EP2337909 - FLOOR STRUCTURE WITH INTEGRATED VOID FOR SERVICE INSTALLATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/26] | FLOOR STRUCTURE WITH AN INTEGRATED GAP FOR TECHNICAL EQUIPMENT | ||
[2013/11] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.03.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ArcelorMittal Dudelange S.A. Zone Industrielle Wolser 3452 Dudelange / LU | For all designated states ArcelorMittal Commercial Sections S.A. 66 Rue de Luxembourg 4221 Esch sur Alzette / LU | [2011/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CAJOT, Louis-Guy 49 rue de Pannebourg Walzing B-6700 Arlon / BE | 02 /
MATHIEU, Jules 9 les Clarisses F-57570 Puttelange-les-Thionville / FR | 03 /
ZAGO, Denis 49 Mielstrachen L-6942 Niederanven / LU | 04 /
KEISER, Romain 20 rue Bechel L-4970 Bettange-sur-Mess / LU | [2013/19] |
Former [2011/26] | 01 /
CAJOT, Louis-Guy 49 rue de Pannebourg Walzing B-6700 Arlon / BE | ||
02 /
MATHIEU, Jules 9 les Clarisses F-57570 Puttelange-les-Thionville / FR | |||
03 /
ZAGO, Denis 49 Mielstrachen L-6942 Niederanven / LU | |||
04 /
KEISER, Romain 20 rue Bechel L-4970 Bettange-sur-Mess / LU | Representative(s) | Pronovem Pronovem Luxembourg 12, avenue du Rock n' Roll BP 327 4004 Esch sur Alzette / LU | [2013/19] |
Former [2011/51] | pronovem Meyers & Van Malderen 261, route d'Arlon B.P. 111 8002 Strassen / LU | ||
Former [2011/26] | Office Freylinger P.O. Box 48 8001 Strassen / LU | Application number, filing date | 09781876.9 | 14.08.2009 | [2011/26] | WO2009EP60576 | Priority number, date | LU20080091478 | 10.09.2008 Original published format: LU 91478 | [2011/26] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010028930 | Date: | 18.03.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2337909 | Date: | 29.06.2011 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.03.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2337909 | Date: | 08.05.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | E04B5/02, E04B9/00, E04F15/024 | [2011/26] | CPC: |
E04B5/023 (EP);
E04B9/001 (EP);
E04B9/045 (EP);
E04F15/02423 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/26] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BODENAUFBAU MIT INTEGRIERTEM HOHLRAUM FÜR VERSORGUNGSLEITUNGEN | [2013/11] | English: | FLOOR STRUCTURE WITH INTEGRATED VOID FOR SERVICE INSTALLATIONS | [2013/11] | French: | STRUCTURE DE PLANCHER AVEC UN VIDE INTÉGRÉ POUR INSTALLATIONS TECHNIQUES | [2011/26] |
Former [2011/26] | BODENSTRUKTUR MIT EINEM INTEGRIERTEN SPALT FÜR TECHNISCHE EINRICHTUNGEN | ||
Former [2011/26] | FLOOR STRUCTURE WITH AN INTEGRATED GAP FOR TECHNICAL EQUIPMENT | Entry into regional phase | 08.04.2011 | National basic fee paid | 08.04.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.04.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.04.2011 | Examination requested [2011/26] | 28.10.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.02.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.03.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 27.03.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.02.2013 | Opposition(s) | 11.02.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.08.2009 | AT | 08.05.2013 | CY | 08.05.2013 | CZ | 08.05.2013 | DK | 08.05.2013 | EE | 08.05.2013 | FI | 08.05.2013 | HR | 08.05.2013 | IT | 08.05.2013 | LT | 08.05.2013 | LV | 08.05.2013 | MC | 08.05.2013 | MK | 08.05.2013 | MT | 08.05.2013 | NL | 08.05.2013 | PL | 08.05.2013 | RO | 08.05.2013 | SE | 08.05.2013 | SI | 08.05.2013 | SK | 08.05.2013 | SM | 08.05.2013 | TR | 08.05.2013 | BG | 08.08.2013 | NO | 08.08.2013 | GR | 09.08.2013 | GB | 14.08.2013 | IE | 14.08.2013 | ES | 19.08.2013 | CH | 31.08.2013 | LI | 31.08.2013 | IS | 08.09.2013 | PT | 09.09.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 08.05.2013 | |
