EP2445574 - PINCH CLAMP ASSEMBLY FOR AN INFUSION CASSETTE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/18] | PINCH CLAMP ASSEMBLY | ||
[2013/32] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.10.2014 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nestec S.A. Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH | [2013/50] |
Former [2012/18] | For all designated states Nestec S.A. Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GAGLIARDONI, Giancarlo Residencia Anacoco Piso 2 Apt. 21 1ra transversal entre Av. Andres Bello y la 2da Av., Los Palos Grande, Municipio Chacao Caracas Estado Miranda 1062 / VE | 02 /
NICHETTI, Giuseppe Antonio Via G. Deledda 21 I-26025 Pandino (CR) / IT | [2012/18] | Representative(s) | Rupp, Christian, et al Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/29] | Rupp, Christian, et al Mitscherlich & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstraße 33 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/18] | Chautard, Cécile Nestec S.A. Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH | Application number, filing date | 09781858.7 | 14.08.2009 | WO2009EP60556 | Priority number, date | WO2009EP04601 | 25.06.2009 Original published format: PCT/EP2009/004601 | [2012/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010149231 | Date: | 29.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2445574 | Date: | 02.05.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.12.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2445574 | Date: | 11.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61M39/28, A61M5/142 | [2012/18] | CPC: |
A61M39/281 (EP);
A61M39/284 (EP);
A61M2205/12 (EP);
A61M2205/128 (EP);
A61M5/14228 (EP);
A61M5/14232 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/18] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHLAUCHKLEMME FÜR INFUSIONSKASSETTE | [2013/32] | English: | PINCH CLAMP ASSEMBLY FOR AN INFUSION CASSETTE | [2013/32] | French: | ENSEMBLE DE PINCE | [2012/18] |
Former [2012/18] | QUETSCHKLEMMENNANORDNUNG | ||
Former [2012/18] | PINCH CLAMP ASSEMBLY | Entry into regional phase | 25.01.2012 | National basic fee paid | 25.01.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.01.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.01.2012 | Examination requested [2012/18] | 20.06.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.07.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.10.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 29.10.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.07.2013 | Opposition(s) | 12.09.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.08.2009 | AT | 11.12.2013 | BE | 11.12.2013 | BG | 11.12.2013 | CY | 11.12.2013 | CZ | 11.12.2013 | DK | 11.12.2013 | EE | 11.12.2013 | FI | 11.12.2013 | HR | 11.12.2013 | IT | 11.12.2013 | LT | 11.12.2013 | LV | 11.12.2013 | MC | 11.12.2013 | MK | 11.12.2013 | MT | 11.12.2013 | NL | 11.12.2013 | PL | 11.12.2013 | RO | 11.12.2013 | SE | 11.12.2013 | SI | 11.12.2013 | SK | 11.12.2013 | SM | 11.12.2013 | TR | 11.12.2013 | NO | 11.03.2014 | GR | 12.03.2014 | IS | 11.04.2014 | PT | 11.04.2014 | IE | 14.08.2014 | LU | 14.08.2014 | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/33] | HU | 14.08.2009 | |
AT | 11.12.2013 | ||
BE | 11.12.2013 | ||
BG | 11.12.2013 | ||
CY | 11.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.12.2013 | ||
DK | 11.12.2013 | ||
EE | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
HR | 11.12.2013 | ||
IT | 11.12.2013 | ||
LT | 11.12.2013 | ||
LV | 11.12.2013 | ||
MC | 11.12.2013 | ||
MT | 11.12.2013 | ||
NL | 11.12.2013 | ||
PL | 11.12.2013 | ||
RO | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
SI | 11.12.2013 | ||
SK | 11.12.2013 | ||
SM | 11.12.2013 | ||
TR | 11.12.2013 | ||
NO | 11.03.2014 | ||
GR | 12.03.2014 | ||
IS | 11.04.2014 | ||
PT | 11.04.2014 | ||
IE | 14.08.2014 | ||
LU | 14.08.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 14.08.2009 | |
AT | 11.12.2013 | ||
