAIER, Thomas Chrüzweg 77d CH-5413 Birmenstorf / CH | ||
02 /
DUDA, Thomas Halbartenstrasse 56 CH-5430 Wettingen / CH | |||
03 /
SCHNELL, Alexander Buchenweg 2 CH-5400 Baden / CH | Representative(s) | Bernotti, Andrea, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [2016/12] | Application number, filing date | 09781705.0 | 11.08.2009 | [2011/17] | WO2009EP60387 | Priority number, date | CH20080001285 | 15.08.2008 Original published format: CH 12852008 | [2011/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010018174 | Date: | 18.02.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2313615 | Date: | 27.04.2011 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.02.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2313615 | Date: | 23.03.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/12] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP2313615 | Date: | 27.09.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.02.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F01D11/14, F01D5/28, F01D11/12 | [2018/30] | CPC: |
F01D11/122 (EP,US);
F01D11/14 (US);
F01D5/288 (US)
|
Former IPC [2011/17] | F01D11/12 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/12] |
Former [2011/17] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SCHAUFELANORDNUNG EINER GASTURBINE | [2011/17] | English: | BLADE ARRANGEMENT OF A GAS TURBINE | [2011/17] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'AUBES D'UNE TURBINE À GAZ | [2011/17] | Entry into regional phase | 26.01.2011 | National basic fee paid | 26.01.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.01.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.01.2011 | Examination requested [2011/17] | 14.06.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 10.08.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.01.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.11.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.03.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.11.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.01.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 15.01.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.01.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.09.2011 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
21.12.2016
03.01.2017
ADMISSIBLE Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE Opponent's representative PATERIS Patentanwälte PartmbB Danckelmannstraße 9 14059 Berlin / DE | [2023/01] |
Former [2017/48] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
21.12.2016
03.01.2017
ADMISSIBLE Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2017/04] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
21.12.2016
Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | 02.02.2017 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 19.05.2017 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 07.06.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 12.07.2018 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 12.07.2018 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 24.01.2023 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 23.05.2023 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 23.08.2023 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 08.08.2018 | Appeal received No. T2039/18 | 08.11.2018 | Statement of grounds filed | 14.05.2020 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M04) [2020/20] | 24.06.2020 | Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [2020/26] | 24.01.2023 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected | 22.02.2023 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | 24.01.2023 | Date of oral proceedings | Request for further processing for: | 10.08.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 10.08.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 23.08.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.08.2009 | CY | 23.03.2016 | CZ | 23.03.2016 | DK | 23.03.2016 | EE | 23.03.2016 | ES | 23.03.2016 | FI | 23.03.2016 | HR | 23.03.2016 | LT | 23.03.2016 | LV | 23.03.2016 | MC | 23.03.2016 | MK | 23.03.2016 | MT | 23.03.2016 | NL | 23.03.2016 | PL | 23.03.2016 | RO | 23.03.2016 | SE | 23.03.2016 | SI | 23.03.2016 | SK | 23.03.2016 | SM | 23.03.2016 | TR | 23.03.2016 | BG | 23.06.2016 | NO | 23.06.2016 | GR | 24.06.2016 | IS | 23.07.2016 | PT | 25.07.2016 | AT | 11.08.2016 | IE | 11.08.2016 | LU | 11.08.2016 | BE | 31.08.2016 | CH | 31.08.2016 | FR | 31.08.2016 | LI | 31.08.2016 | GB | 11.08.2018 | [2019/47] |
Former [2018/32] | HU | 11.08.2009 | |
CY | 23.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
MC | 23.03.2016 | ||
MK | 23.03.2016 | ||
MT | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SI | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
TR | 23.03.2016 | ||
BG | 23.06.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
AT | 11.08.2016 | ||
IE | 11.08.2016 | ||
LU | 11.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
FR | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 11.08.2009 | |
CY | 23.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
MC | 23.03.2016 | ||
MK | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SI | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
TR | 23.03.2016 | ||
BG | 23.06.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
AT | 11.08.2016 | ||
IE | 11.08.2016 | ||
LU | 11.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
FR | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 11.08.2009 | |
CY | 23.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
MC | 23.03.2016 | ||
MK | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SI | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
BG | 23.06.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
AT | 11.08.2016 | ||
IE | 11.08.2016 | ||
LU | 11.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
FR | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/49] | CZ | 23.03.2016 | |
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
MC | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SI | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
BG | 23.06.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
AT | 11.08.2016 | ||
IE | 11.08.2016 | ||
LU | 11.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
FR | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | CZ | 23.03.2016 | |
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
MC | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SI | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
BG | 23.06.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
IE | 11.08.2016 | ||
LU | 11.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
FR | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/23] | CZ | 23.03.2016 | |
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
MC | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SI | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
BG | 23.06.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/20] | CZ | 23.03.2016 | |
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
MC | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
BG | 23.06.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | CZ | 23.03.2016 | |
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | CZ | 23.03.2016 | |
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | CZ | 23.03.2016 | |
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | CZ | 23.03.2016 | |
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | EE | 23.03.2016 | |
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/48] | FI | 23.03.2016 | |
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/40] | FI | 23.03.2016 | |
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | FI | 23.03.2016 | |
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | FI | 23.03.2016 | |
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | FI | 23.03.2016 | |
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0166676 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [Y] 1-7 * page 1, line 22 - page 1, line 25 * * page 7, line 8 - page 8, line 4; figure 6 *; | [A]GB2226050 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [A] 1-5 * page 4, line 18 - page 6, line 14 *; | [A]US5780171 (NISSLEY DAVID M [US], et al) [A] 1-5,7 * column 1, line 65 - column 2, line 11 * * column 6, line 63 - column 7, line 18 *; | [A]US5883314 (SIEVERS GEORGE K [US], et al) [A] 1,6 * column 10, line 25 - column 10, line 67 ** column 14, line 4 - column 14, line 13; figure 5 *; | [Y]EP0965730 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [Y] 1-7 * column 5, line 36 - column 5, line 45 * * column 4, line 3 - column 4, line 11 * | Examination | US2003175116 | by applicant | US5883314 | EP0965730 | US2003175116 | Opposition | EP0166676 | GB2226050 | US5733102 | US5780171 | US5794338 | EP0869259 | US5883314 | EP0965730 | DE19842417 | US6149389 | DE69704703T | DE10140742 | EP1258598 | US2003175116 | US2003194323 | DE10225532 | US2004137259 | EP0844368 | WO2006025865 | US2007264523 | EP1865150 | US2008038575 | EP1890010 | EP1085171 | - langlade-bomba et al, "?Wear mechanism of MCrAIY abradable plasma-sprayed coatings", Proc. Int . Thermal Spray Conf., (19980000), vol. 1, pages 293 - 298, XP055337768 | - "Protective coatings in the gas turbine engine", Surface and Coatings Technology, (19940000), vol. 68/69, pages 1 - 9, XP024546269 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0257-8972(94)90129-5 | - langlade-bomba et al, "?Wear mechanism of MCrAIY abradable plasma-sprayed coatings", Proc. Int . Thermal Spray Conf., (19980000), vol. 1, pages 293 - 298 | - "Protective coatings in the gas turbine engine", Surface and Coatings Technology, (19940000), vol. 68/69, pages 1 - 9 |