CY | 08.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2013 | ||
DK | 08.05.2013 | ||
EE | 08.05.2013 | ||
FI | 08.05.2013 | ||
HR | 08.05.2013 | ||
IT | 08.05.2013 | ||
LT | 08.05.2013 | ||
LV | 08.05.2013 | ||
MC | 08.05.2013 | ||
MK | 08.05.2013 | ||
MT | 08.05.2013 | ||
NL | 08.05.2013 | ||
PL | 08.05.2013 | ||
RO | 08.05.2013 | ||
SE | 08.05.2013 | ||
SI | 08.05.2013 | ||
SK | 08.05.2013 | ||
SM | 08.05.2013 | ||
TR | 08.05.2013 | ||
BG | 08.08.2013 | ||
NO | 08.08.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
GB | 14.08.2013 | ||
IE | 14.08.2013 | ||
ES | 19.08.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
IS | 08.09.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 08.05.2013 | |
CY | 08.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2013 | ||
DK | 08.05.2013 | ||
EE | 08.05.2013 | ||
FI | 08.05.2013 | ||
HR | 08.05.2013 | ||
IT | 08.05.2013 | ||
LT | 08.05.2013 | ||
LV | 08.05.2013 | ||
MC | 08.05.2013 | ||
NL | 08.05.2013 | ||
PL | 08.05.2013 | ||
RO | 08.05.2013 | ||
SE | 08.05.2013 | ||
SI | 08.05.2013 | ||
SK | 08.05.2013 | ||
SM | 08.05.2013 | ||
BG | 08.08.2013 | ||
NO | 08.08.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
GB | 14.08.2013 | ||
IE | 14.08.2013 | ||
ES | 19.08.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
IS | 08.09.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/34] | AT | 08.05.2013 | |
CY | 08.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2013 | ||
DK | 08.05.2013 | ||
EE | 08.05.2013 | ||
FI | 08.05.2013 | ||
HR | 08.05.2013 | ||
IT | 08.05.2013 | ||
LT | 08.05.2013 | ||
LV | 08.05.2013 | ||
MC | 08.05.2013 | ||
NL | 08.05.2013 | ||
PL | 08.05.2013 | ||
RO | 08.05.2013 | ||
SE | 08.05.2013 | ||
SI | 08.05.2013 | ||
SK | 08.05.2013 | ||
BG | 08.08.2013 | ||
NO | 08.08.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
GB | 14.08.2013 | ||
IE | 14.08.2013 | ||
ES | 19.08.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
IS | 08.09.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | AT | 08.05.2013 | |
CY | 08.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2013 | ||
DK | 08.05.2013 | ||
EE | 08.05.2013 | ||
FI | 08.05.2013 | ||
HR | 08.05.2013 | ||
IT | 08.05.2013 | ||
LT | 08.05.2013 | ||
LV | 08.05.2013 | ||
MC | 08.05.2013 | ||
NL | 08.05.2013 | ||
PL | 08.05.2013 | ||
RO | 08.05.2013 | ||
SE | 08.05.2013 | ||
SI | 08.05.2013 | ||
SK | 08.05.2013 | ||
BG | 08.08.2013 | ||
NO | 08.08.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
IE | 14.08.2013 | ||
ES | 19.08.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
IS | 08.09.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 08.05.2013 | |
CY | 08.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2013 | ||
DK | 08.05.2013 | ||
EE | 08.05.2013 | ||
FI | 08.05.2013 | ||
HR | 08.05.2013 | ||
IT | 08.05.2013 | ||
LT | 08.05.2013 | ||
LV | 08.05.2013 | ||
MC | 08.05.2013 | ||
NL | 08.05.2013 | ||
PL | 08.05.2013 | ||
RO | 08.05.2013 | ||
SE | 08.05.2013 | ||
SI | 08.05.2013 | ||
SK | 08.05.2013 | ||
BG | 08.08.2013 | ||
NO | 08.08.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
ES | 19.08.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
IS | 08.09.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 08.05.2013 | |
CY | 08.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2013 | ||
DK | 08.05.2013 | ||
EE | 08.05.2013 | ||
FI | 08.05.2013 | ||
HR | 08.05.2013 | ||
IT | 08.05.2013 | ||
LT | 08.05.2013 | ||
LV | 08.05.2013 | ||
NL | 08.05.2013 | ||
PL | 08.05.2013 | ||
RO | 08.05.2013 | ||
SE | 08.05.2013 | ||
SI | 08.05.2013 | ||
SK | 08.05.2013 | ||
BG | 08.08.2013 | ||
NO | 08.08.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
