29.07.2022 |
Revocation of patent |
published on 31.08.2022 [2022/35] |
29.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.08.2022 [2022/35] |
22.07.2022 |
New entry: Despatch of communication that patent is revoked |
|
05.07.2022 |
New entry: Decision (+date) in appeal procedure |
|
16.03.2021 |
Change: Date of oral proceedings |
|
16.03.2021 |
Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
06.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] |
14.02.2020 |
New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal |
|
17.12.2019 |
Change: Appeal number |
|
10.12.2019 |
New entry: Appeal number |
|
10.12.2019 |
New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal |
|
15.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51] |
11.10.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.11.2019 [2019/46] |
09.10.2019 |
New entry: Despatch of interlocutory decision |
|
09.10.2019 |
New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
28.06.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.07.2019 [2019/31] |
25.09.2018 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
21.09.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.10.2018 [2018/43] |
24.08.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.09.2018 [2018/39] |
27.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.08.2018 [2018/35] |
20.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] |
15.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.07.2018 [2018/29] |
11.06.2018 |
New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition |
|
02.03.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.04.2018 [2018/14] |
11.02.2018 |
New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit |
|
01.12.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.01.2018 [2018/01] |
17.11.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.12.2017 [2017/51] |
10.11.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.12.2017 [2017/50] |
03.11.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.12.2017 [2017/49] |
27.10.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.11.2017 [2017/48] |
20.10.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.11.2017 [2017/47] |
20.10.2017 |
Opposition filed |
published on 22.11.2017 [2017/47] |
13.10.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] |
06.10.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.11.2017 [2017/45] |
29.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.11.2017 [2017/44] |
22.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.10.2017 [2017/43] |
15.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.10.2017 [2017/42] |
08.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.10.2017 [2017/41] |
01.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.10.2017 [2017/40] |
16.12.2016 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 18.01.2017 [2017/03] |
09.12.2016 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
09.12.2016 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
09.12.2016 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
05.10.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.08.2016 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
06.10.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.10.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.10.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.10.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.11.2011 |
Change - extension states |
published on 07.12.2011 [2011/49] |
06.10.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
31.05.2011 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
13.05.2011 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 15.06.2011 [2011/24] |
13.05.2011 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 15.06.2011 [2011/24] |
19.04.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.04.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.04.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.02.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.07.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.05.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.03.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.03.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.01.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.01.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|