Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8610384 | Global Dossier | 17.12.2013 | B2 | US2011163702 | 07.07.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2009EP60627 | 17.08.2009 | DE102008045247 | 01.09.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101665149B | Global Dossier | 11.10.2016 | B1 | KR20110046516 | 04.05.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2009EP60627 | 17.08.2009 | DE102008045247 | 01.09.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2319168 | Global Dossier | 11.05.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2009EP60627 | 17.08.2009 | DE102008045247 | 01.09.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102132484B | 18.03.2015 | B | CN102132484 | 20.07.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2009EP60627 | 17.08.2009 | DE102008045247 | 01.09.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2506691 | 10.02.2014 | C2 | RU2011112390 | 10.10.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2009EP60627 | 17.08.2009 | DE102008045247 | 01.09.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2010023127 | Global Dossier | 12.08.2010 | A3 | WO2010023127 | 04.03.2010 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE102008045247 | 01.09.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102008045247 | 04.03.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102008045247 | 01.09.2008 |