ES | 19.08.2013 | ||
IS | 08.09.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 08.05.2013 | |
CY | 08.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2013 | ||
DK | 08.05.2013 | ||
EE | 08.05.2013 | ||
FI | 08.05.2013 | ||
HR | 08.05.2013 | ||
IT | 08.05.2013 | ||
LT | 08.05.2013 | ||
LV | 08.05.2013 | ||
PL | 08.05.2013 | ||
RO | 08.05.2013 | ||
SE | 08.05.2013 | ||
SI | 08.05.2013 | ||
SK | 08.05.2013 | ||
BG | 08.08.2013 | ||
NO | 08.08.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
ES | 19.08.2013 | ||
IS | 08.09.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 08.05.2013 | |
CY | 08.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2013 | ||
DK | 08.05.2013 | ||
EE | 08.05.2013 | ||
FI | 08.05.2013 | ||
HR | 08.05.2013 | ||
LT | 08.05.2013 | ||
LV | 08.05.2013 | ||
PL | 08.05.2013 | ||
SE | 08.05.2013 | ||
SI | 08.05.2013 | ||
SK | 08.05.2013 | ||
BG | 08.08.2013 | ||
NO | 08.08.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
ES | 19.08.2013 | ||
IS | 08.09.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 08.05.2013 | |
CY | 08.05.2013 | ||
DK | 08.05.2013 | ||
EE | 08.05.2013 | ||
FI | 08.05.2013 | ||
HR | 08.05.2013 | ||
LT | 08.05.2013 | ||
LV | 08.05.2013 | ||
PL | 08.05.2013 | ||
SE | 08.05.2013 | ||
SI | 08.05.2013 | ||
BG | 08.08.2013 | ||
NO | 08.08.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
ES | 19.08.2013 | ||
IS | 08.09.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/02] | AT | 08.05.2013 | |
CY | 08.05.2013 | ||
FI | 08.05.2013 | ||
HR | 08.05.2013 | ||
LT | 08.05.2013 | ||
LV | 08.05.2013 | ||
PL | 08.05.2013 | ||
SE | 08.05.2013 | ||
SI | 08.05.2013 | ||
BG | 08.08.2013 | ||
NO | 08.08.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
ES | 19.08.2013 | ||
IS | 08.09.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 08.05.2013 | |
CY | 08.05.2013 | ||
FI | 08.05.2013 | ||
HR | 08.05.2013 | ||
LT | 08.05.2013 | ||
PL | 08.05.2013 | ||
SE | 08.05.2013 | ||
SI | 08.05.2013 | ||
BG | 08.08.2013 | ||
NO | 08.08.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
ES | 19.08.2013 | ||
IS | 08.09.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 08.05.2013 | |
FI | 08.05.2013 | ||
HR | 08.05.2013 | ||
LT | 08.05.2013 | ||
PL | 08.05.2013 | ||
SE | 08.05.2013 | ||
SI | 08.05.2013 | ||
BG | 08.08.2013 | ||
NO | 08.08.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
ES | 19.08.2013 | ||
IS | 08.09.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 08.05.2013 | |
FI | 08.05.2013 | ||
LT | 08.05.2013 | ||
PL | 08.05.2013 | ||
SE | 08.05.2013 | ||
SI | 08.05.2013 | ||
BG | 08.08.2013 | ||
NO | 08.08.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
ES | 19.08.2013 | ||
IS | 08.09.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 08.05.2013 | |
FI | 08.05.2013 | ||
LT | 08.05.2013 | ||
SE | 08.05.2013 | ||
SI | 08.05.2013 | ||
NO | 08.08.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
ES | 19.08.2013 | ||
IS | 08.09.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 08.05.2013 | |
LT | 08.05.2013 | ||
NO | 08.08.2013 | ||
ES | 19.08.2013 | ||
IS | 08.09.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 08.05.2013 | |
NO | 08.08.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2337776 (MSS CLEAN TECHNOLOGY LIMITED [GB]) [A] 6-8 * figures 7,8 *; | [Y]DE20107593U (SCHRAPS GUENTER [DE]) [Y] 9-10 * page 4, line 28 - page 5, line 14 *; | [A]EP1310607 (COLLADO IZQUIERDO RAMON [ES]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0015] , [0016] , [0018]; figure 2 *; | [XY]WO2004092498 (ROEN ROGER C [US]) [X] 1-5,13-14 * page 7, columns 10-20; figures 3,4,8 * * page 9, lines 5-14 * [Y] 9-10; | [A]US2005246984 (COLOSIMO SAM [CA], et al) [A] 11-12* figures 2-4 * |