BE | 11.12.2013 | ||
BG | 11.12.2013 | ||
CY | 11.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.12.2013 | ||
DK | 11.12.2013 | ||
EE | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
HR | 11.12.2013 | ||
IT | 11.12.2013 | ||
LT | 11.12.2013 | ||
LV | 11.12.2013 | ||
MC | 11.12.2013 | ||
MT | 11.12.2013 | ||
NL | 11.12.2013 | ||
PL | 11.12.2013 | ||
RO | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
SI | 11.12.2013 | ||
SK | 11.12.2013 | ||
SM | 11.12.2013 | ||
NO | 11.03.2014 | ||
GR | 12.03.2014 | ||
IS | 11.04.2014 | ||
PT | 11.04.2014 | ||
IE | 14.08.2014 | ||
LU | 14.08.2014 | ||
Former [2016/29] | AT | 11.12.2013 | |
BE | 11.12.2013 | ||
BG | 11.12.2013 | ||
CY | 11.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.12.2013 | ||
DK | 11.12.2013 | ||
EE | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
HR | 11.12.2013 | ||
IT | 11.12.2013 | ||
LT | 11.12.2013 | ||
LV | 11.12.2013 | ||
MC | 11.12.2013 | ||
MT | 11.12.2013 | ||
NL | 11.12.2013 | ||
PL | 11.12.2013 | ||
RO | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
SI | 11.12.2013 | ||
SK | 11.12.2013 | ||
SM | 11.12.2013 | ||
NO | 11.03.2014 | ||
GR | 12.03.2014 | ||
IS | 11.04.2014 | ||
PT | 11.04.2014 | ||
IE | 14.08.2014 | ||
LU | 14.08.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 11.12.2013 | |
BE | 11.12.2013 | ||
BG | 11.12.2013 | ||
CY | 11.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.12.2013 | ||
DK | 11.12.2013 | ||
EE | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
HR | 11.12.2013 | ||
LT | 11.12.2013 | ||
LV | 11.12.2013 | ||
MC | 11.12.2013 | ||
MT | 11.12.2013 | ||
NL | 11.12.2013 | ||
PL | 11.12.2013 | ||
RO | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
SI | 11.12.2013 | ||
SK | 11.12.2013 | ||
SM | 11.12.2013 | ||
NO | 11.03.2014 | ||
GR | 12.03.2014 | ||
IS | 11.04.2014 | ||
PT | 11.04.2014 | ||
IE | 14.08.2014 | ||
LU | 14.08.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 11.12.2013 | |
BE | 11.12.2013 | ||
CY | 11.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.12.2013 | ||
DK | 11.12.2013 | ||
EE | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
HR | 11.12.2013 | ||
LT | 11.12.2013 | ||
LV | 11.12.2013 | ||
MC | 11.12.2013 | ||
NL | 11.12.2013 | ||
PL | 11.12.2013 | ||
RO | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
SI | 11.12.2013 | ||
SK | 11.12.2013 | ||
SM | 11.12.2013 | ||
NO | 11.03.2014 | ||
IS | 11.04.2014 | ||
PT | 11.04.2014 | ||
IE | 14.08.2014 | ||
LU | 14.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 11.12.2013 | |
BE | 11.12.2013 | ||
CY | 11.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.12.2013 | ||
DK | 11.12.2013 | ||
EE | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
HR | 11.12.2013 | ||
LT | 11.12.2013 | ||
LV | 11.12.2013 | ||
MC | 11.12.2013 | ||
NL | 11.12.2013 | ||
PL | 11.12.2013 | ||
RO | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
SI | 11.12.2013 | ||
SK | 11.12.2013 | ||
NO | 11.03.2014 | ||
IS | 11.04.2014 | ||
PT | 11.04.2014 | ||
IE | 14.08.2014 | ||
LU | 14.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/19] | AT | 11.12.2013 | |
BE | 11.12.2013 | ||
CY | 11.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.12.2013 | ||
DK | 11.12.2013 | ||
EE | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
HR | 11.12.2013 | ||
LT | 11.12.2013 | ||
LV | 11.12.2013 | ||
MC | 11.12.2013 | ||
NL | 11.12.2013 | ||
PL | 11.12.2013 | ||
RO | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
SI | 11.12.2013 | ||
SK | 11.12.2013 | ||
NO | 11.03.2014 | ||
IS | 11.04.2014 | ||
PT | 11.04.2014 | ||
LU | 14.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | AT | 11.12.2013 | |
BE | 11.12.2013 | ||
CY | 11.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.12.2013 | ||
DK | 11.12.2013 | ||
EE | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
HR | 11.12.2013 | ||
LT | 11.12.2013 | ||
LV | 11.12.2013 | ||
MC | 11.12.2013 | ||
NL | 11.12.2013 | ||
PL | 11.12.2013 | ||
