Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9623814 | Global Dossier | 18.04.2017 | B2 | US2011236610 | 29.09.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2009EP61271 | 01.09.2009 | EP08163414 | 01.09.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101715310B | Global Dossier | 10.03.2017 | B1 | KR20160106199 | 09.09.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2009EP61271 | 01.09.2009 | EP08163414 | 01.09.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6017786B | Global Dossier | 02.11.2016 | B2 | JP2012501266 | 19.01.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2009EP61271 | 01.09.2009 | EP08163414 | 01.09.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2331368 | Global Dossier | 18.01.2017 | B1 | EP2331368 | 15.06.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP09782454 | 01.09.2009 | WO2009EP61271 | 01.09.2009 | EP08163414 | 01.09.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0918290 | 22.12.2015 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2009EP61271 | 01.09.2009 | EP08163414 | 01.09.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102137774B | 23.07.2014 | B | CN102137774 | 27.07.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2009EP61271 | 01.09.2009 | EP08163414 | 01.09.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2010023325 | Global Dossier | 15.07.2010 | A3 | WO2010023325 | 04.03.2010 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP08163414 | 01.09.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20110069021 | Global Dossier | 22.06.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | EP08163414 | 01.09.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2016164070 | Global Dossier | 08.09.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | EP08163414 | 01.09.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2159109 | Global Dossier | 03.03.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP08163414 | 01.09.2008 |