|
22.07.2022 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.07.2022 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
13 |
|
21.07.2022 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.07.2022 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.07.2022 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.07.2022 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.07.2022 |
F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.05.2022 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.05.2022 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.05.2022 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.05.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.05.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.05.2022 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.04.2022 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.03.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.03.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.03.2022 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.05.2021 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.04.2021 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.04.2021 |
Communication about missing proof of delivery |
Appeal |
10 |
|
31.03.2021 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.03.2021 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
3 |
|
19.03.2021 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
3 |
|
19.03.2021 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
6 |
|
16.03.2021 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.02.2021 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.06.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.06.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.06.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.06.2020 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
18.02.2020 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.02.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.02.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.02.2020 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
10.02.2020 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
6 |
|
20.12.2019 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.12.2019 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.12.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.12.2019 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.11.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.10.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.10.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.10.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.10.2019 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.10.2019 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.10.2019 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
10.10.2019 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.10.2019 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
10.10.2019 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
27 |
|
10.10.2019 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.10.2019 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.10.2019 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.10.2019 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.10.2019 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.10.2019 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.10.2019 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.10.2019 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.05.2019 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
7 |
|
27.03.2019 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.03.2019 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.03.2019 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.03.2019 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.03.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.03.2019 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.03.2019 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.03.2019 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.03.2019 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
14.03.2019 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
14.03.2019 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.03.2019 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
14.03.2019 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.03.2019 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.03.2019 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.03.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.03.2019 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
12.03.2019 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.03.2019 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.11.2018 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.11.2018 |
Request concerning representative opponent |
Opposition |
16 |
|
30.10.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.10.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.10.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.09.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.09.2018 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.09.2018 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.09.2018 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
17 |
|
17.09.2018 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.09.2018 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.09.2018 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.09.2018 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.06.2018 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.06.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.06.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.06.2018 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
08.02.2018 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.02.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.02.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.02.2018 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.02.2018 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
01.02.2018 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
01.02.2018 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
01.02.2018 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
01.02.2018 |
Translation of the evidence during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.02.2018 |
Translation of the evidence during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
01.02.2018 |
Translation of the evidence during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.01.2018 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.12.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.12.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.12.2017 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.12.2017 |
Translation of the evidence during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
21.12.2017 |
Translation of the evidence during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
21.12.2017 |
Translation of the evidence during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
50 |
|
21.12.2017 |
Translation of the evidence during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
04.12.2017 |
Request for documents |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.10.2017 |
Request for documents |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.10.2017 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.10.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.10.2017 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
18.10.2017 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
18.10.2017 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
18.10.2017 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
26 |
|
18.10.2017 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
18.10.2017 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
19 |
|
18.10.2017 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
18.10.2017 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
18.10.2017 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
33 |
|
18.10.2017 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
24 |
|
18.10.2017 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
18.10.2017 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
18.10.2017 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
18.10.2017 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
18.10.2017 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
18.10.2017 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
18.10.2017 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
18.10.2017 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
21 |
|
18.10.2017 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
18.10.2017 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
18.10.2017 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
46 |
|
18.10.2017 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
18.10.2017 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
18.10.2017 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
18.10.2017 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
22 |
|
18.10.2017 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
18.10.2017 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
18.10.2017 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
18.10.2017 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
18.10.2017 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
18.01.2017 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.12.2016 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.12.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.12.2016 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.12.2016 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.12.2016 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.12.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.08.2016 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.08.2016 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
05.08.2016 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.08.2016 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
15.07.2016 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.11.2015 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.11.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.11.2015 |
Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.11.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.03.2014 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.05.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.05.2011 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.05.2011 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.05.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.05.2011 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.04.2011 |
Communication concerning correction of deficiences in Written Opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.03.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.03.2011 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.03.2011 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
11.02.2011 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
11.02.2011 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.01.2011 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.07.2010 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.07.2010 |
International publication of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.06.2010 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
02.06.2010 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
02.06.2010 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
25.03.2010 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
04.03.2010 |
Published international application - A2 |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
01.09.2009 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
01.09.2009 |
Abstract |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
01.09.2009 |
Claims |
PCT receiving Office |
3 |
|
01.09.2009 |
Description |
PCT receiving Office |
7 |
|
01.09.2009 |
Drawings |
PCT receiving Office |
4 |
|
01.09.2009 |
Priority document (RO-procedure) |
PCT receiving Office |
17 |