RO | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
SI | 11.12.2013 | ||
SK | 11.12.2013 | ||
NO | 11.03.2014 | ||
IS | 11.04.2014 | ||
PT | 11.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/14] | AT | 11.12.2013 | |
BE | 11.12.2013 | ||
CY | 11.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.12.2013 | ||
DK | 11.12.2013 | ||
EE | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
HR | 11.12.2013 | ||
LT | 11.12.2013 | ||
LV | 11.12.2013 | ||
NL | 11.12.2013 | ||
PL | 11.12.2013 | ||
RO | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
SI | 11.12.2013 | ||
SK | 11.12.2013 | ||
NO | 11.03.2014 | ||
IS | 11.04.2014 | ||
PT | 11.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 11.12.2013 | |
BE | 11.12.2013 | ||
CY | 11.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.12.2013 | ||
DK | 11.12.2013 | ||
EE | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
HR | 11.12.2013 | ||
LT | 11.12.2013 | ||
LV | 11.12.2013 | ||
NL | 11.12.2013 | ||
PL | 11.12.2013 | ||
RO | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
SK | 11.12.2013 | ||
NO | 11.03.2014 | ||
IS | 11.04.2014 | ||
PT | 11.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 11.12.2013 | |
BE | 11.12.2013 | ||
CY | 11.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.12.2013 | ||
EE | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
HR | 11.12.2013 | ||
LT | 11.12.2013 | ||
LV | 11.12.2013 | ||
NL | 11.12.2013 | ||
PL | 11.12.2013 | ||
RO | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
SK | 11.12.2013 | ||
NO | 11.03.2014 | ||
IS | 11.04.2014 | ||
PT | 11.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | AT | 11.12.2013 | |
BE | 11.12.2013 | ||
CY | 11.12.2013 | ||
EE | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
HR | 11.12.2013 | ||
LT | 11.12.2013 | ||
LV | 11.12.2013 | ||
NL | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
NO | 11.03.2014 | ||
IS | 11.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/34] | AT | 11.12.2013 | |
BE | 11.12.2013 | ||
CY | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
HR | 11.12.2013 | ||
LT | 11.12.2013 | ||
LV | 11.12.2013 | ||
NL | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
NO | 11.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/26] | AT | 11.12.2013 | |
CY | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
HR | 11.12.2013 | ||
LT | 11.12.2013 | ||
LV | 11.12.2013 | ||
NL | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
NO | 11.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/25] | AT | 11.12.2013 | |
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
HR | 11.12.2013 | ||
LT | 11.12.2013 | ||
LV | 11.12.2013 | ||
NL | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
NO | 11.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 11.12.2013 | |
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
HR | 11.12.2013 | ||
LT | 11.12.2013 | ||
NL | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
NO | 11.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | FI | 11.12.2013 | |
HR | 11.12.2013 | ||
LT | 11.12.2013 | ||
NL | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
NO | 11.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 11.12.2013 | |
LT | 11.12.2013 | ||
NL | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
NO | 11.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 11.12.2013 | |
NO | 11.03.2014 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4944485 (DAOUD ADIB G [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * column 6, lines 6-21; figures 4-8 *; | [A]US5401256 (STONE STANFORD C [US], et al) [A] 1-12* column 6, line 58 - column 7, line 45; figures 12,13 *; | [A]US5954485 (JOHNSON JAY GREGORY [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * column 5, line 30 - column 6, line 11; figures 5-7 *; | [A]WO03011377 (SCOTT LAB INC [US]) [A] 1-12 * page 21, lines 14-21; figures 3,11 *; | [A]US2007265559 (KUNISHIGE TAKAHIKO [JP], et al) [A] 1-12 * paragraphs [0124] - [0129]; figures 8A-8C * |